Richardson v. Leon Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Richardson
Defendant: Leon Trucking, LLC and Stamm Media Tech Inc
Not Classified By Court: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02742
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE by Kenneth Richardson re #25 Notice (Other) Corrected Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Farraj, Mohammed)
January 12, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE by Kenneth Richardson Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure (Farraj, Mohammed)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 12/21/2023. (Claxton, Charmiane)
December 21, 2023 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: A JURY TRIAL has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. Trial is expected to last approximately 3 days. A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE will be held on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2025 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. All counsel participating in the trial must be present in person at the pretrial conference. A PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER must be furnished to the Court by JANUARY 31, 2025. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED PRETRIAL PROCEDURES.(mmm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Microsoft Teams Video Scheduling Conference held on 12/21/2023. Mohammed Farraj appeared for the Plaintiff. Carl Wyatt appeared for Defendant, Leon Trucking, LLC. Joseph R. Wheeler appeared for Defendant, Stamm Media Tech Inc. John R. McCarroll, III and Nicholas A. Casseb also appeared for Stamm Media Tech Inc but did not participate in the conference. Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 2/18/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/7/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2025. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)(mmm)
December 18, 2023 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the FRCP. (Farraj, Mohammed)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 RE-SETTING LETTER / NEW DATE / NOW SET BEFORE REFERRAL JUDGE: Scheduling Conference RESET for Thursday, 12/21/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. A court reporter is required for this proceeding. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Melanie Mullen at melanie_mullen@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (jpw)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION Mediator Stipulation by Leon Trucking, LLC, Stamm Media Tech Inc. (Wyatt, Carl)
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION of all parties as to mediator by Leon Trucking, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. McCarroll, III on behalf of Stamm Media Tech Inc (McCarroll, John)
December 10, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Leon Trucking, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
December 10, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leon Trucking, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Leon Trucking, LLC (Wyatt, Carl)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT LEON TRUCKING, LLC TO SHOW CAUSE.Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/5/2023. (shl)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Casseb on behalf of Stamm Media Tech Inc (Casseb, Nicholas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stamm Media Tech Inc.(Wheeler, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Stamm Media Tech, Inc. on October 27, 2023, filed by Kenneth Richardson. (Farraj, Mohammed)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ATNWDC4286810 (jae)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for MONDAY, DECEMBER 18, 2023 at 4:30 P.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings. The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. (mmm)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stamm Media Tech Inc has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the civil case filing fee was not paid. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stamm Media Tech Inc. (Wheeler, Joseph)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stamm Media Tech Inc from Shelby County, TN Circuit Court, case number CT-4076-23, filed by Stamm Media Tech Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet & Addendum, #2 Exhibit Exh. A-Complaint & Summons-Shelby Cir. Ct., #3 Exhibit Exh. B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal-Shelby Cir. Ct.)(Wheeler, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Leon Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Richardson
Represented By: Mohammed Farraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stamm Media Tech Inc
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: John R. McCarroll, III
Represented By: Nicholas A. Casseb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?