Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC
Defendant: Aron J. Austin and Pauline Austin-Young
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02516
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendants move for reimbursement of the civil filing fee. (ECF No. 29.) They offer no legal basis for the request. (Id.) Plaintiff has responded, stating that "[i]f anyone should recover costs and fees, it is [Plaintiff] and not Austin." (ECF No. 30 at PageID 2744.) When granting remand, this Court decided by a narrow margin to deny Plaintiff's request for sanctions. (ECF No. 27 at PageID 2739.) Defendants' motion is not well taken and is therefore DENIED. If Defendants continue to file frivolous motions, the Court may reconsider its position on awarding sanctions to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/28/2021. (jrs)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Reimbursement , proposed order submitted, filed by Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC. (Futhey, Malcolm)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Reimbursement of Filing Fees Paid for State Removal in the Sum of $402.00 by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (agj)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/21 at 9:00 AM. (mlk)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #18 Motion to Remand, Remanding to the Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee for the Thirtieth Judicial District, and Denying #14 #15 #16 #21 #25 Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/10/2021. (jrs)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Additional Affirmative Defenses pleading and their Section 1981 Pleading, proposed order submitted, filed by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRO SE MOTION to Strike SRR Exhibits on CD-ROM. Submitted without motion to obtain and Order granting the submission re: #18 MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Defendants RESPONSE to re 20 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young (agj)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFENDANTs Second Objection re #18 MOTION to Remand, filed by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (agj)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Additional Affirmative Defenses pleading and their Section 1981 Pleading, proposed order submitted, by Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support)(Futhey, Malcolm)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiff moves for an extension of time to respond to Defendants' #14 #15 #16 pending motions until after the Court rules on Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Remand. (ECF No. 19.) Plaintiff contends that this Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction in this case and that the motions not rendered moot by an order remanding this case "would be more appropriately handled by the state court that has dealt with the substantive matters so far." (Id. at PageID 2635.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion for the extension. The Court extends Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendants' pending motions until thirty (30) days after the Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/3/2021. (jrs)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Deadline , proposed order submitted, by Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC. (Futhey, Malcolm)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, by Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Exhibit 1 Original Lawsuit Primary Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2 Second Lawsuit Primary Pleadings, #4 Exhibit 3. Third Lawsuit Primary Pleadings)(Futhey, Malcolm)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendants OBJECTION to Remand the Matter to State by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young (agj)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION for Injunctive Order for Payment by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jae)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRO SE MOTION to Dismiss with Extreme Prejudice by Aron J. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jae)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO SE MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Aron J. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(jae)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Counsel should call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215.(mlk)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTACHMENT State Court Pleadings (Part 6) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTACHMENT State Court Pleadings (Part 5) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTACHMENT State Court Pleadings (Part 4) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg) Modified on 8/11/2021 (btg).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTACHMENT State Court Pleadings (Part 3) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTACHMENT State Court Pleadings (Part 2) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin, Pauline Austin-Young. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTACHMENT STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Part 1) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Aron J. Austin. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing by Aron J. Austin. (btg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 402.00, receipt number M4676049785 (csf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pauline Austin-Young, Aron J. Austin from Circuit Court for Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT 1601-19., filed by Pauline Austin-Young, Aron J. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Case in Shelby County Circuit Court CT1601-19, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Roofing & Renovations, LLC
Represented By: Malcolm Brown Futhey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aron J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Austin-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?