Beck et al v. A&L Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lyle Dean Deskin, Manuel Alaniz Rios, Henry Alejandro Gonzalez, Cedra Barry Gobert, Gustavo Adolfo Symonds, Jesus Antonio Rodriguez, Jose De-La-Cruz Munera, All Plaintiffs, Michael Garcia, Carlos Ranchell Evans, Francisco . Martinez, Alfredo Guerrero Lopez, Michelle Garcia, Calixto Cole, Clifford Matthew Adams, Gerardo Reynoso, Ismael Reynoso, Lazaro R Villasana, Jose Luis Garza, Joel Torres-Exposito, Magdier Vargas-Valdes, Leonardo Garza, Bethsy Dominguez-Morales, Dennis Rodrick Wilson, Cyrille Mitchel, Jr, Blake Wayne Hebert, Norris Earl Green, Jr, Aaron Rayshun Barzar, Fernando Bartolo Ardines, Juan Angel Trevino, Rene Garza, Jr, Cristian Viera, Salvador Martinez, Jr, Joseph Nicholas Lamb, Elida Pailla-Mendoza, Gustavo Adolfo Symonds, Jr, Wilbur H Sanders, Derrick Dewayne Beavers, Francisco Omar Torres, Rafael Torres Zepeda, Benito Ortiz Tellez, Charles Cecil Cunningham, Robert Jeffery Stevens, Claude Markham Stephenson, Kevin LePaul Beck, Jerry Lee Mitchell, Jr, Raul Perez, Jr, Rhonda Lucill Gordon, Jorge Cervantes, Michael Blaine Brown, Valson Jackson Sims, Jr, Jaime Vladimir Macias, Miguel Dicario, Charles Oran Horn, Alejandro Aguillon-Quintanilla, Gustavo Gonzalez, Jr, Maria Guadalupe Pantoja, Lionel Garcia, Efrim Alber Clark, Jamarqus Devonte Jones, Daniel Reed Delgado, Mario Q Baeza, Bonifacio Gutierrez, Josue Loera-Garza, Heriberto Villarreal Uribe, Jr, Ismenia I Roque, Robert Lee Ramsey, II, Jose Luis Salazar, Jose Ariel Sanchez, Meliton Ortiz Marban, Jorge Dejesus Gonzalez, Porfirio Betancourt, Eldon Zubiate Escudero, Juan Joel Pinon-Aguilar, Willie Wayne Eaglin, Zaul R Garcia, Salome Acosta-Aguirre, Ranson Blue Macfarlane, Jose Luis Rosas, Juan Ruben Rodriguez, Latisha Darrington Jackson, Christopher Junior Fontenot, Jose Delapaz Mendoza, Rolando Hernandez, Robert Lee Zeno, Brittany Bacon Barclay, Francisco Zaragosa, Joel Shivram, Ernesto Adriano-Favela, Allen Semien, Jr, Fabian G Rico, William George Redmond, IV, Calvin Joseph Lazard, Cipriano Solis-Rios, Darwin Keith Bridges, Urie Reyes, Ann M Hebert, Raul Rodriguez Rios, Marco Manzano, Jesse C Ramirez, Gerald Antoine Batiste, Patrick Dwayne Flanagan, Alfonso B Tamez, Jamison Ansul Fairchild, Pascual Armando Montoya, Jr, Cesar A Garcia, Chadrick Dewayne Keith, David Carrion Dejesus, Carlos Mario Carreon, Rhonda Faye Durousseau, Daniel Contreras, Guillermo Vivarginarte, Hector Arnulfo Lozano, Jr, Andrew Jopez Baldez, David Geovany Flores, Julio Cruz Valencia, Silvia Angelica Mercado, Shana Lee Lebouff, Farrah Latrice McCurley, Richard Louis Telles, II, Ramiro Guizar Munguia, Jarrett Fitzgerald Towers, Jr, Maximino Barrera-Landaverde, Felipe Perera Leon, Javier Levario Cervantes, Alfred Leon Dean, Hector Juan Viera, Jr, Felipe Morua, Jr, Esteban Villarreal Uribe, Jaime Contreras, Felix Hurtado Barriga, Christopher Lee Williams, Noe Concepcion Serna, Oscar Hugo Sanchez, Randy Zertuche Garcia, Vernon Lee Elliott, Hector M Barajas, Elliott Charles Williams, Jr, Daniel