Kimble et al v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Kimble and Michael Kimble
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. and Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02656
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on November 29, 2023. (shl)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hixson, Everett)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Biddeford Blankets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Derrick, Michael)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Floyd, Michael)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.. (Albritton, Barret)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.. (Albritton, Barret)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. for Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc... (Albritton, Barret)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Biddeford Blankets, LLC.(Derrick, Michael)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Barret S. Albritton on behalf of Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. (Albritton, Barret)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading has a hand-written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 Answer to Complaint filed by Biddeford Blankets, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the CM/ECF user login name does not match the electronic signature on the pleading. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for FRIDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2023 at 11:00 A.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman in Courtroom No. 1, on the 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS.(mmm)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barret S. Albritton on behalf of Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. (Albritton, Barret)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Everett Layne Hixson, III on behalf of Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. (Hixson, Everett)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Biddeford Blankets, LLC.(Cruzen, Vickie)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mf)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (mf)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Biddeford Blankets, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3786-23 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4259035), filed by Biddeford Blankets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer of Ollie's, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal)(Derrick, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble et al v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Kimble
Represented By: Michael G. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kimble
Represented By: Michael G. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.
Represented By: Barret S. Albritton
Represented By: Everett Layne Hixson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?