Santos et al v. Linchris Hotel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Albert Santos and Junior Almonte
Defendant: Linchris Hotel Corporation and LCBV Memphis Operating, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2024cv02106
Filed: February 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/8/2024. (shl)
April 8, 2024 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: A JURY TRIAL has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for TUESDAY, MAY 27, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. Trial is expected to last approximately 2-3 days.A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE will be held on FRIDAY, MAY 16, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. All counsel participating in the trial must be present in person at the pretrial conference.A PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER must be furnished to the Court by MAY 9, 2025.PLEASE SEE ATTACHED PRETRIAL PROCEDURES.(mmm)
April 8, 2024 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Microsoft Teams Video Scheduling Conference held on 4/8/2024. Taylor A. Cates appeared for the Plaintiffs. Charles Gavin Shepherd appeared for the Defendants. Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 5/27/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 5/16/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2025. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (mmm)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cates, Taylor)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been RESET for MONDAY, APRIL 8, 2024 at 1:30 P.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings. The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. (mmm)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is reset for Monday, April 8, 2024 at 1:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/11/2024. (mmm)
March 7, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by LCBV Memphis Operating, LLC, Linchris Hotel Corporation. (Shepherd, Charles)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LCBV Memphis Operating, LLC, Linchris Hotel Corporation.(Shepherd, Charles)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for WEDNESDAY, APRIL 3, 2024 at 9:00 A.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings. The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. (mmm)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 19, 2024 Filing 3 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
February 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by LCBV Memphis Operating, LLC, Linchris Hotel Corporation to Adverse Parties of Removal and Certification of Notice to State Court Clerk (Shepherd, Charles)
February 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0130-24 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4347219), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons on Defendants, #2 Exhibit Complaint for Property Damage and Personal Injuries, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shepherd, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. Linchris Hotel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Santos
Represented By: Robert L. Gatewood, Jr
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Almonte
Represented By: Robert L. Gatewood, Jr
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linchris Hotel Corporation
Represented By: Charles Gavin Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCBV Memphis Operating, LLC
Represented By: Charles Gavin Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?