Moore v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Moore
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02428
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 5, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Summons by Danny Parish on behalf of Katherine Moore. (Parish, Danny)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/1/2023. (wrb)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, 1/27/2025 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla in a courtroom to be determined. A Pretrial Conference has been set for Friday, 1/17/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 4:30 PM on 1/10/2025. (jrs)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/31/2023. Daniel Parrish appeared for the plaintiff. Randolph Bibb, Jr. and Laura Deakins appeared for the defendants. This is a Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability case. The Court reviewed case information and the present location, condition, and status of the two autos in in question, a 2013 Toyota Corolla and a 2014 Nissan Maxima. Further, the Court briefly reviewed the complaint, possible damages, service issues related to a foreign corporation (Toyota). A probable agreement may be reached as to service. The Court discussed dates/deadlines and set a schedule. A Jury Trial is set for Monday, January 27, 2025 at 9:30 AM in a courtroom to be determined. The trial is expected to take 10 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, January 17, 2025 at 9:30 AM. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Conference is due by 4:30 PM on January 10, 2025. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
August 30, 2023 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, August 31, 2023 has been RESET to 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Time Change Only. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Katherine Moore of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Parish, Danny)
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc..(Bibb, John)
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Bibb, John)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, 8/31/2023 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4074-22 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4186969), filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Supplement Written Notice to Adverse Parties)(Bibb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Moore
Represented By: Danny Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?