TCB Amerispec, LLC v. Ogle et al
Plaintiff: TCB Amerispec, LLC
Defendant: Valerie Ogle, Michael Ogle, Rodney Derrek Denard, Michael Loan, Don Norton, Donny Williams, Georgia Home Inspections, LLC and All Atlanta Inspections, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02741
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
2 Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING TRO HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 01/02/2024. (eoc)
January 2, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement Pending by TCB Amerispec, LLC (Gray, Michael)
January 2, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF LOCATION CHANGE: The TRO Hearing set before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla for Wednesday, January 3, 2024 at 9:30 AM will proceed in Courtroom 7 on the 9th floor of the Odell Horton Federal Building. (jrs)
December 6, 2023 Filing 24 SETTING LETTER: The Temporary Restraining Order Hearing has been RESET to Wednesday, January 3, 2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Postpone Hearing. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/6/2023. (msr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing re #14 Order Setting Hearing on Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO POSTPONE TRO HEARING DATE by TCB Amerispec, LLC. (Gray, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Filing 21 Certificate of Plaintiff's Certification Re TRO Motion and Hearing Notice by TCB Amerispec, LLC. (Gray, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/5/2023. (msr)
December 4, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCB Amerispec, LLC as to Michael Loan. (Gray, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCB Amerispec, LLC as to Don Norton. (Gray, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCB Amerispec, LLC as to Georgia Home Inspections, LLC. (Gray, Michael)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: A Temporary Restraining Order Hearing has been set for Thursday, December 7, 2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #11 . Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/01/2023. (msr)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla added. Judge Mark S. Norris no longer assigned to case pursuant to DE #13 . (agj)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE AND DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/30/23. (Norris, Mark)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT Memorandum of Law in Support and Appendix of Cases to #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, proposed Order submitted by TCB Amerispec, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Cases, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Gray, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, proposed Order submitted by TCB Amerispec, LLC. (Gray, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4066523; 4066524; 2524568; 1497266; . (Gray, Michael)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT NOTICE: Please note that if patents or trademarks are being added to this case, the filing party should complete form AO-120, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list. The AO-120 form can be found at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/ on the Forms and Applications page. (cdi)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lewis Wardlaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wardlaw, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Valerie Ogle. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Atlanta Inspections, LLC, Rodney Derrek Denard, Georgia Home Inspections, LLC, Michael Loan, Don Norton, Michael Ogle, Valerie Ogle, Donny Williams. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 summons, #7 summons)(jae)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4285314), filed by TCB Amerispec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Valerie Ogle, #3 Summons for Michael Ogle, #4 Summons for Rodney Derrek Denard, #5 Summons for Michael P. Loan, #6 Summons for Wilburn D. Norton, #7 Summons Jimmy D. Williams, #8 Summons Georgia Home Inspection, LLC - Corporate Service Company, Registered Agent, #9 Summons Georgia Home Inspection, LLC - Attn: Rodney Derrek Denard, Member, #10 Summons All Atlanta Inspections, LLC - Rodney Denard Registered Agent, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit J, #21 Exhibit K)(Gray, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCB Amerispec, LLC v. Ogle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCB Amerispec, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Gray
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Derrek Denard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Home Inspections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Atlanta Inspections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?