Gauthier et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Terri Gauthier doing business as Grace Plaza and David Gauthier doing business as Grace Plaza
Defendant: Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of America doing business as First National Insurance Company of America and/or American States Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00543
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs of court. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce any settlement. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/19/2011. (bjc)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the court enter judgment pursuant to settlement upon receipt of closing papers. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/12/11. (mrp, )
September 12, 2011 Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn no longer assigned to case. (mrp, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs' claims against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company are dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs of court. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/12/11. (mrp, )
September 8, 2011 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Catherine)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re Closing Papers. It is ordered that the parties submit closing papers within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/7/11. (mrp, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of U. S. Magistrate Judge that the court should enter judgment pursuant to the parties' agreed settlement upon receipt of closing papers from Plaintiffs and Defendant Safeco.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/7/11. (mrp, )
August 26, 2011 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mouney, Kristie)
August 4, 2011 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines no longer assigned to the case. (pkb, )
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TRe Closing Papers. It is ordered that the parties submit closing papers within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/4/11. (mrp, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall designate expert witnesses in writing and provide expert reports by 8/8/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 7/20/11. (mrp, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 34 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Designation of Experts by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benavides, Michelle)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference is set for 7/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Discovery due by 3/16/2012. Motions due by 3/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 6/21/11. (mrp, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and denying #21 Motion to Compel Appraisal as Moot. An amended scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 6/21/11. (mrp, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Franta, Kevin)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Produce Expert Reports. Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America must produce their expert reports by 7/15/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 6/9/11. (mrp, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and to Abate filed by David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(South, Jackey)
June 1, 2011 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Produce Expert Reports by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franta, Kevin)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to defendant's motion to compel appraisal and abate. Plaintiff's response due by 6/3/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 5/18/11. (mrp, )
May 17, 2011 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and to Abate by David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 memo, #2 Proposed Order)(South, Jackey) Modified on 5/18/2011 (mrp, ).
May 16, 2011 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support re #21 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and to Abate filed by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Benavides, Michelle)
May 16, 2011 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued 5/16/11 as to Safeco Insurance Company of America by serving American States Insurance Company and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service. (mrp, )
May 5, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Disclosure by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Benavides, Michelle)
May 3, 2011 Filing 22 ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT re #21 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and to Abate by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-2)(Franta, Kevin) Modified on 5/4/2011 (pkb, ).
May 2, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and to Abate by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1 (part 1), #5 Exhibit C-2 (part 2), #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Appraisal and to Abate)(Franta, Kevin)
April 11, 2011 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of America d/b/a American States Insurance Company and emailed to pla's atty for service. (mrp, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference is reset for 1/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2011. Discovery due by 8/5/2011. Motions due by 8/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 4/8/11. (mrp, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint no later than 4/29/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 4/8/11. (mrp, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference is set for 1/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2011. Discovery due by 8/5/2011. Motions due by 8/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 4/8/11. (mrp, )
April 4, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Benavides on behalf of Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Benavides, Michelle)
March 29, 2011 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mouney, Kristie)
March 9, 2011 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (mrp, )
March 9, 2011 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(South, Jackey)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. It is ordered that the Clerk of Court shall file Docket No. 11, Exhibit 1 as defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America's Amended Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 3/8/11. (mrp, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Catherine)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 2/15/11. (mrp, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADVISORY ORDER. This case is assigned for trial to Judge Marcia A. Crone, and is referred to the undersigned magistrate judge for pretrial proceedings. Judge Crone's procedures and rules of practice govern this action unless the parties cause it to be reassigned by consent.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 2/15/11. (mrp, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial for Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Mouney, Kristie)
February 11, 2011 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Mouney, Kristie)
February 11, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mrp, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Hanna, Catherine)
January 20, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackey White South on behalf of David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier (South, Jackey)
January 12, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company & Safeco Insurance Company of America & e-mailed to plas' atty for service (aam, )
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to extend time to serve process. Plaintiff shall serve defendant with process no later than 1/27/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on 1/12/11. (mrp, )
January 7, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by David Gauthier, Terri Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lundy, Matthew)
September 10, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2661067.), filed by Terri Gauthier, David Gauthier.(Lundy, Matthew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/10/2010) (aam, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aam, ).
September 9, 2010 Case Assigned to Judge Marcia A. Crone and Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines. (aam, )
September 9, 2010 The following attorney was contacted on 9/9/2010 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of Texas: plaintiff atty Jackey W. South. (aam, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines pursuant to 28 USC 636(a) and Appendix B of the Local Rules for the Eastern District of Texas (aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Gauthier doing business as Grace Plaza
Represented By: Jackey White South
Represented By: Matthew Edward Lundy
Represented By: Kevin James Franta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gauthier doing business as Grace Plaza
Represented By: Jackey White South
Represented By: Matthew Edward Lundy
Represented By: Kevin James Franta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin James Franta
Represented By: Michelle Benavides
Represented By: Kristie Luke Mouney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America doing business as First National Insurance Company of America and/or American States Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine Love Hanna
Represented By: Kevin James Franta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?