Mays v. AWE Lakeview LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valacia Mays
Defendant: AWE Lakeview LLC doing business as The Residences at Lakeview also known as Willow Lake Apartments, Willow Lake Apartments and Birge & Held Property Management, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02730
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/4/24. (seh)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: A Jury Trial has been set for Tuesday, February 18, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 24, 2025. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, January 31, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status/Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 1/4/2024. Elaine Scheng for the appeared for the plaintiff(s). Logan A. Klauss and Garrett H. OBrien appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. A Jury Trial has been set for Tuesday, February 18, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 24, 2025. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, January 31, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Polly Wardlaw) (smm)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (O'Brien, Garrett)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Birge & Held Property Management, LLC.(O'Brien, Garrett)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Birge & Held Property Management, LLC (Turner, Robert)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 1/3/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Brad Gilmartin at bradley_gilmartin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (btg)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AWE Lakeview LLC.(Klauss, Logan)
November 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Alexander Klauss on behalf of AWE Lakeview LLC (Klauss, Logan)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Feigelson on behalf of AWE Lakeview LLC (Feigelson, David)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birge & Held Property Management, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4334-23 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4282308), filed by Birge & Held Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service on Birge & Held)(O'Brien, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. AWE Lakeview LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWE Lakeview LLC doing business as The Residences at Lakeview also known as Willow Lake Apartments
Represented By: David I. Feigelson
Represented By: Logan Alexander Klauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Lake Apartments
Represented By: David I. Feigelson
Represented By: Logan Alexander Klauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birge & Held Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Garrett Hunter O'Brien
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valacia Mays
Represented By: Elaine Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?