Ledezma, Paul James Gobea, Michael Anthony Bonin, Gerardo Solis, Brittany Nicole Dyson, Hector Solis-Gutierrez, David Allen Bernard, Jose Luis Rodriguez-Lira, Maria Delcarmen Niaves, Paul Barriere, III, Jimmy Leon Kelley, Frank David Holden, Carlos Jairo Zubiate, Jesus . Cantu, Ricardo Leos, Jorge F Baeza, Jesus Cipriano Lopez, Yongue John Grogan, Ronald McGowin, Ivory Kenton Brooks, Stephon Foster, Nicasio Villarrea Elizondol, Vakeisha Chantel Isadore, Sophia Lashawn Lindsey, Juan Antonio Garza, Michael J Schamburge, Lawrence Jay Thomas-Jordan, Jr, Joseph W Bloodworth, Russell Allen Roberts, Eugenio G Soto, Melvin Copeland, Lionel North, Amos Wallace, Precious Lawanna Williams, Elgie Walters, Jr, Angel Balderas-Tavera, Reynoldo Garza, Jr, Steve Cabellero, John Harvey Corbin, Jr, Mark Steven Victor, Kenneth Theo Benoit, Octavius Trimaine Beaner, Jerry Wayne Young, Jr, Sergio Luis Saenz, Maria Antonia Corbalan-Pena, Cesar Corona Salas, Terrence Gasaways Dixon, Ricky Lynn Odell, Octavio Guerrero Rueda, Leonel Balderas Martinez, Anthony P Orphey, Jonathan Bradley Martindale, Martin Rios Garcia, Armado Andrade Rodriguez, Alejandro J Montejano, Todd Joseph Broussard, Andre Lavelle White, Russell John Sanders, III, Sennie Lee Hagan, Octaviano Perez, Anthony Jerome Johnson, Michael Castellanos, Jermey Andrus, Eriberto Arana, Omar Hernandez Garza, Efrain Vazquez, Roderick Louis Williams, Martin Arguello, Juan Manuel Ornelas-Herebia, Fidelmar Rodriguez, Brian Keith Milton, Helen Marie Lowe, Nazaria Margarita Sauceda, Rossy Anderson Davis, Harrison Kreifels, Jared Lee Grisham, Russell Rene Coffey, Jose Cardenas Martinez, Anselmo Garza Martinez, Erick M Santos, Hector Javier-Garcia Vega, Elbann Antrakeisha Burrell, Daniel M Gonzalez, Jairo Aguillon, Yunexi Torres-Exposito, Micah Keith August, Anthony Lawrence Barry, Jr, Albert David Simon, Jr, Carmen Maria Gonzalez-Garcia, Reginald L Fentroy, Leslie Boyd Simpson, Joel Juarez Vazquez, Kenneth Ray Zeno, Manuel Louis Sanchez, Lance Lewis, Gregory Paul Sonnier, Sergio Guajardo Zapata, Rolando Alanis, Joshua Garrin Stanley, Mitchel Bryant Case-Buckle, David Allen Ronquille, Latasha Lianne Sumesnil, Jorge Alberto Garza, Jacdrick Liltroymia Arline, Carlos Adrian Cienfuegos, Jason Lee Simon, Benjamin Jospeh Minchew, Giraldo Fernando, Aldo Sanchez, Ignacio Rodriguez Cuellar, Phillip Simon Battles, Jr, Aristeo DeLeon, Jr, Mario Pantoja Flores, Jorge Bustamante, Marlin Ray Theis, Russell Wayne McCauley, Michael Wayne Manuel, Tomas Eduardo Alvarez, David Avendano Gutierrez, Wardell Gibson Jones, Eunesha Mariee Leday, Daniel Ray Nichols, Jason Paul Delcambre, Ivan Cavazos, Raymundo Uriostegui-Chavez, Kathy Ann Simpson, Carlos Espinoza Orozco, Apolonio R Salinas, Perry Jacob Bonin, Ernest Leon Mitchell, Jr, Jaime Longoria, Jada Leann Christenson, Marcus Weatherspoon, Raymundo Zuniga-Maldonado, Clifford Wilborne Moran, Blanca Rosa Escalera, Jesus Odilon Zuniga, Marvin Ramon Mendoza, Juan Manuel Becerra, Ashley Warren Bolton, Pamela Anderson, Jeremy Keith