Moore v. Gibbs et al
Plaintiff: Latonia Moore
Defendant: George Gibbs, Phillip Carpenter, WTI Transport, Inc., L & B Transport, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv02536
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latonia Moore as to WTI Transport, Inc.. (Lambert, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latonia Moore as to L & B Transport, LLC. (Lambert, Mark)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 *TEXT ORDER* Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Phillip Carpenter and L&B Transport, LLC have until and including October 18, 2021 to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/27/21. (rcl)
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Proposed Order Submitted by Phillip Carpenter, L & B Transport, LLC. (Coffman, Andrew)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 CORRECTED SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Friday, 10/22/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, 10/22/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jam)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WTI Transport, Inc..(Telfeyan, Bradford)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to WTI Transport by Latonia Moore.(Lambert, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Phillip Carpenter by Latonia Moore.(Lambert, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to L & B Transport by Latonia Moore.(Lambert, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to George Gibbs by Latonia Moore.(Lambert, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Phillip Carpenter, George Gibbs, L & B Transport, LLC, WTI Transport, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Notice of Correction, has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to attach electronic signature to the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures.(jae)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint Complaint for Injury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to L & B Transport, #3 Summons Summons to Phillip Carpenter, #4 Summons Summons to George Gibbs, #5 Summons Summons to WTI Transport)(Lambert, Mark)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Latonia Moore has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: there was no civil cover sheet attached and the complaint has a hand-written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Latonia Moore against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3682058), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lambert, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Moore
Represented By: Mark Anthony Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTI Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford D. Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & B Transport, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?