Armstrong et al v. A & L Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexis Yuri Lobo, Jesse Askew, Julio C Salinas-Garza, Devan Mitchem, Mario Vicente Acevedo, Anthony L Ward, Vicki A. Clark, Ben D Ellis, Richard Wayne Bell, Robert Keither Lamar, Manuel Cordero, III, Carl Wilkerson, Sr., Lafayet Barrera-Gonzalez, Michael Earl Davis, Walter Joseph McFarland, Hector Jimenez Vera, Jose Gilberto Garcia, Larry Wayne Meeks, Leslie D Mancil, James Franklin Costlow, David Cruz, Randy Glenn Britnell, Francisco Jarquin, Jesus G Puente, Sr., Davy Howard Wolfe, II, Doel Pastor Cruz-Rivera, Hugo Mariano Raymundo, Joseph Randall Holcomb, Susan Trevino, Roland Arnold Mann, Jr., James I Rayer, Jr., Varghese Vembi Pappukunju, Walter Douglas Wackenreuter, Jordan Alexander Grant, Rolando Perez, Pedro Rodriguez, Jr., Chris Grote, Rosalio Lugo Blanco, Freddy A. Araica, Jose Antonio Compean, Jr., Kevin Townley, Sheila Anderson Folse, Ronald McFarlin, David Louis Langley, Guadalupe Benjamin Garza, David Acosta Loera, Dale Winford Jones, Javetta Leather, Juan C Villatoro, Raul Flores-Regino, Richard Wiltz, Jr., Aliber Marroquin Cantu, Donanthony Spitaleri, Glenn Garette Landry, Colby Alan Howell, Bradley Farris Yarborough, Adrian Young, Joel Echevarria Torres, Jason Clyde Darrell, Shawna Donzaile Dodd, David Garcia Delacruz, Kenneth Spencer, Jr., Variath D Marottikudy, Edward Allen Sonnier, Julio Cesar Castillo-Honorato, Brian Allan Davis, Rafael Ceja, Jr., Charles A Lacy, Jr., Jesus Villarreal, Joshua Caleb Miller, Varkey Kolackal Johnson, Rolland Craig Allen, Douglas Edward Tubbs, Jesus Magallon, Zaragoza Tijerina Garza, Jarvis DeQuan Jones, John Lee Winkelmann, Joseph Fazio, Kristopher Montalvo, Thomas Rayborn, Ruben Zamora, Monica Owens Sherman, Louis Joseph Deshotel, Guadalupe Ortega, Rebecca Fortenberry Meeks, Ethelwoldo Segarra, Michael Aaron Mann, Cynthia Renee Turner, Kunhikrishnan K Veetil, Erick Rios Marroquin, Charles L Hagebusch, III, Sergio Marroquin Cantu, Juan L. Cantu-Garcia, Kimberly Bergeaux, Homero Monreal, Luis Angel Vargas, Nelson O Pacheco-Ramos, Spencer McGarrett Washington, Carlos L Gomez, Jack G Oppert, Jr., Olin Gilbert, Elizabeth Ann Arguello, Lawrence Dufrain, Natividad Quintanilla, Keith Ingle, Mark Tolbert, Trenton Tyler Ingle, William Warren Wesberry, Jr., Lewis Carl Lambert, Bruce Barnard, Lupe Trevino, Jerry Dale Massey, Jorge Falcon, Tammy Renee Knight, Jeffery Arnold Tullar, Juan Jose Carrillo, Leonard Jacob Goudeau, Clarence Melvin Ingle, III, Christopher Bergeaux, James Kenneth Chaney, Sr., Randy Ingle, Marvin Romero, David Harrison Young, Martin Coronado Acuna, Richard Morgan Radford, Dulcey Ann Prine, Adan Guerrero, Daniel Glen Hester, Varghese Paily Kulianickal, Rose Mary Whitehead, Eulalio Pasillas Salas, Justin Scott Moussette, Reji Kileekkal Varughese, Cleon Carraway, Jose Javier Sanches, Jace Picou, Kevin Wayne Duhon, Gene Ross East, Anthony Daniel Mayo, David A Loera, Wesley Turner, Anibal Ruben Ortiz, Jesus Puente, Jr., Ricky Lee Stokes, Zachary Schaver, Michael P. Carrier, Kent Parks, Gerald J Kinchen, Ralphel T Steptoe, Mauricio Castro Estrada, Jorge Armando Pinon, Leroy Robinson, Jr., Alejos Rodriguez-Tamez, Jody Woodruff, Carlos Cordova, Travis Trinord Harris, Andy Hudson, Jeremiah Casey Jones, Edgar Omar Portillo, Cherrie Steptoe, Robert James Mendoza, Oscar F Reyes, Omar A Delgadillo, Violeta Sentiol Ramirez, Vernie Sutton, Gregory Donnell Fleming, Maximiano Sanchez Gutierrez, John Garcia, Jr., Jose Gavito Rodriguez, Jonathan Neil Stanton, Agustin Miguel Jimenez, Christopher Elizondo, James Vaughn, Mildred Marie Hayes, Darin Kevin Hargrove, Cassandra Marie Tait, Ramon Humberto Natal, John Kerri Gray, Waylon Michael Symmank, Julio Cesar Cantu, Javier H. Mendez Gonzalez, Martin David Johnson, Willie Daniel Hunter, II, Cory Lynn Baldwin, Ramiro Gonzalez, Jr, Fermah Smith, Patricia Andrade, Julius Joseph Janca, Jr, Ruben D Hernandez, Rocky Dean Hudson, Jeremy Dermon Hawkins, Unnikrishna Pillai Balakrishnapilla, Marco Antonio Rivera, Erick Garcia, Jerrett Ray Armstrong, Jose Luis Quezeda Mora, Ronald Ray Sims, Usiel Sernon, Ricky Arnaud, James Earl Wade, Douglas E Peach, Kenneth Budwine, Jr., Oscar Torres Castillo, Daniel Ozuna, Miguel A Trejo, Carroll Henry Ballard, Carlos Alberto Solis, Bo Williams, Brandon M. Bolton, Magda G Kelly, Alvaro