Jessica Gschwend and Justin Hodges v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Gschwend and Justin Hodges
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02151
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/20/2021. (pa)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/20/2021. (pa)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 4/13/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla is cancelled. (jrs)
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jessica Gschwend and Justin Hodges (Gastel, Benjamin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Samuel L. Felker (Felker, Samuel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Gastel, Benjamin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3581440) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Bryce)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3581413) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Glauberman, Scott)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3581339) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(D'Amore, Stephen)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.*/ TEXT GRANT ONLY - NO PDF */. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/17/2021. (pa)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Felker, Samuel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Cummins, Kyle)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Felker, Samuel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #7 Notice (Other) Declaration of Justin Griner by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Felker, Samuel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Felker, Samuel)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 4/13/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/15/2021 to correct Notice of Setting) (jrs).
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. from Shelby County, TN Circuit Court, case number CT-5091-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3565123), filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummins, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessica Gschwend and Justin Hodges v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Samuel L. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle R. Cummins
Represented By: Stephen V. D'Amore
Represented By: Scott P. Glauberman
Represented By: Bryce Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Samuel L. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Gschwend and Justin Hodges
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?