Payne v. City of Memphis et al
Plaintiff: J.C. Payne and The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV
Defendant: City of Memphis, Memphis Light Gas & Water, John Doe Police Officers 1-10 and Earnest Cartwright, Sr
Case Number: 2:2021cv02539
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Defendants MLGW and City of Memphis' joint #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/06/2021. Defendants City of Memphis and MLGW's answers are due 1/19/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (proposed order submitted) by City of Memphis, Memphis Light Gas & Water. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sims Lawsuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Probate Court Petition, #3 Exhibit C - Probate Court Order)(Cox, Meghan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV as to Earnest Cartwright, Sr. (Williams, Juan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Memphis Light Gas & Water, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/21/2021. Defendant MLGW's answer is due on 10/5/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to City of Memphis, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/21/2021. City of Memphis' answer is due on 10/21/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Odell Horton, Jr on behalf of Memphis Light Gas & Water (Horton, Odell)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Memphis Light Gas & Water. (Cox, Meghan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by City of Memphis. (Hawkins, Dennis)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Matthew Fletcher on behalf of City of Memphis (Fletcher, Joseph)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Patrick Hawkins on behalf of City of Memphis (Hawkins, Dennis)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Earnest Cartwright, Sr. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Summons by Juan Williams on behalf of The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV. (Williams, Juan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV as to Memphis Light Gas & Water. (Williams, Juan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV as to Earnest Cartwright, Sr. (Williams, Juan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV as to City of Memphis. (Williams, Juan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Earnest Cartwright, Sr, City of Memphis, Memphis Light Gas & Water. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Civil cover sheet contains wet signature of attorney. All documents should contain electronic signatures. The filer also failed to add additional party when opening this case. Clerk's office has now added the omitted party. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3682404), filed by J.C. Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Williams, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. City of Memphis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Payne
Represented By: Juan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of J.C. Payne, IV
Represented By: Juan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Hawkins
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas & Water
Represented By: Odell Horton, Jr.
Represented By: Meghan McMahon Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officers 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest Cartwright, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?