Valencia, Mayolo Benitez Leon, Larry Basco, Pedro Pena Perez, Weldon Barker, James V Taylor, Jeremy Ryan Gulley, Sadashivanachary Janardhananachary, Milton Spears, James C Rogers, Leia Culpepper Williams, Lynn Todd Neuman, Chase Michael McMains, Jason Wayne Verrett, Sergio Antonio Delfin, Troy Favorite, Mario Serrano Carrillo, Hector Hernandez Velazquez, K. E. Barker, James L. Brantley, All Plaintiffs, Anthony Joseph Berg II, Jeffrey C Swarner, Malcolm Ryan Wilburn, Juan A Sanchez-Rodriguez, Claude Douglas Shute, Juan Pablo Garcia, Zach Marwan Achkar, Dalton Joseph Antoine, Christopher Lee Jackson, Gerardo Vazquez Ortega, Robin Keith Boul, Dustin David James, Eric Butler, April Johnson-Green, Oscar Armando Rivera, Antonio Gerardo Velazquez, Tyrone Nash, David William Meyers, Pablo Villeda-Cabriales, Carl Alan Clark, Dennis Joseph Duplantis, Daniel T. Ball, Jose Reynaldo Salinas, Justin Ryan Lambright, Randy Dewayne Kelsoe, Eliseo Garcia, Sam Boudreaux Scott, Victor Manuel Sanchez-Martinez, Michael Crim, Erwin Haroldo Morales, Jesus Alonzo Garcia, Daniel Eschevarria Torres, Mario Cruz Urbano, Kevin Thomas, Heidi C Wymer, Pedro Rodriguez, Alejandro Sandoval Garcia, Kevin Lane Williams, II, David William Huff, John Daniel Howell, II, Peter L McCarthy, Elson Dennis Vidrine, Eddie Alberto Colon, Milton Hardin, Jerry Leon Shane, Manuel Jose Gutierrez, Michael Alvin Freeman, Joey Lynn Parks, Lee R Ramos, Arthur Lee Richards and Robert J Lawler, Jr
Defendant: ISC Constructors, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, A & L Industrial Services, Inc., Empire Scaffold, LLC, Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Baker Concrete Services, LLC, Turner Industries Group, LLC, Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, ISC, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter Inc and S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.
Petitioner: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00228
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING this case. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/24/14. (tkd, )
April 8, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore documents # 201-202 filed by plaintiffs. These are discovery documents which are not accepted for filing by this court. (tkd, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 202 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Withdrawal of Objection to Defendant's Master Interrogatory No. 6 (Frasher, Mark) Modified on 4/8/2014 (tkd, ).
April 8, 2014 Filing 201 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Proposed Master Discovery (refiling) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Frasher, Mark) Modified on 4/8/2014 (tkd, ).
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER that pltfs with claims against a particular defendant are transferred in accordance with #182 Order of Severance and #185 Spreadsheet as follows: 1:14cv67 Victor Aguirre v. ISC Constructors LLC f/k/a Industrial SpecialtyContractors; 1:13cv367 Fabian Mata-Arroyo v. Baker Concrete Construction Inc; 1:13cv382 Jairo Aguillon v. Performance Contractors Inc; 1:14cv78 Mildred Marie Hayes v. KTMC Turnaround Group LLC Maintenance; 1:14cv79 Kenneth Budwine Jr. v. G.P. Industrial Contractors; 1:13cv385 Alfred Dean v. Total Industrial Plant Services Inc. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/10/14. (tkd, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that pltfs with claims against a particular defendant are transferred and reassigned to the docket of Judge Marcia Crone in accordance with #182 Order of Severance and #185 Spreadsheet as follows: 1:14cv60 Rolland Craig Allen v. Tracer Industries Management Co Inc. 1:04cv61 Omar A. Delgadillo v. Turner Industries Group LLC; 1:14cv62 Mario Vicente Acevedo v. S&B Engineers and Constructors Ltd; 1:14cv63 Sergio Antonio Delfin v. A&L Industrial Services Inc; 1:14cv64 Jose Antonio Compean Jr. v. Empire Scaffold LLC; 1:14cv65 Daniel T. Ball v. Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC; 1:14cv66 Jesus Puente Jr. v. RMF Nooter, Inc. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/10/14. (tkd, )
January 26, 2014 Filing 198 REPLY to Response to #196 MOTION to Dismiss or Quash Summons filed by ISC Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Myers, Sarah) Modified on 1/27/2014 (tkd, ).
