Bonds v. United States of America
Petitioner: Brandon Bonds
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv02205
Filed: April 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John Thomas Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Bedini, Naya)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 First MOTION to Extend Deadline filed by United States of America has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION to Extend Deadline by United States of America. (Bedini, Naya)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying DE #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 5/6/24. (Fowlkes, J.)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing the Government to Respond signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 5/6/24. (Fowlkes, J.)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brandon Bonds. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E. Hartridge on behalf of United States of America (Hartridge, Karen)
April 1, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
April 1, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence against United States of America, filed by Brandon Bonds. (Attachments: #1 Handwritten 2255, #2 Argument, #3 Envelope, #4 Case assignment label)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Karen E. Hartridge
Represented By: Naya Bedini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?