Blake v. Universal Protection Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Blake
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC, Allied Universal Security Services, Security Forces, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank Association and John Doe
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2024cv02025
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #26 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/11/2024. (shl)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #27 MOTION TO REMOVE ATTORNEYS FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/11/2024. (shl)
March 6, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank Association of Service of Initial Disclosures (Floyd, Lesley)
March 6, 2024 Filing 28 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Universal Protection Service, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note : Proposed order are not to be published on ECF, but only emailed to chambers in word format. If no order previously emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
March 5, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lamb, D. Craig)
February 23, 2024 Filing 26 First MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint by Ronald Blake. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Wener, Lester)
February 22, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE by Ronald Blake Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Wener, Lester)
February 22, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from ronald blake by Ronald Blake.(Wener, Lester)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/21/2024. (shl)
February 21, 2024 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: A JURY TRIAL has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for MONDAY, MARCH 24, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. Trial is expected to last approximately 2-3 days.A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE will be held on THURSDAY, MARCH 13, 2025 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. All counsel participating in the trial must be present in person at the pretrial conference.A PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER must be furnished to the Court by MARCH 6, 2025.PLEASE SEE ATTACHED PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. (mmm)
February 21, 2024 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Microsoft Teams Video Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2024. Andrew L. Wener appeared for the Plaintiff. Tracy A Overstreet appeared for defendant, Wells Fargo Bank Association. Jury Trial set for Monday, 3/24/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, 3/13/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2025. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (mmm)
February 20, 2024 Filing 20 JUDGMENT. DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LLC TERMINATED. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/20/2024. (shl)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONSTRUING #17 AGREED ORDER AS A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/20/2024. (shl)
February 19, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley Floyd on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Association (Floyd, Lesley)
February 19, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Universal Protection Service, LLC (Lamb, D. Craig)
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Overstreet, Tracy)
February 6, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Universal Protection Service, LLC re #14 Notice (Other) Exhibit 1 Answer (Lamb, D. Craig)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE by Universal Protection Service, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental (Lamb, D. Craig)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ronald Blake. (Wener, Lester)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/6/2024. (shl)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A Overstreet on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Association (Overstreet, Tracy)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie K Durrett on behalf of Universal Protection Service, LLC (Durrett, Jamie)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LLC TO RESPOND. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/19/2024. (shl)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting 30-day enlargement of time to answer or file a Response)(Lamb, D. Craig)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2024 at 2:00 P.M. (CST) before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Melanie Mullen at melanie_mullen@tnwd.uscourts.gov if you have any questions. (jpw)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Lamb, D. Craig)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Universal Protection Service, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CI-5092-23 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4319172), filed by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-State Court Record)(Lamb, D. Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Universal Protection Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC
Represented By: D. Craig Lamb
Represented By: Jamie K Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Universal Security Services
Represented By: D. Craig Lamb
Represented By: Jamie K Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Forces, LLC
Represented By: D. Craig Lamb
Represented By: Jamie K Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Association
Represented By: Tracy A Overstreet
Represented By: Lesley Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Blake
Represented By: Andrew L. Wener
Represented By: Lester T. Wener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?