January 15, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore the Motion to Extend Time for Service included with document #197, Response to Motion to Dismiss or Quash. The motion must be filed separately. (tkd, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION to Dismiss or Quash Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Frasher, Mark) Please ignore the Motion to Extend Time for Service included with this response. Modified on 1/16/2014 (tkd, ).
December 23, 2013 Filing 196 MOTION to Dismiss or Quash Summons by ISC Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Sarah) Modified on 12/26/2013 (tkd, ).
December 17, 2013 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by A & L Industrial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wisdom, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2013: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
November 27, 2013 Filing 194 SUMMONS issued as to ISC Constructors LLC and emailed to pltf's attorney for service (tkd, )
October 18, 2013 Filing 193 BRIEF filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Master Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frasher, Mark)
October 17, 2013 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #176 MOTION to Quash Pltfs' Cross-Deposition Notices and for Protective Order filed by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lighty, Donald)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying as moot #173 Motion to Quash and #174 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/17/13. (tkd, )
October 16, 2013 NOTICE of CANCELLATION: Hearing set for 10/18/13 @ 1:30pm in Beaumont has been CANCELLED. (fal, )
October 16, 2013 Filing 190 NOTICE of Agreement by All Plaintiffs re #173 Amended MOTION to Quash and #174 MOTION for Protective Order (Frasher, Mark) Modified on 10/17/2013 (tkd, ).
October 15, 2013 Filing 189 RESPONSE to Motion re #176 MOTION to Quash Pltfs' Cross-Deposition Notices and for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frasher, Mark)
October 10, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Objection to Defendant's Master Interrogatory No. 6 (Frasher, Mark)
October 9, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Proposed Master Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Frasher, Mark)
October 9, 2013 Filing 186 PROPOSED MASTER DISCOVERY re #184 Order, #170 Order filed by A & L Industrial Services, Inc., Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, ISC, LLC, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter Inc, S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shirley, Melissa) Modified on 10/9/2013 (tkd, ).
October 9, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE of Filing Spreadsheet by All Plaintiffs re #182 Order (Attachments: #1 Spreadsheet Identifying Each Plaintiff and his or her Respective Employer)(Frasher, Mark) Modified on 10/9/2013 (tkd, ).
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #183 Motion for extension of time to submit master discovery; new deadline is 10/8/13. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/4/13. (tkd, )
October 2, 2013 Filing 183 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Master Discovery and for Expedited Consideration by A & L Industrial Services, Inc., All Plaintiffs, Baker Concrete Services, LLC, Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, ISC, LLC, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter Inc, S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
September 30, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #176 MOTION to Quash Pltfs' Cross-Deposition Notices and for Protective Order, #173 Opposed MOTION to Quash : Hearing set for 10/18/2013 01:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER SEVERING DEFENDANTS and granting #45 , #69 , #75 , #77 , #80 , #81 , #82 , #160 , #164 and #165 Motions to Sever. All defendants in this case will be severed. Pltfs are ordered, within 21 days, to file a spreadsheet identifying each pltf and his/her respective employer to enable the Clerk to sever the defts and open new cases. The additional filing fee for the new cases will be waived. Any objections to the possible consolidation are due by 10/15/13. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/27/13. (tkd, )
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 Joint Motion for extension of time to submit master discovery; new deadline is 10/3/13. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/23/13. (tkd, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 180 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Master Discovery and for Expedited Consideration by A & L Industrial Services Inc, All Plaintiffs, Baker Concrete Services LLC, Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, ISC LLC, KTMC Turnaround Group LLC, Performance Contractors Inc, RMF Nooter Inc, S & B Engineers and Constructors Ltd, Total Industrial Plant Services Inc, Tracer Industries Management Co Inc, Turner Industries Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shirley, Melissa) Modified on 9/24/2013 (tkd, ).
September 23, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE of Impending Severance. Any objections to this procedure are due by 9/25/13. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/20/13. (tkd, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 178 RESPONSE to Motion re #174 Amended MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frasher, Mark) Modified on 9/17/2013 (tkd, ).
September 16, 2013 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion re #173 Opposed MOTION to Quash filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Frasher, Mark) Modified on 9/17/2013 (tkd, ).
