Kong v. Chatham Village HOA et al
Plaintiff: Shanshan Kong
Defendant: Chatham Village HOA, Faith Management & Realty Group, Wayne Mink and Estate Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02405
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
2 Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shanshan Kong. (csf)
August 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: A Non-Jury Trial has been set for Monday, July 22, 2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 1-2 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, July 5, 2024. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, July 12, 2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/27/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2023. ADR deadline is 11/1/2023. Submission of selected mediator due by 9/15/2023. Discovery due by 2/21/2024. Motions due by 3/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 08/29/2023. (jad)
August 29, 2023 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff: Scheduling Conference held on 08/29/2023. Pro se Plaintiff Shanshan Kong and Peter D. Baskind and Julie G. Cardillo, counsel for Defendants, appeared via Microsoft Teams. Case deadlines and Local Rules requirements were discussed. Scheduling Order with pre-trial dates to be entered. Dates for the pretrial order, pretrial conference, and non-jury trial will be set by separate order. (jad) Modified on 8/30/2023 (jad).
August 29, 2023 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Faith Management & Realty Group. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Statement of Facts, #2 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Baskind, Peter)
August 28, 2023 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT In Support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Shanshan Kong. (mlk)
August 28, 2023 Filing 33 Objections to Defendants' Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts filed by Shanshan Kong.(mlk)
August 28, 2023 Filing 32 Objections to Defendants' Response of Plaintiff's Facts Statement filed by Shanshan Kong. (mlk)
August 25, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chatham Village HOA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Statement of Facts, #2 Supplement Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts)(Baskind, Peter)
August 25, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wayne Mink. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Statement of Facts, #2 Supplement Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts)(Baskind, Peter)
August 25, 2023 Filing 29 Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Reply by Shanshan Kong (agj)
August 25, 2023 Filing 28 Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan by Shanshan Kong (agj)
August 24, 2023 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Proposed Order Submitted. (Baskind, Peter)
August 21, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Cardillo on behalf of Chatham Village HOA, Estate Ventures, LLC, Faith Management & Realty Group, Wayne Mink (Cardillo, Julie)
August 21, 2023 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Estate Ventures, LLC. (Baskind, Peter)
August 18, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Chatham Village HOA. (Baskind, Peter)
August 18, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Wayne Mink. (Baskind, Peter)
August 18, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Faith Management & Realty Group. (Baskind, Peter)
August 14, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shanshan Kong. (agj)
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shanshan Kong. (agj)
August 10, 2023 Filing 19 Objection to the Wayne Mink's Motion (ECF No. 12) and Pro Se's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shanshan Kong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(csf)
August 10, 2023 Filing 18 Object to the FAITH MANAGEMENT & REALTY GROUP'S Motion (ECF No. 11) and Pro Se's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shanshan Kong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(csf)
August 7, 2023 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 8/29/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Vallonda Pettway at Vallonda_Pettway@tnwd,uscourts.gov for any questions. (vup)
July 31, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Estate Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Baskind, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Chatham Village HOA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Baskind, Peter)
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added pursuant to DE #13 . (agj)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 7/27/2023. (Claxton, Charmiane)
July 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Wayne Mink. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Baskind, Peter)
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Faith Management & Realty Group. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Baskind, Peter)
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanshan Kong as to Chatham Village HOA. (agj)
July 18, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanshan Kong as to Wayne Mink. (agj)
July 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanshan Kong as to Faith Management & Realty Group. (agj)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanshan Kong as to Estate Ventures, LLC. (agj)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chatham Village HOA, Estate Ventures, LLC, Faith Management & Realty Group, Wayne Mink. The filer was given summons (2 each dft) for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jae)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
July 5, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT For Violation of Civil Rights under 42 U.S.C. 1 1983 against Chatham Village HOA, Estate Ventures, LLC, Faith Management & Realty Group, Wayne Mink (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Shanshan Kong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Agreement to receive NEFs, #3 Receipt for filing fee, #4 Judicial assignment card)(jae)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kong v. Chatham Village HOA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanshan Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham Village HOA
Represented By: Julie Cardillo
Represented By: Peter D Baskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Management & Realty Group
Represented By: Julie Cardillo
Represented By: Peter D Baskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Mink
Represented By: Julie Cardillo
Represented By: Peter D Baskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Julie Cardillo
Represented By: Peter D Baskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?