Darrington, Tomas Garza-Gracia, Moses Albert Walker, V, Kevin Andre Goode, Abraham Aaron Salazar, Eduardo J Mares, Omar Guadalupe Briones, Jose Alfredo Balderas, Eric O Acosta, Chance Martin, Solomon Everfield, III, Juan Dedios Delagarza, Francisco Hinojosa Rios, Cynthia Langford Zeno, Van Deip Nguyen, Roberto Abel Morales, Jesus Martin Gonzalez, Felix Alcolea Sainz, Linda C May, Francisco Javier Aguirre, Jr, Ronald Lee Hollie, Jr, Eduardo Hernandez, Andre F White, Chad Alan Parker, Kenneth Lionel Dean, Alberto Hernnadez Hernandez, Robert Leroy Carmichael, Damian Alex Manuel, Mark Elliot Lebouef, Chelsea Lynn Mcintyre, Victor Manuel Andrade, Troy Lopez Tyson, Monica Verenice Garcia, Christopher Darral Moore, Cedric Daniel Rogers, Isaac Cuellar, Jorge A Baeza, Carlos Eduardo Symonds, Norman Noel Carter, Mario Alberto Lozano, Omar Sanchez, Thomas Lee Martin, Pedro Gonzalez Alvarez, Javier Lopez Garza, Pedro Omar Rios, Robert Henry Moore, Cristobal Sanchez Pulido, James L Sanders, III, Andre Price, Michael Jude Mosley, Juan F Guerrero-Villafranca, Luis Rivera Avalos, Juan Javier Rodriguez, Ricardo Garcia Mendez, Augstin Diaz, Fabian R Mataarroyo, Anthony Lawrence Barry, Armando Lozano, Billy Frank Swearingen, William J Boudreaux, Shaquana Janea Williams, Roger Michael Durgin, Jr, Juan Carlos Ojeda, John Thomas Norton, Jr, Mckinley Taylor, Jr, Miguel Angel Barrera, Shadrick Donta Jackson, Bonifacio Chavez, Craig High, Melvin Eugene Williams, Mauricio Blodimer Pineda, Bulmaro Hernandez, Martin Ortega Martinez, John Richard, Jr, Jose Luis Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Raymond W Brown, Manuel Luna Juarez, Jaime A Membreno, Victor Jesus Roque, Israel Vital, Delia Macias Gonzalez, Carl Nash Macfarlane, Bryan Keith Barclay, Jr, Jessica Miranda Owens, Jose Guardalupe Yanez and Sergio Stardo Nava
Defendant: ISC Constructors, LLC, Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc., PCL Industrial Construction Co., Insulations, Inc., TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company, Turner Industries Group, LLC, Performance Contractors, Inc., S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., Coastal Industrial Services, Inc., Cajun Constructors, Inc., Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Empire Scaffold, LLC, RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company, Brock Services, Ltd., Orbital Industrial Insulation Corp., Mason Construction, Ltd., Orbital Insulation Corp., Economy Insulation Co., Inc., Baker Concrete Construction, Inc., Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc., ISC Group, Inc., Aerotek, Inc., Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC, ISC Industrial Specialty Contractors, LLC and A&L Industrial Services, Inc.
Petitioner: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00556
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the Amended Complaint #105 to case number 1:14cv174. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/11/15. (mrp, ) (Main Document 131 replaced on 2/12/2015) (mrp, ).