September 16, 2013 Filing 176 MOTION to Quash Pltfs' Cross-Deposition Notices and for Protective Order by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lighty, Donald) Modified on 9/17/2013 (tkd, ).
September 4, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark William Frasher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frasher, Mark)
August 30, 2013 Filing 174 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Amended by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack)
August 30, 2013 Filing 173 Opposed MOTION to Quash by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack)
August 29, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #172, Motion to Quash and for Protective Order by Motiva Enterprises. Motions will be refiled to comply with Local Rules re: multi-part motions, searchable PDF's and format of proposed order. (tkd, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 172 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.Opposed MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack) Modified on 8/30/2013 (tkd, ).
August 19, 2013 Filing 171 Joint Proposal for Master Discovery Order by all parties. (Werner, John) Modified on 8/20/2013 (tkd, ).
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDERED that Plaintiff's #94 Motion for protection from written discovery is granted in part. Plaintiff's #93 Motion for extension of time to respond to outstanding discovery is granted. Accordingly, Plaintiff's #147 Motion to Withdraw or extend response time is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/10/2013. (bjc)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to certify a collective action pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act, and to approve a proposednotification to all putative collective action members [Doc. # 89] is denied. Defendants motion to strike the motion to certify [Docs. # 95] and motions for leave to file untimely responses to Plaintiffs motion [Doc. # 97, 142, 166] are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/10/2013. (bjc)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #159 Motion to substitute Exhibit C - Affidavit in #109 Response to Motion to certify collective action. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/7/13. (tkd, )
April 11, 2013 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Proposed Order to Join Lawsuit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mabry, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2013 (tkd, ).
April 11, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act and to Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mabry, Daniel)
March 28, 2013 Filing 165 MOTION to Sever by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Lighty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2013: #1 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 18, 2013 Filing 164 MOTION to Sever by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc.. (Mabry, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2013: #1 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 4, 2013 Filing 163 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #92 First Amended Complaint by Turner Industries Group, LLC.(Lighty, Donald) Modified on 3/5/2013 (tkd, ).
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting Turner Industries Group LLC's #158 Motion for leave to file amended answer to first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/25/13. (tkd, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's #116 motion to strike and Plaintiffs' #145 motion for extension of time to reply to Defendant's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/20/2013. (bjc)
January 30, 2013 Filing 160 MOTION to Sever by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Petersen, Grant) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2013: #1 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
January 28, 2013 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Affidavit in #109 Response to Motion by Performance Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C)(Shirley, Melissa) Modified on 1/29/2013 (tkd, ).
January 15, 2013 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lighty, Donald)
January 3, 2013 Filing 157 ANSWER to #92 First Amended Complaint by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. (Petersen, Grant) Modified on 1/4/2013 (tkd, ).
January 2, 2013 Filing 156 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shirley, Melissa)
December 28, 2012 Filing 155 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc..(Mabry, Daniel)
December 28, 2012 Filing 154 Amended ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd..(Herring, Danielle)
December 26, 2012 Filing 153 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by RMF Nooter Inc.(Pezza, Brian)
December 26, 2012 Filing 152 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by Empire Scaffold, LLC.(Hill, Patricia)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, denying #124 Motion to Stay and denying #132 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/14/12. (mrp, )
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Leave to File Response. The court will consider GP Industrial's response to Plaintiffs' motion to certify - attached to Exhibit A to GP Industrial's motion for leave to file #126 as timely. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/14/12. (mrp, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting deft S&B Engineers and Constructors Ltd's #148 Motion to withdraw their #119 Motion to strike the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/5/12. (tkd, )
December 3, 2012 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #119 Opposed MOTION to Strike #92 Amended Complaint by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Modified on 12/4/2012 (tkd, ).
December 3, 2012 Filing 147 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions or, In the Alternative, Extend Time for Response (Also Response to Docket Number 116) by Robin Keith Boul, Joshua Caleb Miller, Oscar F Reyes, Malcolm Ryan Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
December 3, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 146, motion to withdraw deemed admissions. Incomplete pdf document. PLEASE IGNORE. Atty will refile.*** (bjc)
November 30, 2012 Filing 146 ***FILE IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw #116 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Robin Keith Boul, Oscar F. Reyes, Joshua Caleb Miller and Malcolm Ryan Wilbrun's Responses and Objections to Requests for Admissions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 12/3/2012 (bjc, ).
November 30, 2012 Filing 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Docket Number 116 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
November 20, 2012 Filing 144 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 MOTION to Strike #92 Amended Complaint, #119 Opposed MOTION to Strike #92 Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 11/21/2012 (tkd, ).
November 19, 2012 Filing 143 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Headley, Linda)
November 15, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Collective Action and Approve Proposed notice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
November 13, 2012 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #134 Motion for extension of time to file response to #116 Motion to Strike; response due by 11/26/2012. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/13/12. (tkd, )
November 12, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #138, MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Responses to Motion to Certify Collective Action by All Plaintiffs. Motion is missing a certificate of conference and proposed order. (tkd, )
November 12, 2012 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John)
November 12, 2012 Filing 138 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Collective Action and Approve Proposed Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John) Modified on 11/13/2012 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by G P Industrial Contractors. (Parker, Carl)
November 12, 2012 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #126 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Collective Action and Approval Notification filed by G P Industrial Contractors. (Parker, Carl) Modified on 11/13/2012 (tkd, ).
