Durham v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Durham
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Jamita Swearengen
Case Number: 2:2024cv02116
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 04/22/2024. (eoc)
April 16, 2024 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Letter Supplementing Scheduling Conference by Tammy Durham. (Rosania, Giovanni)
April 15, 2024 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, July 14, 2025 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla in a courtroom to be determined. A Pretrial Conference has been set for Wednesday, July 2, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 4:30 PM on June 25, 2025. (jrs)
April 15, 2024 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/15/2024. Giovanni Rosania appeared for the plaintiff. Nelson Rainey appeared for the defendant. Case background information and disclosures reviewed. Nature of injuries, extent of damages, and timeline reviewed. Phase 2 26(A) disclosures will be due by April 29, 2024. Correct parties are before the court. An amended complaint is unnecessary. Rule 12 Motions will not be filed. Additional dates/deadlines discussed and a schedule set. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, July 14, 2025 at 9:30 AM. The trial is expected to take 3 to 4 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Wednesday, July 2, 2025 at 9:30 AM in courtroom 7. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 4:30 PM on June 25, 2025. A Scheduling Order will be due. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 04/12/2024. (eoc)
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is SET for MONDAY, APRIL 15, 2024 at 9:30 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
April 5, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanni Rosania on behalf of Tammy Durham (Rosania, Giovanni)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 04/02/2024. (eoc)
April 2, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue proposed Order submitted by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Rainey, Nelson)
March 22, 2024 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: The TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been RESET from TUESDAY, MARCH 26, 2024 at 10:45 A.M. (CT) to WEDNESAY, APRIL 3, 2024 at 9:30 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla.To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
March 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Tammy Durham Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Watson, Liberti)
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Dollar Tree Stores, Inc... (Rainey, Nelson)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Watson). Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 03/21/2024. (eoc)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Notice of Substitution (Telfeyan, Kelly)
March 15, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4366624) by Tammy Durham. (Watson, Liberti)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G Hamner on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Hamner, Julie)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is SET for TUESDAY, MARCH 26, 2024 at 10:45 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Rainey, Nelson)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0243-24 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4351877), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Summons, #4 Exhibit C, Entity Information)(Rainey, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jamita Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Durham
Represented By: Giovanni Rosania
Represented By: Liberti Anne Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Nelson Tyler Rainey
Represented By: Julie G Hamner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?