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 4/22/14. (mrp, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER. The court orders Plaintiffs' claims against ISC Constructors, LLC be severed into a separate lawsuit. The compliant #1 , motion to dismiss #125 , response to motion to dismiss #126 , reply to motion to dismiss #127 , and response #128 shall be transferred with the new lawsuit. The additional filing fee for the new case will be waived in this instance. New case number is 1:14cv174 and assigned to Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/12/14. (mrp, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Summons and Incorporated Memorandum in Support and 172 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time for Service incorporated in Plaintiffs' Response to ISC's Motion to Dismiss and/or Quash filed by ISC Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Sarah)
January 26, 2014 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Summons and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by ISC Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Myers, Sarah)
January 15, 2014 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Summons and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Frasher, Mark)
December 30, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Summons and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by ISC Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Sarah)
December 2, 2013 Filing 124 SUMMONS Issued as to ISC Constructors, LLC. and emailed to plas' atty for service (aam, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. The court orders Plaintiffs' claims against Teton, Ltd., a PDL Company, be severed into a separate lawsuit. After severance, the lawsuit shall remain in this court. The original complaint #1 shall be docketed in the new lawsuit. The additional filing fee for the new case will be waived in this instance. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/24/2013. (mrp, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. The court orders Plaintiffs' claims against Orbital Industrial Insulation Corp., be severed into a separate lawsuit. After severance, the lawsuit shall remain in this court. The amended complaint #105 shall be docketed in the new lawsuit. The additional filing fee will be waived in this instance. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/24/2013. (mrp, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. The court orders Plaintiffs' claims against ISC Group, Inc., be severed into a separate lawsuit. After severance, the suit shall be transferred to the Honorable Ron Clark. The amended complaint #105 shall be transferred with the new lawsuit. The additional filing fee will be waived in this instance. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/24/2013. (mrp, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. The court orders Plaintiffs' claims against Aerotek, Inc., be severed into a separate lawsuit. After severance, the lawsuit shall remain in this court. The original complaint shall be docketed in the new lawsuit. The filing fee for the new case will be waived in this instance. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/24/13. (mrp, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying as moot Motions #111 , #112 and #113 . Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/17/13. (mrp, )
October 16, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #112 Opposed MOTION to Quash , #113 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order (Agreement) (Frasher, Mark)
October 9, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Spreadsheet Identifying Each Plaintiff and His or Her Respective Employer (Attachments: #1 Spreadsheet identifying each plaintiff and his or her respective emmployer)(Frasher, Mark)
September 16, 2013 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 Opposed MOTION to Quash filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frasher, Mark)
September 16, 2013 Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frasher, Mark)
September 4, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark William Frasher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frasher, Mark)
August 30, 2013 Filing 113 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack)
August 30, 2013 Filing 112 Opposed MOTION to Quash by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack)
August 29, 2013 Filing 111 Opposed MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carroll, Jack)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/28/13. (mrp, )
August 27, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION to Sever by Economy Insulation Co., Inc.. (Brown, Darren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mrp, ).
August 27, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Economy Insulation Co., Inc. (Brown, Darren)
August 6, 2013 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Economy Insulation Co., Inc. (Brown, Darren)
July 19, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 106 ANSWER to #105 Amended Complaint by Economy Insulation Co., Inc..(Brown, Darren)
July 12, 2013 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Economy Insulation Co., Inc., ISC Group, Inc., Orbital Insulation Corp., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Werner, John)
July 10, 2013 Filing 104 STIPULATION Agreement by TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company. (Muscat, Joel)
July 10, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joel Howard Muscat on behalf of TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4216116. (Muscat, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2013: #1 Sealed Attachment) (pkb, ).
June 21, 2013 Filing 102 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Economy Insulation Co., Inc..(Brown, Darren)
June 4, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs in response to #100 Order on Motion to Sever. Spreadsheet Identifying Each Plaintiff and His or Her Respective Employer. (Werner, John) Modified on 6/5/2013 (mrp, ).
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #82 , #83 , #84 , #85 , #86 , #87 , #88 , #89 , #90 , #92 , #93 , #94 , #95 , #96 , #97 , #98 & #99 Motions to Sever. Within 21 days of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file a spreadsheet identifying each plaintiff and his or her respective employer to enable the clerk of court to sever the moving defendants and open new civil case files. The additional filing fee for the new cases will be waived in this instance. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/14/13. (mrp, )
May 6, 2013 Filing 99 MOTION to Sever and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Grant) Modified on 10/24/2013 (mrp, ).
May 3, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION to Sever by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Brand Energy's Motion to Sever)(Ivey, Robert)
April 16, 2013 Filing 97 MOTION to Sever by PCL Industrial Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Fritz)
April 11, 2013 Filing 96 MOTION to Sever by Cajun Constructors, Inc.. (Pratt, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mrp, ).
