Reed v. Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul D. Reed
Defendant: Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02657
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on December 2, 2021. (cmp)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc..(Holmes, Rodrick)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc. (btg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc.. Summons, complaint, Order and USM 285 form placed in US Marshall's mail box for service on defendant. (jae)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER to Issue and Effect Service of Process. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on October 22, 2021. (cmp)
October 22, 2021 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing by Paul D. Reed. (btg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul D. Reed. (btg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc., filed by Paul D. Reed. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Judicial Cards)(btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Recovery Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?