November 9, 2012 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Werner, John)
November 7, 2012 Filing 134 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #116 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Robin Keith Boul, Oscar F. Reyes, Joshua Caleb Miller and Malcolm Ryan Wilbrun's Responses and Objections to Requests for Admissions With Stipulations by Robin Keith Boul, Joshua Caleb Miller, RMF Nooter Inc, Oscar F Reyes, Malcolm Ryan Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezza, Brian)
November 7, 2012 Filing 133 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by A & L Industrial Services, Inc..(Wisdom, William)
November 6, 2012 Filing 132 MOTION to Strike #92 Amended Complaint by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Conference, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
November 6, 2012 Filing 131 SUPPLEMENT to #122 Response to #94 Motion for Protection by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleary, James) Modified on 11/7/2012 (tkd, ).
November 6, 2012 Filing 130 Original ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC.(Cleary, James) Modified on 11/6/2012 (tkd, ).
November 5, 2012 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery filed by RMF Nooter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezza, Brian)
November 5, 2012 Filing 128 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Modified on 11/6/2012 (tkd, ).
November 5, 2012 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #93 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Outstanding Discovery to Deft S&B Engineers and Constructors Ltd filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda)
November 5, 2012 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Collective Action and Approval Notification by G P Industrial Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
November 5, 2012 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery Under FRCP 26(c) filed by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Case Law)(Shirley, Melissa)
November 5, 2012 Filing 124 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Two-part document; see also #120 Response to Motion. Modified on 11/5/2012 (tkd, ).
November 5, 2012 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia)
November 5, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery filed by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, James)
November 2, 2012 Filing 121 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Shirley, Melissa)
November 2, 2012 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Two-part document; see also #124 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Modified on 11/5/2012 (tkd, ).
November 2, 2012 Filing 119 Opposed MOTION to Strike #92 Amended Complaint by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. Responses due by 11/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Please ignore response deadline in this entry. Modified on 11/5/2012 (tkd, ).
November 2, 2012 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snider, Wyatt)
November 1, 2012 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by RMF Nooter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Vincent)
November 1, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Robin Keith Boul, Oscar F. Reyes, Joshua Caleb Miller and Malcolm Ryan Wilbrun's Responses and Objections to Requests for Admissions by RMF Nooter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Vincent)
November 1, 2012 Filing 115 Proposed NOTICE to Potential PCI Class Members by Performance Contractors, Inc. (Shirley, Melissa) Modified on 11/2/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by A & L Industrial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wisdom, William)
November 1, 2012 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cleary, James)
November 1, 2012 Filing 112 FILED IN ERROR. PDF's not searchable. Please ignore.RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heald, Russell) Modified on 11/2/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery Under FRCP 26(c) filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Grant)
November 1, 2012 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda)
November 1, 2012 Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in globo, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Shirley, Melissa) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/8/2013) (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Grant)
November 1, 2012 Filing 107 JOINDER in Tracer Industries' RESPONSE to #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC. (Snider, Wyatt) Modified on 11/2/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #105, Motion for Joinder by KTMC Turnaround Group. This is not a motion; document will be refiled using the correct menu event. (tkd, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lighty, Donald) Modified on 11/1/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 105 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Joinder in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC. (Snider, Wyatt) Modified on 11/1/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #104, Response to Motion to Certify a Collective Action by Turner Industries Group LLC. Document must be refiled to comply with the Clerk's requirements re: searchable PDF's. (tkd, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 104 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order (Proposed))(Lighty, Donald) Modified on 11/1/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2012: #5 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 102 FILED IN ERROR as a motion. This is only a Joinder. MOTION for Joinder in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Cleary, James) Modified on 11/1/2012 (tkd, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia)
October 31, 2012 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Grant)
October 30, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #99, Response to Motion for leave to file first amended complaint and Motion to Strike by Tracer Industries. Document will be refiled to comply with the Clerk's requirements re: searchable PDF's, certificate of conference and proposed orders. (tkd, )
October 30, 2012 Filing 99 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Petersen, Grant) Modified on 10/31/2012 (tkd, ).
October 26, 2012 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John) Modified on 10/26/2012 (tkd, ).