April 9, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION to Sever by Baker Concrete Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Sever)(Flynn, Chelsie)
April 5, 2013 Filing 94 MOTION to Sever by A&L Industrial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wisdom, William)
April 5, 2013 Filing 93 MOTION to Sever by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, James)
March 28, 2013 Filing 92 MOTION to Sever by Brock Services, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Morton, Sarah)
March 27, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 3/6/2013 before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Court Reporter: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2013. (tj, )
March 26, 2013 Filing 90 MOTION to Sever by Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tafaro, Lauren)
March 18, 2013 Filing 89 MOTION to Sever by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herms, Curtis)
March 18, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION to Sever by Turner Industries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lighty, Donald)
March 13, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION to Sever by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mabry, Daniel)
March 12, 2013 Filing 86 MOTION to Sever by RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Pollauf, #3 Exhibit Reporter's Transcript of Case Management Conference)(Pezza, Brian)
March 12, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION to Sever by Coastal Industrial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richey, William)
March 12, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION to Sever by Performance Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B in globo, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Shirley, Melissa)
March 11, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION to Sever by Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Patricia)
March 7, 2013 Filing 82 MOTION to Sever by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Headley, Linda)
March 6, 2013 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia A. Crone: Status Conference held on 3/6/2013. Counsel for all parties in attendance. Judge denied #76 MOTION For Protection From Written Discovery. (Court Reporter Tonya Jackson.) (mrp, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc. (Ivey, Robert)
March 5, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brock Services, Ltd. (Morton, Sarah)
March 5, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah B Morton on behalf of Brock Services, Ltd. (Morton, Sarah)
March 4, 2013 Filing 77 FILED IN ERROR - Atty Morton must file her own notice. Please ignore.NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G Mark Jodon on behalf of Brock Services, Ltd. (Jodon, G) Modified on 3/5/2013 (tkd, ).
March 4, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION For Protection From Written Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
March 1, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Ivey on behalf of Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. (Ivey, Robert)
March 1, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Ivey on behalf of PCL Industrial Construction Co. (Ivey, Robert)
March 1, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Ivey on behalf of Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc. (Ivey, Robert)
February 27, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Turner Industries Group, LLC Notice of First Supplemental Disclosures (Lighty, Donald)
February 21, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cajun Constructors, Inc. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Insulations, Inc. (Tafaro, Lauren)
February 15, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to appear pro hac vice submitted. Application to appear Pro Hac Vice is not a motion. Correction should be made by 2/15/13. (pkb, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Coastal Industrial Services, Inc. (Richey, William)
February 15, 2013 Filing 68 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Lanusse for Insulations, Inc. ( $100.00 fee paid, Receipt # 0540-4001991 ) (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pkb, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 67 ***PLEASE IGNORE. WRONGE EVENT CODE USED. PLEADING WILL BE REFILED*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie A Lanusse on behalf of Insulations, Inc. (Lanusse, Leslie) Modified on 2/15/2013 (pkb, ).
February 15, 2013 Filing 66 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE. APPLICATION TO BE REFILED*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Insulations, Inc.. (Lanusse, Leslie) Modified on 2/15/2013 (pkb, ). Modified on 2/20/2013 (pkb, ).
February 14, 2013 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Insulations, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Branton Enterprises, LLC for Insulations, Inc.. (Tafaro, Lauren)
February 14, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/6/2013 02:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Mabry, Daniel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Empire Scaffold, LLC (Hill, Patricia)
February 11, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company (Pezza, Brian)
February 11, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc. (Herms, Curtis)
February 11, 2013 Filing 60 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hill, Patricia)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Mason Construction, Ltd. only with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/11/13. (mrp, )
February 11, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. (Flynn, Chelsie)
February 11, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Herring, Danielle)
February 11, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE by Turner Industries Group, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Lighty, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Mason Construction, LTD, only by Jared Lee Grisham, Daniel Ray Nichols, Cesar Corona Salas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
February 8, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by A&L Industrial Services, Inc. (Wisdom, William)
February 8, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Performance Contractors, Inc. (Shirley, Melissa)
February 7, 2013 Filing 52 Defendant Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc..(Lewis, Fritz)
February 6, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC (Cleary, James)
February 4, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Lopresto Tafaro on behalf of Insulations, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3982977. (Tafaro, Lauren)
January 23, 2013 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cajun Constructors, Inc. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
January 22, 2013 Filing 48 DEFENDANT CAJUN CONSTRUCTORS, INC.S ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cajun Constructors, Inc..(Pratt, Elizabeth)
