Green v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheldon Green
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02518
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Judgement as a Matter of Law. (Document not signed, and was left in Clerk's drop box) (btg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 Initial Disclosures. (Document not signed, and was left in Clerk's drop box) (btg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 21 Objections to Defendant's Initial Disclosures. (Document not signed, and was left in Clerk's Drop Box) (btg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER to Complaint as Amended by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc..(Quinlen, Thomas)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, 8/22/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The trial is estimated to take 2-3 days. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 8/8/2022. A Pretrial Conference has been set for Monday, 8/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING NEW MEDIATOR [No Image Attached]: Harriet M. Halmon appointed as mediator. 22 N. Front St., Ste 790, Memphis, TN 38103. (901) 525-3450. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 9/28/2021. (Pham, Tu)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on September 16, 2021. (cmp).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham: Video Scheduling Conference held on 9/15/2021. Sheldon Green appearing by video Pro Se. Thomas Quinlen appearing by video on behalf of defendant. Court set dates for scheduling order. Order to be entered. Plaintiff requested court appointed mediator- Granted, mediator to be selected by Court. Pretrial conference and Trial date to be set by District Judge. (Tape #FTR/Zoom) (tlh)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 9/15/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. The proceeding will be done via Zoom video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference one (1) day prior to the proceeding. Please email Terry Haley at terry_haley@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (tlh)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Quinlen, Thomas)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, September 8 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla is CANCELLEED and will be RESET by Magistrate Judge Tu Pham. (jrs)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 9/8/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 08/17/21. (cmp)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Quinlen, Thomas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Quinlen, Thomas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against FedEx Supply Chain, Inc., filed by Sheldon Green.(btg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 9/16/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation, Corporate Parent FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc., Corporate Parent FedEx Logistics, Inc. for FedEx Supply Chain, Inc... (Quinlen, Thomas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. from Shelby County, TN Circuit Court, case number CT-2669-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3675882), filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc..(Quinlen, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Quinlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?