October 26, 2012 Filing 97 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members by A & L Industrial Services, Inc., Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter Inc, S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda)
October 24, 2012 Filing 96 RESPONSE to Motion re #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members and to Re-urge Dkt 45, 69, 75, 77, 80, 81 and 82 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Werner, John)
October 23, 2012 Filing 95 Emergency MOTION to Strike #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members and to Re-urge Dkt 45, 69, 75, 77, 80, 81 and 82 by A & L Industrial Services, Inc., Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter Inc, S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Cases, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Danielle)
October 18, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION For Protection From Defendants' Written Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
October 17, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Outstanding Discovery to Deft S&B Engineers and Constructors Ltd by Mario Vicente Acevedo, James Kenneth Chaney, Sr., Sheila Anderson Folse, Travis Trinord Harris, Varkey Kolackal Johnson, David Louis Langley, Jerry Dale Massey, Lynn Todd Neuman, Arthur Lee Richards. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 10/18/2012 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2012 Filing 92 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Werner, John) Modified on 10/18/2012 (tkd, ).
October 16, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
October 16, 2012 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action and to Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John) Modified on 10/17/2012 (tkd, ).
October 15, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act and to Approve a Proposed Notification to all Putative Collective Action Members by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 10/17/2012 (tkd, ).
October 2, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of First Supplemental Disclosure by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC (Cleary, James) Modified on 10/3/2012 (tkd, ).
September 14, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on August 23, 2012 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012. (clb, )

September 7, 2012 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A & L Industrial Services, Inc. (Wisdom, William)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/4/12. (tkd, )
September 4, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by A & L Industrial Services, Inc. (Wisdom, William)
August 23, 2012 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Case Management Conference held on 8/23/2012. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION to Sever by A & L Industrial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisdom, William) Modified on 8/24/2012 (tkd, ).
August 23, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION to Sever by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, James) Modified on 8/24/2012 (tkd, ).
August 22, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION to Sever by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
August 21, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by A & L Industrial Services, Inc..(Wisdom, William)
August 17, 2012 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION to Sever filed by RMF Nooter Inc. (Reese, Vincent)
August 17, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION to Sever by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia)
August 14, 2012 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION to Sever filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
August 13, 2012 Filing 75 MOTION to Sever by RMF Nooter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Reese, Vincent) Modified on 8/14/2012 (tkd, ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Sever filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying #71 Motion to reset management conference. However, pltf's counsel may appear by phone or another attorney from his law firm may appear in his place, or both if counsel desires. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/12/12. (tkd, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Reset Management Conference or for Leave to Send a Subsitute Attorney filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia) Modified on 8/10/2012 (tkd, ).
August 9, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Reset Management Conference or for Leave to Send a Subsitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 8/10/2012 (tkd, ).
August 9, 2012 Filing 70 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Werner, John)
August 7, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION to Sever by G P Industrial Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
August 7, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen W Schueler on behalf of RMF Nooter Inc (Schueler, Stephen)
August 7, 2012 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Headley, Linda)
August 7, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Edward Reddin on behalf of RMF Nooter Inc (Reddin, Thomas)
August 6, 2012 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC identifying Corporate Parent Car-Ber Holdings, Inc. for Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Cleary, James)
August 6, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC Notice of Disclosure (Cleary, James)
August 3, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document # 62, Notice of Disclosure by Car-Ber Testing Texas. This document contains actual disclosure which should be delivered to the parties but not e-filed with the Court. (tkd, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by All Plaintiffs (Werner, John)
August 3, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC (Cleary, James) Modified on 8/6/2012 (tkd, ).
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #49 Motion for leave to file first amended answer. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/3/12. (tkd, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by RMF Nooter Inc of Disclosure (Pezza, Brian)
August 2, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC of filing Initial Disclosure (Heald, Russell)
August 2, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Performance Contractors, Inc. (Shirley, Melissa)
August 2, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc. (Mabry, Daniel)
August 2, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Headley, Linda)
August 2, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE by Empire Scaffold, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Dave, Yash)
August 1, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Liever, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE by Turner Industries Group, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Lighty, Donald)
July 31, 2012 Filing 58 SUMMONS returned executed by All Plaintiffs. A & L Industrial Services, Inc. served on 7/19/2012, answer due 8/9/2012. (tkd, )
July 31, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
July 30, 2012 Filing 50 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Lighty, Donald) Modified on 7/31/2012 (tkd, ).
July 30, 2012 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lighty, Donald)
July 27, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by G P Industrial Contractors (Parker, Carl)
July 24, 2012 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC.(Cleary, James) Modified on 7/25/2012 (tkd, ).
July 20, 2012 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. (Liever, Kathleen)
July 18, 2012 Filing 45 Opposed MOTION to Sever by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda) Modified on 7/18/2012 (tkd, ).
July 17, 2012 Filing 44 SUMMONS REISSUED and electronically mailed to attorney John Werner for service in case as to A & L Industrial Services, Inc.. (pkb, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Headley, Linda)
July 16, 2012 Filing 42 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiffs' Original Collective Action Complaint by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Headley, Linda) Modified on 7/17/2012 (tkd, ).
July 11, 2012 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (tkd, )
July 3, 2012 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC (Heald, Russell)
July 2, 2012 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RMF Nooter Inc identifying Corporate Parent CIC Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Nooter Corporation, Corporate Parent Nooter Construction Company. (Pezza, Brian) Modified on 7/3/2012 (tkd, ).