January 22, 2013 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Insulations, Inc..(Wilcox, Stephen)
January 8, 2013 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint and First Amended Affirmative and Other Defenses by Brock Services, Ltd..(Jodon, G)
January 7, 2013 Filing 45 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PCL Industrial Construction Co..(Lewis, Fritz)
January 2, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Chelsie J Flynn on behalf of Baker Concrete Construction, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3934223. (Flynn, Chelsie)
January 2, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew S Hament on behalf of Baker Concrete Construction, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3934133. (Hament, Andrew)
January 2, 2013 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. (Flynn, Chelsie)
December 31, 2012 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Headley, Linda)
December 31, 2012 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company (Schueler, Stephen)
December 28, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Performance Contractors, Inc..(Shirley, Melissa)
December 28, 2012 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc..(Mabry, Daniel)
December 28, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vincent D Reese on behalf of RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3931134. (Reese, Vincent)
December 28, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Peter Pezza on behalf of RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3931053. (Pezza, Brian)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #24 Cajun Constructors, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 1/27/13. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/27/12. (mrp, )
December 27, 2012 ***Document # 24, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Cajun Constructors, Inc. terminated in error. Motion reopened 12/27/12.*** (mrp, )
December 27, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 24, Refiled Motion for Extension of Time to Answer previously granted by Order #22 .PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mrp, )
December 26, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Kujawa Herring on behalf of S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Herring, Danielle)
December 26, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L Bolt on behalf of S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd. (Bolt, Elizabeth)
December 26, 2012 Filing 31 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and other Affirmative and Other Defenses by S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd..(Headley, Linda)
December 26, 2012 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Empire Scaffold, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ashtead Group, PLC for Empire Scaffold, LLC. (Dave, Yash)
December 26, 2012 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc. (Herms, Curtis)
December 26, 2012 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc..(Herms, Curtis)
December 26, 2012 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Empire Scaffold, LLC.(Hill, Patricia)
December 21, 2012 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Baker Concrete Construction, Inc..(Flynn, Chelsie)
December 21, 2012 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company.(Schueler, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cajun Constructors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Pratt, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/27/2012 (mrp, ).
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than Jnauary 27, 2013. Joint written report filed no later than February 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/20/2012. (bjc)
December 20, 2012 ***STRICKEN IN VIOLATION OF STANDING ORDER MC-12. Document # 21, application for extension of time to answer complaint. PLEASE IGNORE. Atty notified and will refile as a motion.*** (bjc)
December 20, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Mason Construction, Ltd. to 1/25/2013. (bjc)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before January 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/20/2012. (bjc)
December 20, 2012 Filing 21 ***THIS DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER STANDING ORDER MC-12.Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cajun Constructors, Inc..( Pratt, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/20/2012 (bjc, ).
December 20, 2012 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Turner Industries Group, LLC (Lighty, Donald)
December 20, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
December 19, 2012 Filing 44 APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Shirley for Performance Contractors, Inc. Pro Hac Vice fee of $100.00 paid, Receipt No. 0540-3922368. (dlc, )
December 19, 2012 Filing 19 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Turner Industries Group, LLC.(Lighty, Donald)
December 19, 2012 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mason Construction, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Mason's Agreed Mtn to Extend Time)(Timaeus, Dana)
December 19, 2012 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. (Petersen, Grant)
December 19, 2012 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tracer Industries Management Co. Inc.(Petersen, Grant) Modified on 12/19/2012 (mrp, ).
December 19, 2012 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coastal Industrial Services, Inc. (Richey, William)
December 19, 2012 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Coastal Industrial Services, Inc..(Richey, William)
December 19, 2012 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC identifying Corporate Parent Car-Ber Holdings, Inc. for Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. (Cleary, James)
December 19, 2012 Filing 12 Defendant Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC.(Cleary, James)
December 19, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Brock Services, Ltd..(Jodon, G)
December 19, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Answer #9 submitted by Brock Services, Ltd. Document is not pdf searchable and needs to be refiled. Correction should be made as soon as possible. (mrp, )
December 18, 2012 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brock Services, Ltd. (Jodon, G)
December 18, 2012 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brock Services, Ltd..(Jodon, G)
December 17, 2012 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A&L Industrial Services, Inc. (Wisdom, William)
December 17, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Murphy J Foster, III on behalf of Performance Contractors, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3918779. (Foster, Murphy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2013: #1 Sealed Attachement) (pkb, ).
