Weirich et al v. TESCO Properties, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Weirich and Jennifer Sink
Defendant: TESCO Properties, Inc., Pepper Tree- Memphis, Ltd. and Pepper Tree Apartments
Not Classified By Court: Joe W. Brown
Case Number: 2:2021cv02745
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Jennifer Sink re #12 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted of Filing Supplemental Brief (McMullen, Bruce)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted, #11 MOTION to Remand Proposed order submitted filed by All Defendants. (Wharton, Alexander)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum in Support Thereof signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 1/13/2022. (Fowlkes, J.)
January 8, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted, #11 MOTION to Remand Proposed order submitted Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Wharton, Alexander)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases proposed order submitted filed by Jennifer Sink. (McMullen, Bruce)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Amy Weirich. (Brandon, Cody)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted by Jennifer Sink. (McMullen, Bruce)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Proposed order submitted by Amy Weirich. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff-Respondent Amy Weirich's Motion to Remand)(Brandon, Cody)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Newsom, III on behalf of Amy Weirich (Newsom, James)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Nash Brandon on behalf of Amy Weirich (Brandon, Cody)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Defendants. (Wharton, Alexander)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Vee Silk on behalf of Jennifer Sink (Silk, Jennie)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce McMullen on behalf of Jennifer Sink (McMullen, Bruce)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County General Sessions Division 14, case number 21501780 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3759458), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Filing of State Documents)(Wharton, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weirich et al v. TESCO Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Weirich
Represented By: James R. Newsom, III
Represented By: Paul J. Hagerman
Represented By: William Lockhart Gibbons, Jr.
Represented By: Cody Nash Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sink
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Paul J. Hagerman
Represented By: William Lockhart Gibbons, Jr.
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESCO Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepper Tree- Memphis, Ltd.
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepper Tree Apartments
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Joe W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?