July 2, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RMF Nooter Inc (Pezza, Brian) Modified on 7/3/2012 (tkd, ).
June 29, 2012 Filing 37 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Murphy J Foster III attorney for Performance Contractors Inc. (Attachments: #1 sealed attachment 1)(bjc) (fee paid receipt #TXE100004147)
June 29, 2012 Filing 36 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Morse Shirley attorney for Performance Contractors Inc. (bjc) (fee paid receipt #TXE100004148)
June 29, 2012 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Performance Contractors, Inc. (Watson, Timothy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 7/5/12. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/29/12. (tkd, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 33 SUMMONS REISSUED and emailed to atty John Werner for service in case as to A & L Industrial Services, Inc.. (pkb, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 32 Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian Peter Pezza for RMF Nooter (Fee Paid). (tkd, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 31 Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vincent D Reese for RMF Nooter (Fee Paid) (tkd, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION for Entry of a New Order Governing Proceedings re #10 Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 6/27/2012 (tkd, ).
June 21, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 21, 2012 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by G P Industrial Contractors (Parker, Carl)
June 21, 2012 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by G P Industrial Contractors.(Parker, Carl)
June 21, 2012 Filing 27 SUMMONS Issued and electronically mailed to attorney John Werner for service in case as to S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (pkb, )
June 21, 2012 Filing 26 Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Performance Contractors, Inc..(Watson, Timothy)
June 20, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company served by certified mail on 6/11/2012, answer due 7/2/2012. (bjc)
June 20, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. ISC, LLC served by certified mail on 6/14/2012, answer due 7/5/2012. (bjc)
June 18, 2012 Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Grant D. Petersen for Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. PHV filing fee paid: Receipt #100004081; $100.00. (mrp, )
June 18, 2012 Filing 22 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen Liever for Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. PHV filing fee paid: Receipt #TXE100004082; $100.00. (mrp, )
June 15, 2012 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc. (Campbell, Martha)
June 14, 2012 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Turner Industries Group, LLC (Lighty, Donald)
June 12, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martha Rachael Campbell on behalf of Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc. (Campbell, Martha)
June 8, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Empire Scaffold, LLC served on 5/21/2012. (tkd, )
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for extension of time to answer. Deft Performance Contractors' responsive pleading is due by 6/22/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/8/12. (tkd, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tracer Industries Management Co Inc.(Lewis, Fritz) Modified on 6/11/2012 (tkd, ).
June 8, 2012 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Responsive Pleading by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Timothy) Modified on 6/11/2012 (tkd, ).
June 8, 2012 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. for Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Hill, Patricia)
June 8, 2012 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Hill, Patricia) Modified on 6/11/2012 (tkd, ).
June 7, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 7, 2012 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC.(Snider, Wyatt)
June 5, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 5, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc..(Mabry, Daniel)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) Conference must occur by 6/25/12. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/4/12. (mrp, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED and electronically mailed to attorney John Werner for service in case as to RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company. (pkb, )
May 31, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Baker Concrete Services, LLC served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. (tkd, )
May 31, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CAR-BER Testing Texas, L.L.C., KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc, RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company, Tracer Industries Management Co. and Turner Industries Group, LLC served on 5/18/2012; answers due 6/8/2012. (tkd, )
May 31, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. G P Industrial Contractors and Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc. served on 5/17/2012, answers due 6/7/2012. (tkd, )
May 31, 2012 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turner Industries Group, LLC.(Lighty, Donald) Modified on 6/1/2012 (tkd, ).
May 15, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued and electronically mailed to attorney John Werner for service in case as to ISC, LLC, KTMC Turnaround Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company, Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(pkb, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued and electronically mailed to attorney John Werner for service in case as to A & L Industrial Services, Inc., Baker Concrete Services, LLC, CAR-BER Testing Texas, L.L.C., Empire Scaffold, LLC, G P Industrial Contractors, Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(pkb, )
May 15, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (pkb, )
May 11, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Ron Clark. (pkb, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,,.. (Werner, John)
May 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3585712.), filed by Richard Wayne Bell, Larry Basco, Elizabeth Ann Arguello, Daniel T. Ball, Rolland Craig Allen, Jerrett Ray Armstrong, Patricia Andrade, Bruce Barnard, Zach Marwan Achkar, Cory Lynn Baldwin, Carroll Henry Ballard, K. E. Barker, Unnikrishna Pillai Balakrishnapilla, Lafayet Barrera-Gonzalez, Ricky Arnaud, Jesse Askew, Weldon Barker, Mario Vicente Acevedo, Dalton Joseph Antoine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Werner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong et al v. A & L Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Yuri Lobo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Askew
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio C Salinas-Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devan Mitchem
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Vicente Acevedo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L Ward
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki A. Clark
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben D Ellis
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wayne Bell
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Keither Lamar
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Cordero, III
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wilkerson, Sr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafayet Barrera-Gonzalez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Davis
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Joseph McFarland
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Jimenez Vera
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gilberto Garcia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Meeks
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie D Mancil
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Franklin Costlow
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cruz
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Glenn Britnell
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Jarquin
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus G Puente, Sr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davy Howard Wolfe, II
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doel Pastor Cruz-Rivera
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Mariano Raymundo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Randall Holcomb
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Trevino
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Arnold Mann, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James I Rayer, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Vembi Pappukunju
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Douglas Wackenreuter
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Alexander Grant
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Perez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Grote
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalio Lugo Blanco
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy A. Araica
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Compean, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Townley
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Anderson Folse
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McFarlin
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Louis Langley
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Benjamin Garza
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Acosta Loera
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Winford Jones
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javetta Leather
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C Villatoro
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Flores-Regino
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wiltz, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliber Marroquin Cantu
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donanthony Spitaleri
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Garette Landry
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Alan Howell
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Farris Yarborough
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Young
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Echevarria Torres
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Clyde Darrell
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Donzaile Dodd
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Garcia Delacruz
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Spencer, Jr.
