Francis v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Melissia Francis
Defendant: Alysha Bowers and Michael Bowers
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02720
Filed: November 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Alysha Bowers, Michael Bowers re #16 Scheduling Order Stipulation of Mediator (Gentry, Autumn)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Beemer on behalf of Alysha Bowers, Michael Bowers (Beemer, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: A JURY TRIAL has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. Trial is expected to last approximately 2-3 days.A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE will be held on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. All counsel participating in the trial must be present in person at the pretrial conference.A PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER must be furnished to the Court by JANUARY 31, 2025.PLEASE SEE ATTACHED PRETRIAL PROCEDURES.(mmm)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 12/19/2023. (jad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff: Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2023. Benjamin L. Daniel, counsel for Plaintiff, and Jeffrey M. Beemer, counsel for Defendants, appeared via Microsoft Teams. Case deadlines and Local Rules requirements were discussed. Scheduling Order to be entered. (jad)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER:(NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED, JUDGE CHANGE ONLY) Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 12/18/2023 at 3:30 PM in Virtual before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Vallonda Pettway at Vallonda_Pettway@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.A court reporter is required for this proceeding. (vup)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alysha Bowers, Michael Bowers. (Gentry, Autumn)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Gentry, Autumn)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alysha Bowers, Michael Bowers.(Gentry, Autumn)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Melissia Francis of Service of 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Daniel, Benjamin)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2023.Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/6/2023. (shl)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for MONDAY, DECEMBER 18, 2023 at 3:30 P.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings. The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. (mmm)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on November 17, 2023. (shl)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint (Unopposed) by Alysha Bowers, Michael Bowers. (Gentry, Autumn)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
November 10, 2023 Filing 2 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj) (agj).
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number 4106-23, Div. IX (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4277849), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Defendants' Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Notice of Removal to Parties, #4 Exhibit Ex, 3 Defendants' Notice to Clerk of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex. A Notice of Removal to Clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gentry, Autumn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissia Francis
Represented By: Benjamin Lundy Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alysha Bowers
Represented By: Autumn L. Gentry
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Beemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bowers
Represented By: Autumn L. Gentry
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Beemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?