Doherty v. Danmar Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Regina L. Doherty
Defendant: Danmar Products, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02263
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 6/1/2021. (pa)
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/23/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla in a courtroom to be determined. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/3/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/13/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla in a courtroom to be determined. (jrs)
May 28, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 5/28/2021. John R. Johnson, III appeared for the Plaintiff. Colleen Schuetz and Minton Philip Mayer appeared for the Defendant. Case information reviewed. Plaintiff's child suffered from a rare genetic disorder, Cornelia de Lange syndrome (CdLS). Plaintiff advised as to questions regarding the specific helmet in use (the third helmet). Parties unsure as to current location. Examination of the (third) helmet is to be completed by July 9, 2021. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #16 reviewed briefly. Plaintiff has filed related suit in Shelby County Court. BSTN (Behavioral Services of TN, Inc.) employees, Tabatha Benson and Sylvia Wright, have been indicted in Shelby County Court. Manner of death discussed. The Court reviewed proportionality and discovery. Plaintiffs signed HIPAA release to be submitted by June 14, 2021. The Court reviewed case schedule and deadlines. The Jury Trial is set for May 23, 2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCall in a courtroom to be determined. The trial is estimated to take 4 days. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on May 3, 2022. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, May 13, 2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla in a courtroom to be determined. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
May 28, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Proposed Order submitted filed by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Mayer, Minton)
May 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Danmar Products, Inc. re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56 - MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Mayer, Minton)
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56 - MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Mayer, Minton)
May 27, 2021 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 5/28/2021 at 2:30 PM is *Reset to *3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. *TIME CHANGE ONLY* To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Proposed Order submitted by Regina L. Doherty. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Johnson, John)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Regina L. Doherty (Johnson, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Danmar Products, Inc. of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Schuetz, Colleen)
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mayer, Minton)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Schuetz on behalf of Danmar Products, Inc. (Schuetz, Colleen)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 5/28/2021 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Mayer, Minton)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56 - MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mayer, Minton)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Danmar Products, Inc..(Mayer, Minton)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Minton Philip Mayer on behalf of All Defendants (Mayer, Minton)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Mayer, Minton)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Danmar Products, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-5325-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3596875), filed by Danmar Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal on Plaintiff's Counsel and Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayer, Minton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doherty v. Danmar Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina L. Doherty
Represented By: John R. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danmar Products, Inc.
Represented By: Minton Philip Mayer
Represented By: Colleen Schuetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?