Dorothy L. Moore v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy L. Moore
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4 and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee
Not Classified By Court: Clerk and Master W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv02575
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dorothy L. Moore. (Johnson, Curtis)
November 5, 2021 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Leave to File and/or to Recognize Reply Memorandum as Timely (proposed order submitted) by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 28, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 26 (Lieber, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee of Service of its Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Lieber, Robert)
October 23, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Response to Motion filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note)(Ronderos, Joseph)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/21/2021.
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held via Teams video conference on 10/21/2021. Curtis Johnson, Jr. appeared for the plaintiffs. Shaun Ramey appeared for defendant PHH Mortgage and HSBC National Bank. Robert Lieber appeared for defendant Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann. The Court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Joint Pretrial Order due 10/7/2022. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey.) (cas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Pretrial Order by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Johnson, Curtis)
October 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee. (Lieber, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dorothy L. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law In Support of Response In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Johnson, Curtis)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 2 (State Court Notice) to #1 Notice of Removal,, by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit 2-Substitution of Trustee)(Ronderos, Joseph)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Lieber on behalf of Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee (Lieber, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, October 21, 2021 at 2:30 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dorothy L. Moore re #1 Notice of Removal,, Verified Response to Verified Denial filed by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann (Johnson, Curtis)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4. (Ronderos, Joseph)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Kevin Ramey on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ramey, Shaun)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4 (consented to by Defendant Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C.) (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNWDC-3700067), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(Ronderos, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorothy L. Moore v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk and Master W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy L. Moore
Represented By: Curtis D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE4
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. Substitute Trustee
Represented By: Robert Thomas Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?