December 17, 2012 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A&L Industrial Services, Inc..(Wisdom, William)
December 10, 2012 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to A&L Industrial Services, Inc.; Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012. Images can be seen in document #5 . (mrp, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/3/12 as to Brock Services, Ltd.; Coastal Industrial Services, Inc.; Economy Insulation Co., Inc.; Mason Construction, Ltd.; Orbital Industrial Insulation Corp.; PCL Industrial Construction Co.; RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company; TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company; Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., answer due 12/24/12. (mrp, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aerotek, Inc.; Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc.; Cajun Constructors, Inc.; Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC; Empire Scaffold LLC; Insulations, Inc.; Integrated Electrical Services, Inc.; Performance Contractors, Inc.; S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.; Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.; Turner Industries Group, LLC served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012. (mrp, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/21/2012) (mrp, ).
November 29, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Coastal Industrial Services, Inc., Economy Insulation Co., Inc., Empire Scaffold, LLC, ISC Group, Inc., Insulations, Inc., Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Mason Construction, Ltd., Orbital Industrial Insulation Corp., PCL Industrial Construction Co., Performance Contractors, Inc., RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company, S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd., TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company, Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc., Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc. and Turner Industries Group, LLC. and emailed to plas' atty for service (aam, )
November 28, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to A&L Industrial Services, Inc., Aerotek, Inc., Baker Concrete Construction, Inc., Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc., Brock Services, Ltd., Cajun Constructors, Inc. and Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC. and emailed to plas' atty for service (aam, )
November 26, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
November 20, 2012 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (aam, )
November 20, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3882479.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Jury Demand)(Werner, John) #3 Civil Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck et al v. A&L Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISC Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Voorhies Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services, Inc.
Represented By: Fritz Barham Lewis, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCL Industrial Construction Co.
Represented By: Fritz Barham Lewis, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Represented By: Stephen Craig Wilcox
Represented By: Leslie A Lanusse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TETON, Ltd., A PCL Company
Represented By: Joel Howard Muscat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC
Represented By: Donald Francis Lighty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Murphy J Foster, III
Represented By: Melissa Morse Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & B Engineers and Constructors, Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth L Bolt
Represented By: Linda Ottinger Headley
Represented By: Danielle Kujawa Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Henry Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brandes Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Electrical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Dean Herms, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Scaffold, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Jeanne Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMF Nooter, a Subsidiary of Nooter Construction Company
Represented By: Brian Peter Pezza
Represented By: Vincent D Reese
Represented By: Stephen W Schueler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Sarah B Morton
Represented By: G Mark Jodon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbital Industrial Insulation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Construction, Ltd.
Represented By: Dana L Timaeus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbital Insulation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Insulation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Darren Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Concrete Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Hament
Represented By: Chelsie J Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Industrial Plant Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Mabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracer Industries Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Grant D Petersen
Represented By: Robert L Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car-Ber Testing Texas LLC
Represented By: James Michael Cleary, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISC Industrial Specialty Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Voorhies Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&L Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Jackson Wisdom
Represented By: Grant D Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Dean Deskin
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Alaniz Rios
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Alejandro Gonzalez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedra Barry Gobert
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Adolfo Symonds
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Antonio Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose De-La-Cruz Munera
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ranchell Evans
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco . Martinez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Guerrero Lopez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Garcia
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calixto Cole
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Matthew Adams
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Reynoso
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Reynoso
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro R Villasana
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Torres-Exposito
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdier Vargas-Valdes
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethsy Dominguez-Morales
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Rodrick Wilson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrille Mitchel, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Wayne Hebert
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norris Earl Green, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Rayshun Barzar
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Bartolo Ardines
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Angel Trevino
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Garza, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Viera
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Martinez, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Nicholas Lamb
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Pailla-Mendoza
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Adolfo Symonds, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur H Sanders
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Dewayne Beavers
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Omar Torres
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Torres Zepeda
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Ortiz Tellez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cecil Cunningham
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jeffery Stevens
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Markham Stephenson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin LePaul Beck
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Mitchell, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Perez, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Lucill Gordon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Cervantes
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blaine Brown
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valson Jackson Sims, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Vladimir Macias
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Dicario
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Oran Horn
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Aguillon-Quintanilla
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Gonzalez, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Pantoja
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrim Alber Clark
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamarqus Devonte Jones
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Reed Delgado
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Q Baeza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Gutierrez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Loera-Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Villarreal Uribe, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismenia I Roque
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Ramsey, II
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Salazar
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ariel Sanchez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliton Ortiz Marban
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Dejesus Gonzalez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porfirio Betancourt
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Zubiate Escudero
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Joel Pinon-Aguilar
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wayne Eaglin
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaul R Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salome Acosta-Aguirre
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranson Blue Macfarlane
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Rosas
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ruben Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Darrington Jackson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Junior Fontenot
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Delapaz Mendoza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Hernandez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Zeno
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Bacon Barclay
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Zaragosa
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Shivram
