Baker v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Baker
Defendant: Douglas Wilson and YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight and Roadway Express
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Intervenor Plaintiff: Florence J. Smith, Sugar Long, Thelma Brown, Tommy Baker, Jeraldine Hunter-Gaddes, Freda Caradine and Curtislene Baker-Harris
Case Number: 2:2023cv02213
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John Thomas Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr. on May 19, 2023. (Fowlkes, J.)
May 19, 2023 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 7/13/2023 09:15 AM VIA TEAMS before Judge John Thomas Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines at the website @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Due to the Covid-19 pandemic, the scheduling conference may be cancelled in advance if the Joint proposed scheduling order is approved and entered prior to the conference date. If the order is not approved, the proceeding will go forward. At that time, Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and to discuss case status and all pending motions. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed electronically.(wrh)
May 8, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on YRC Inc. D/B/A YRC Freight on 03/28/23, filed by Jerry Baker. (Hackett, William)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Douglass Wilson on 04/08/23, filed by Jerry Baker. (Hackett, William)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo Derek Renfroe on behalf of Tommy Baker, Curtislene Baker-Harris, Thelma Brown, Freda Caradine, Jeraldine Hunter-Gaddes, Sugar Long, Florence J. Smith (Renfroe, Lorenzo)
April 26, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tommy Baker, Curtislene Baker-Harris, Thelma Brown, Freda Caradine, Jeraldine Hunter-Gaddes, Sugar Long, Florence J. Smith. Amendment to #9 First MOTION to Intervene Proposed order submitted Proposed order submitted. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Proposed Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Order, Appointing Florence Smith as administrator)(O'Neal, Darrell)
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 First MOTION to Intervene Proposed order submitted by Florence J. Smith, Sugar Long, Thelma Brown, Tommy Baker, Jeraldine Hunter-Gaddes, Freda Caradine, Curtislene Baker-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Proposed Complaint)(O'Neal, Darrell)
April 20, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Wyatt, Carl)
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of All Defendants (Wyatt, Carl)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC INC. d/b/a YRC FREIGHT AND ROADWAY EXPRESS. (Wyatt, Carl)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1122-23, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wyatt, Carl)
April 13, 2023 Civil Filing fee $ 402 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-4120818. (Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Baker
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wilson
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight and Roadway Express
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Florence J. Smith
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sugar Long
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Thelma Brown
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tommy Baker
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeraldine Hunter-Gaddes
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Freda Caradine
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Curtislene Baker-Harris
Represented By: Darrell J. O'Neal
Represented By: Lorenzo Derek Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?