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Variath D Marottikudy
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Allen Sonnier
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cesar Castillo-Honorato
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Allan Davis
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceja, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Lacy, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Villarreal
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Caleb Miller
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varkey Kolackal Johnson
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolland Craig Allen
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Edward Tubbs
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Magallon
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaragoza Tijerina Garza
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis DeQuan Jones
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Winkelmann
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fazio
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Montalvo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rayborn
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Zamora
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Owens Sherman
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Joseph Deshotel
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Ortega
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Fortenberry Meeks
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethelwoldo Segarra
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Aaron Mann
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Renee Turner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kunhikrishnan K Veetil
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Rios Marroquin
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L Hagebusch, III
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Marroquin Cantu
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan L. Cantu-Garcia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bergeaux
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homero Monreal
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Angel Vargas
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson O Pacheco-Ramos
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer McGarrett Washington
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos L Gomez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack G Oppert, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olin Gilbert
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Arguello
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Dufrain
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natividad Quintanilla
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ingle
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tolbert
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton Tyler Ingle
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Warren Wesberry, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Carl Lambert
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Barnard
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Trevino
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Dale Massey
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Falcon
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Renee Knight
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Arnold Tullar
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Carrillo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Jacob Goudeau
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Melvin Ingle, III
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bergeaux
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kenneth Chaney, Sr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ingle
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Romero
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harrison Young
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Coronado Acuna
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Morgan Radford
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulcey Ann Prine
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Guerrero
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Glen Hester
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Paily Kulianickal
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Mary Whitehead
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulalio Pasillas Salas
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Scott Moussette
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reji Kileekkal Varughese
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleon Carraway
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Javier Sanches
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Picou
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne Duhon
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Ross East
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Daniel Mayo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Loera
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Turner
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Ruben Ortiz
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Puente, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Stokes
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Schaver
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Carrier
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Parks
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald J Kinchen
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralphel T Steptoe
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Castro Estrada
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Armando Pinon
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejos Rodriguez-Tamez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Woodruff
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cordova
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Trinord Harris
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Hudson
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Casey Jones
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Omar Portillo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherrie Steptoe
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James Mendoza
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar F Reyes
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar A Delgadillo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violeta Sentiol Ramirez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernie Sutton
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Donnell Fleming
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximiano Sanchez Gutierrez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gavito Rodriguez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Neil Stanton
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Miguel Jimenez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Elizondo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vaughn
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Marie Hayes
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Kevin Hargrove
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Marie Tait
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Humberto Natal
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kerri Gray
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waylon Michael Symmank
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cesar Cantu
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier H. Mendez Gonzalez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin David Johnson
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Daniel Hunter, II
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Lynn Baldwin
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Gonzalez, Jr
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fermah Smith
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Andrade
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Joseph Janca, Jr
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben D Hernandez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Dean Hudson
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Dermon Hawkins
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unnikrishna Pillai Balakrishnapilla
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Rivera
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Garcia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrett Ray Armstrong
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Quezeda Mora
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ray Sims
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Usiel Sernon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Arnaud
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Earl Wade
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E Peach
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Budwine, Jr.
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Torres Castillo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ozuna
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Trejo
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Henry Ballard
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Solis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bo Williams
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon M. Bolton
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magda G Kelly
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Valencia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayolo Benitez Leon
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Basco
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Pena Perez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weldon Barker
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V Taylor
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ryan Gulley
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadashivanachary Janardhananachary
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Spears
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Rogers
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leia Culpepper Williams
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Todd Neuman
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Michael McMains
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wayne Verrett
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Antonio Delfin
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Favorite
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Serrano Carrillo
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Hernandez Velazquez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. E. Barker
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Brantley
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Joseph Berg II
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C Swarner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Ryan Wilburn
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A Sanchez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Douglas Shute
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Garcia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Marwan Achkar
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Joseph Antoine
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Jackson
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Vazquez Ortega
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |