Williams v. First Horizon Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Lakisha Williams
Defendant: First Horizon Corporation and First Horizon Bank
Case Number: 2:2021cv02553
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/15/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/15/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashleigh Singleton (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 FL Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 SDFL Certificate of Good Standing)(Singleton, Ashleigh)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dena H. Sokolow (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 FL Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 SDFL Certificate of Good Standing)(Sokolow, Dena)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashleigh Singleton (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3724038) filed by First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3723052) filed by First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: neither motion has a certificate of good stand from the highest state court. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashleigh Singleton (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3724038) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 FL Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 SDFL Certificate of Good Standing)(Singleton, Ashleigh)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3723052) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DHS - FL Bar Certificate, #2 Exhibit DHS - SDFL Certificate)(Sokolow, Dena)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling/Status Conference is set for FRIDAY 11/12/2021 at 9:00 AM via TEAMS before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines at the website @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Due to the Covid-19 pandemic, the scheduling conference may be cancelled in advance if the Joint proposed scheduling order is approved and entered prior to the conference date. If the order is not approved, the proceeding will go forward. At that time, Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and to discuss case status and all pending motions. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed electronically. (ljf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation. (Davis, Emma)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation.(Davis, Emma)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 9/30/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond, Proposed Order Submitted, by First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation. (Davis, Emma)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Frisch on behalf of Lakisha Williams (Frisch, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lakisha Williams of Filing Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Consent to Join)(Morgan, Charles)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to First Horizon Bank, First Horizon Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(btg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (btg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Horizon Corporation and First Horizon Bank (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3689441), filed by Lakisha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons1, #3 Summons Proposed Summons2)(Morgan, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. First Horizon Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Williams
Represented By: Charles Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Corporation
Represented By: Dena H Sokolow
Represented By: Emma Redden Davis
Represented By: Ashleigh Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Bank
Represented By: Dena H Sokolow
Represented By: Emma Redden Davis
Represented By: Ashleigh Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?