Sharp v. Family Dollar et al
Plaintiff: Karen Sharp
Defendant: Family Dollar and Dollar Tree Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02376
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-8-22 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Court Reporter Candace S. Covey, Telephone number 901-495-1216. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/16/2022. Redaction Request due 9/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2022. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Covey, Candace)
August 8, 2022 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: A Status Conference has been set for Monday, September 12, 2022 at 1:00 P.M. (CST) via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(smm)
August 8, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Status/Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 8/8/2022. J. Gerard Stranch, IV, Gregory W. Aleshire, Jerry D. Garner, Sarah Sterling Aldridge, William Thomas Crowder, Stephen F. Libby, James A. Streett, Janna L. Maples, and Gary M. Klinger appeared for the plaintiff(s). Jason Meltzer, Jesenka Mrdjenovic and Christopher Chorba appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case, dates and deadlines with the parties. The parties shall meet and confer regarding any dispute that may arise. If the parties are unable to resolve the dispute, the parties shall file a joint position paper with each side having two pages to outline their position. The joint position paper must be filed within seven days of the meet and confer. The parties shall submit their position regarding the protocol for attorney's fees to the Judge's ECF Email by Wednesday, September 7, 2022, The court set a Status Conference for Monday, September 12, 2022 at 1:00 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The court set the October Status Conference for Monday, October 17, 2022 at 11:00 A.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The November Status Conference has been set for Friday, November 18, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The December Status Conference has been set for Friday, December 16, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(smm)
July 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike (40 in 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp) Status Report by Randall Robertson, Martha Keisha Lacy. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Stranch, J.) Modified on 7/21/2022 (jae).
July 20, 2022 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable in re DE 15 . Mail sent to Marshall Ney. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (agj)
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Randall Robertson, Martha Keisha Lacy re (37 in 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp) Status Report Response to Suppl. Plaintiffs' Suppl. Report on Plaintiffs' Leadership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Email)Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Stranch, J.)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: A Status/Scheduling Conference has been set for Monday, 8/8/2022 11:00 AM (CST) before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(wrh)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Initial Case management conference held on 7/15/2022. Both Parties present via Microsoft Teams video conferencing. Attorney contact list submitted and case list completed. Discovery needs overall discussed by the Parties and the Court. Parties negotiating protocol for inspection of facility to occur as soon as possible. Defendants anticipate reaching class certification stage within a year but Court expressed need to get there sooner. As for Plaintiffs Lead MDL counsel/Interim Class Counsel, the group will again try to reach consensus on this issues, and will file a report by Wednesday, 07/20/2022 by noon (CST). Court will rule on issue as soon as possible thereafter. Parties are to submit a Joint Scheduling Order by 08/03/2022. The Court sets a Status/Scheduling Conference Monday, 08/08/2022 at 11:00 a.m. (CST) to be conducted via Microsoft Teams. [Plaintiffs' Attorneys: J. Gerard Stranch, IV, Charles Foose Barrett, Steven A. Martino, Joseph Stewart Dennis, Tiffany Ray, Gregory W. Aleshire, James D. Robertson, Jerry D. Garner, Patrick Wayne Pendley, John W. Barrett, Katherine Barrett Riley, Sarah Sterling Aldridge, Gregory W. Aleshire, James D. Robertson, Jerry D. Garner, Patrick Wayne Pendley, John W. Barrett, Katherine Barrett Riley, Sarah Sterling Aldridge, Joseph Michael Langone, David Hilton Wise, Gregory E. Bryant, Thomas P. Thrash, William Thomas Crowder, Stephen F. Libby, Benjamin Andrew Gastel, James A. Streett, Janna L. Maples, Michael Gilman Stewart] -- [Defendants' Attorneys: Daniel Warren Van Horn, Kathryn Van Namen, Katherine Church Campbell, Christina Wahl, Lana Alcorn Olson, Richard F Zimmerman, Jr., Amaobi Joseph Enyinnia, Jeff P. Doss, Marshall S. Ney, P. Ryan Beckett, Lewis Franklin Powell, III, Thomas Richard Waskom] (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(wrh)
July 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles LaDuca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(LaDuca, Charles)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, documents #13 and #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Lorraine Bennett-Freeman, Martha Keisha Lacy, Donrea Brown, Muriel Vanessa Brown, Sonja Fields, Christine Robinson, Kimberly Brown, Rosalind Dunning, Linda White, Keith Martin, Kathi Walters, Tina Bishop, Jerome Whitney, Taylor Lorimer, Karen Sharp, Reginald Fields, Randall Robertson, Lakindal Smith, Patricia Ann Rogers, Vinnie L. Smith, Terri Perrone, Sonya Mull, Sheena Bibbs, Nakedra Freeman, Julian A. Graves, has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Attorneys must file their own notice of appearance, adding their individual information to the docket. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Foose Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Barrett, Charles)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Foose Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Barrett, Charles)
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Status Conference has been set for Friday, July 15, 2022 at 3:00 P.M. (CST) via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Joseph Warren at Joseph_Warren@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(smm)
June 17, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re (16 in 2:22-cv-02379-SHL-tmp, 9 in 2:22-cv-02380-SHL-tmp, 16 in 2:22-cv-02378-SHL-tmp, 9 in 2:22-cv-02138-SHL-tmp, 4 in 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp, 14 in 2:22-cv-02383-SHL-tmp, 17 in 2:22-cv-02390-SHL-tmp, 16 in 2:22-cv-02382-SHL-tmp, 7 in 2:22-cv-02376-SHL-jay, 10 in 2:22-cv-02374-SHL-tmp, 9 in 2:22-cv-02375-SHL-tmp) Joint MOTION for Hearing Status Conference (DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS 04 MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND 05 EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) filed by All Defendants. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Van Namen, Kathryn)
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Van Namen on behalf of All Defendants Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Van Namen, Kathryn)
June 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Warren Van Horn on behalf of All Defendants Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Van Horn, Daniel)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Barrett, Charles)
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Hearing Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp et al.(Stranch, J.)
June 15, 2022 Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. Magistrate Judge Jon A. York no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Judge York was assigned at case opening in error. This case is a member case to MDL action 2:22-md-3032. (cdi)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00090.
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Western District of Tennessee as part of MDL No. 3032 In Re: Family Dollar Stores Inc., Pest Infestation Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/14/2022. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/15/2022.]
June 15, 2022 MDL NOTICE: Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00090. Assigned WD/TN Case Number 2:22-cv-2376 SHL/tmp. Associated Cases: 2:22-md-03032-SHL-tmp, 2:22-cv-02376-SHL-jay(cdi)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Karen Sharp's class action complaint. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Sharp's complaint within 45 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues an order on the pending motion for transfer and coordination or consolidation. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/29/2022. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/15/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Church Campbell on behalf of Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/15/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/15/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Karen Sharp. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT086163. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/15/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Family Dollar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sharp
Represented By: Stephen F. Libby
Represented By: Charles Foose Barrett
Represented By: Charles LaDuca
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Daniel W. Van Horn
Represented By: Kathryn Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Inc.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Daniel W. Van Horn
Represented By: Kathryn Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?