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Adriano-Favela
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Semien, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian G Rico
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William George Redmond, IV
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Joseph Lazard
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipriano Solis-Rios
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Keith Bridges
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urie Reyes
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M Hebert
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Rodriguez Rios
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Manzano
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse C Ramirez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Antoine Batiste
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dwayne Flanagan
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso B Tamez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamison Ansul Fairchild
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascual Armando Montoya, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar A Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadrick Dewayne Keith
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carrion Dejesus
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Mario Carreon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Faye Durousseau
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Contreras
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Vivarginarte
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Arnulfo Lozano, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jopez Baldez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Geovany Flores
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cruz Valencia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Angelica Mercado
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Lee Lebouff
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farrah Latrice McCurley
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Louis Telles, II
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Guizar Munguia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Fitzgerald Towers, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximino Barrera-Landaverde
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Perera Leon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Levario Cervantes
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Leon Dean
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Juan Viera, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Morua, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Villarreal Uribe
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Contreras
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Hurtado Barriga
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Williams
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Concepcion Serna
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Hugo Sanchez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zertuche Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Lee Elliott
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector M Barajas
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Charles Williams, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ledezma
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul James Gobea
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Bonin
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Solis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Nicole Dyson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Solis-Gutierrez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Bernard
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Rodriguez-Lira
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Delcarmen Niaves
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barriere, III
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Leon Kelley
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank David Holden
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Jairo Zubiate
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus . Cantu
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Leos
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge F Baeza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Cipriano Lopez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongue John Grogan
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McGowin
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivory Kenton Brooks
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephon Foster
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicasio Villarrea Elizondol
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vakeisha Chantel Isadore
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Lashawn Lindsey
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Schamburge
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jay Thomas-Jordan, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W Bloodworth
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Allen Roberts
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio G Soto
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Copeland
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel North
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Wallace
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Lawanna Williams
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgie Walters, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Balderas-Tavera
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynoldo Garza, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cabellero
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harvey Corbin, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Steven Victor
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Theo Benoit
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavius Trimaine Beaner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wayne Young, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Luis Saenz
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Antonia Corbalan-Pena
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Corona Salas
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Gasaways Dixon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lynn Odell
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Guerrero Rueda
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Balderas Martinez
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony P Orphey
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bradley Martindale
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Rios Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armado Andrade Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro J Montejano
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Joseph Broussard
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Lavelle White
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell John Sanders, III
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sennie Lee Hagan
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octaviano Perez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jerome Johnson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Castellanos
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermey Andrus
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eriberto Arana
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Hernandez Garza
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Vazquez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Louis Williams
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Arguello
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Ornelas-Herebia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelmar Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Milton
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Marie Lowe
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazaria Margarita Sauceda
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossy Anderson Davis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Kreifels
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Lee Grisham
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Rene Coffey
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cardenas Martinez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anselmo Garza Martinez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick M Santos
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Javier-Garcia Vega
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbann Antrakeisha Burrell
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M Gonzalez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairo Aguillon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yunexi Torres-Exposito
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Keith August
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lawrence Barry, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert David Simon, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Maria Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald L Fentroy
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Boyd Simpson
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Juarez Vazquez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Zeno
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Louis Sanchez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Lewis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Paul Sonnier
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Guajardo Zapata
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Alanis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Garrin Stanley
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchel Bryant Case-Buckle
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Ronquille
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Lianne Sumesnil
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Alberto Garza
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacdrick Liltroymia Arline
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Adrian Cienfuegos
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Simon
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Jospeh Minchew
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giraldo Fernando
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Sanchez
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Rodriguez Cuellar
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Simon Battles, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristeo DeLeon, Jr
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Pantoja Flores
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Bustamante
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Ray Theis
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Wayne McCauley
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Manuel
Represented By: Mark William Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance |