Joseph et al v. Signal International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Biju Makrukkattu Joseph, Joy Joseph Attayil, Varghese Kainikkeril Yohannan, Krishnan Venugopal, Varghese Pappachan, Shogy Vezhaparambil Ousephkutty, Viswamithran Raghavan, Sajimon Kutty, Kunjuchan Varghese, John Charuvila George, Philip Baby, Babu Lal Mali, Vavachan Mathai Koottalil, Surje Prasad Tamang, Hanridas Sankara Panicker, Eswara R. Kanithi, George Kutty Vadakkeko Mathew, Francis Joseph, Jagannadha Rao Saragadam, Prabhakaran Balakrishna Pillai, Kannankutty Ponnan, George Devassy Arackal, Kiran Mohan Baki, Sojan Paul Kaliyadan, Lakhbir Singh, Krishnan Kannayan, Ramachandran Murugaiyan, Melvin Joseph Rodrigues, Kunhikrishn Kaniyamkulam Veetil, Joseph Boban Peruvelil, Sreedharan Babu, Bijay Kumar Biswas, Suresh Kumar Pillai Kavalamkuzhi, All Plaintiffs, Pankajakshan Madhavan, Ravi Rowthu, Gijo John, Suresh Kokkoth, Sebastian George Pananijkal, Varghese Kannampuzha Devassy, Joy Kallachiyil Varkey, Biju Potrayil, Abraham Varghese, Vasavan Babu, Iju James, Omanakuttan Govindan Kakkanthara, Paulose Chirackal Airookaran Joseph and Subburaj Rengasamy
Defendant: Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD, Signal International, LLC, Signal International, Inc., Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C., Indo-Ameri Soft, L.L.C., Kurella Rao, J&M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi, Billy R. Wilks, J&M Marine & Industrial, L.L.C., Global Resources, Inc., Michael Pol, Sachin Dewan and Medtech Consultants
Case Number: 1:2013cv00324
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 357 STATUS REPORT (Nineteenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
June 25, 2021 Filing 356 STATUS REPORT (Eighteenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
February 25, 2021 Filing 355 STATUS REPORT (Seventeenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 354 STATUS REPORT (Sixteenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 353 STATUS REPORT (Fifteenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 352 STATUS REPORT (Fourteenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 351 STATUS REPORT Thirteenth Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 350 TWELFTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 7/3/2019 (tkd, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 349 STATUS REPORT (Eleventh Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 348 STATUS REPORT (Tenth Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #290 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gabriel Adam Mendel terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/27/2018. (zjh1, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #292 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Teresa L Sulmers terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/27/2018. (zjh1, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #337 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anjali J Nair terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/27/2018. (zjh1, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #291 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jaliya S Faulkner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/27/2018. (zjh1, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 347 NINTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 7/3/2018 (tkd, ).
March 6, 2018 Filing 346 EIGHTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 3/7/2018 (tkd, ).
November 6, 2017 Filing 345 SEVENTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 11/7/2017 (tkd, ).
July 7, 2017 Filing 344 SIXTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 7/10/2017 (tkd, ).
March 8, 2017 Filing 343 FIFTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 3/8/2017 (tkd, ).
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #342 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Christopher Roux terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/29/2016. (zjh1, )
November 16, 2016 Filing 342 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian C. Roux by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2016: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
November 8, 2016 Filing 341 FOURTH STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 11/8/2016 (tkd, ).
July 11, 2016 Filing 340 THIRD STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fleming, John) Modified on 7/12/2016 (tkd, ).
March 11, 2016 Filing 339 STATUS REPORT (Second Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Ward, Bryan)
November 12, 2015 Filing 338 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Ward, Bryan)
September 4, 2015 Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Anjali J. Nair) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Bryan)
July 30, 2015 Filing 336 Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs (Ward, Bryan)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER STAYING CASE Pursuant to Bankruptcy. The parties are directed to notify the Court every 120 days regarding the status of bankruptcy proceedings. A letter brief regarding severance of certain claims may be filed by 7/31/15; deadline for any opposition is governed by Local Rule CV-7(e). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/14/15. (tkd, )
July 13, 2015 Filing 334 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 7/14/2015 (tkd, ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER denying #327 Defts' Objections to #281 Order denying motion to re-depose the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/29/15. (tkd, )
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #331 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by All Parties. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/6/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/26/2015. (bjc, )
June 10, 2015 Filing 331 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial Date by All Parties by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1)(Hangartner, Erin)
June 1, 2015 Filing 330 RESPONSE to #327 Signal's Objections to Judge Hawthorn's Order on Signal's Motion to Re-Depose Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 6/2/2015 (tkd, ).
May 29, 2015 Filing 329 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #327 Objection to Order denying motion to re-depose the plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Bryan) Modified on 6/1/2015 (tkd, ).
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #329 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/29/2015. (zjh1, )
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER adopting #282 Report and Recommendation and denying #229 Motion to Dismiss filed by Billy R. Wilks. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/16/15. (tkd, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 327 OBJECTION to #281 Order denying Signal's Motion to re-depose the Plaintiffs (Pursuant to Federal Rule 72(a) and LR 72(b)) filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 4/9/2015 (bjc, ).
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting in part #324 Motion to file Objection to Memorandum and Order under seal. The Clerk is directed to strike #323 Objection. Signal may re-file its objections in compliance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/7/15. (tkd, )
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #325 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/7/2015. (zjh1, )
April 6, 2015 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #323 Objection to Memorandum and Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 4/7/2015 (tkd, ).
April 2, 2015 Filing 324 MOTION to Seal Rec. Doc. 323 by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 30, 2015 Filing 323 Stricken by #326 Order.OBJECTION pursuant to Federal Rule 72(a) and LR 72(b) to #281 Memorandum and Order denying Signal's motion to re-depose the plaintiffs filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/31/2015 (tkd, ). Modified on 4/8/2015 (tkd, ).
March 24, 2015 Filing 322 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #282 Report and Recommendation by Billy R. Wilks on 3/21/15. (tkd, )
March 24, 2015 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (Brief in Opposition to Signal's Motion in Limine Regarding Use of Inflammatory Terms) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/9/2015 at 9:00 AM. Jury Selection/Trial reset for 7/13/2015 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/24/15. (tkd, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER denying #233 Defts' Objections to #222 Memorandum and Order on the Parties' Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/22/15. (tkd, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying #231 Pltfs' Objections to #222 Memorandum and Order on the Parties' Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/22/15. (tkd, )
March 23, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document # 316, Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Motion must be refiled with a certificate of conference. (tkd, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 317 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #289 SEALED MOTION in Limine Regarding Use of Inflammatory Terms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Sanders e-mail (11-05-2006), #3 Exhibit B - Schnoor Dep. (excerpts), #4 Exhibit C - Rigolo Dep. (excerpts), #5 Exhibit D - Memo. of Understanding, #6 Exhibit E - GM Proposal for Labor Camp, #7 Exhibit F - General Marine Leasing Proposal for Labor Camp, #8 Exhibit G - George Dep. (excerpts), #9 Exhibit H - Binion Dep. (excerpts), #10 Exhibit I - Bingle Dep. (excerpts), #11 Exhibit J - Cunningham Dep. (excerpts), #12 Exhibit K - Tanner Dep. (excerpts), #13 Exhibit L - Hospital Emergency Room Records (S. Vijayan), #14 Exhibit M - Baby Dep. (excerpts), #15 Exhibit N - Baby Dep. Ex. 31, #16 Exhibit O - Sanders e-mail (10/12/2006))(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/24/2015 (tkd, ).
March 23, 2015 Filing 316 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Signal's Motion in Limine Regarding the Use of Inflammatory Terms) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/24/2015 (tkd, ).
March 23, 2015 Filing 315 Proposed Jury Instructions by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
March 23, 2015 Filing 314 OBJECTION to Signal's Exhibits by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 3/24/2015 (tkd, ).
March 23, 2015 Filing 313 OBJECTIONS to Pltfs' Exhibits by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 3/24/2015 (tkd, ).
March 23, 2015 Filing 312 OBJECTIONS to #308 Pltfs' Exhibits by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/24/2015 (tkd, ).
March 20, 2015 Filing 311 NOTICE by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. Objection to Plaintiffs' Witness (Cerniglia, Timothy)
March 19, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC Chart of Signal Oppositions to Plaintiffs' MIL (Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (of Plaintiffs' Objections to and Counter-Designations to Signal's Deposition Designations [Doc. 239]) (Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 308 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #271 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Plaintiffs' Objs. to Signal's and Dewan's Witness Lists) (Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #256 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Use of David Verdict and Trial Testimony filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cunningham Trial Testimony, #3 Exhibit 2 - Schnoor Trial Testimony, #4 Exhibit 3 - David Trial Ex. 199, #5 Exhibit 4 - Burnett Dep. (excerpts), #6 Exhibit 5 - Dewan Dep. (excerpts), #7 Exhibit 6 - Pol Trial Testimony, #8 Exhibit 7 - Marler Trial Testimony, #9 Exhibit 8 - Binion Trial Testimony, #10 Exhibit 9 - Marler Dep. (excerpts), #11 Exhibit 10 - Sanders Dep. (11-19-09) (excerpts), #12 Exhibit 11 - Rigolo Dep. (excerpts), #13 Exhibit 12 - Bingle Trial Testimony, #14 Exhibit 13 - Schnoor Dep. (excerpts), #15 Exhibit 14 - Varkey Dep. (excerpts), #16 Exhibit 15 - Kadakkarappally Trial Testimony, #17 Exhibit 16 - Snyder Dep. (10-1-09) (excerpts), #18 Exhibit 17 - David Trial Ex. 126, #19 Exhibit 18 - Empl. Agmt., #20 Exhibit 19 - Bingle Dep. (excerpts), #21 Exhibit 20 - David Trial Ex. 715, #22 Exhibit 21 - Man Camp Agmt., #23 Exhibit 22 - Sanders Dep. (11-20-09) (excerpts), #24 Exhibit 23 - Spears E-Mail, #25 Exhibit 24 - HRT_SIA000308269, #26 Exhibit 25 - Snyder Dep. (5-28-14) (excerpts), #27 Exhibit 26 - Snyder Dep. Exs. 6-12, #28 Exhibit 27 - Maness Trial Testimony)(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 306 RESPONSE in Opposition re #259 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring in Mississippi on March 8 and 9 of 2007 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - David Ex. 940, #3 Exhibit 2 - David Ex. 1489, #4 Exhibit 3 - Rigolo Dep. (excerpts), #5 Exhibit 4 - Marler Dep. (excerpts), #6 Exhibit 5 - Schnoor Dep. (excerpts), #7 Exhibit 6 - Snyder Trial Testimony, #8 Exhibit 7 - Stopher Dep. (excerpts), #9 Exhibit 8 - James Dep. (excerpts), #10 Exhibit 9 - Varkey Dep. (excerpts), #11 Exhibit 10 - Baby Dep. (excerpts), #12 Exhibit 11 - Kaliyadan Dep. (excerpts), #13 Exhibit 12 - Cunningham Trial Testimony, #14 Exhibit 13 - Shouse Trial Testimony)(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 305 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 MOTION in Limine re Refund Payments Made to Non-Signal Workes filed by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master List of Refunds)(Shapiro, Stephen)
March 19, 2015 Filing 304 RESPONSE in Opposition re #257 MOTION in Limine to Bifurcate and Limit the Presentation of Otherwise Irrelevant Financial Information filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - David Order on Bifurcation)(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 303 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs From Reference to Alleged Oral Promises as Contracts filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Related to OSHA Applicability and Compliance filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - OSHA Memorandum)(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 301 RESPONSE in Opposition re #254 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Gender Based Equal Pay Act Lawsuit of Lisa Spears filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - David Trial Tr. (excerpts), #3 Exhibit 2 - Spears Dep. (excerpts), #4 Exhibit 3 - Cunningham Dep. (excerpts))(Landers, Daniella)
March 19, 2015 Filing 300 OBJECTIONS by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC to #271 Proposed Witness List (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/20/2015 (bjc, ).
March 19, 2015 Filing 299 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #265 MOTION in Limine Regarding T-Visas, Immigration Status, etc. filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 298 OBJECTIONS by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC to #262 Notice of Deposition Designations (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/20/2015 (bjc, ).
March 19, 2015 Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Signal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of T-Visas, Related Documents, and Immigration Status by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 296 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 MOTION in Limine re Refund Payments Made to Non-Signal Workes filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #269 MOTION in Limine Regarding Counsel's Political Views, Resources, etc. filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #267 MOTION in Limine Regarding Post-Signal Activities filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 293 RESPONSE in Opposition re #268 MOTION in Limine Regarding Signal's Post-Lawsuit Conduct filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 18, 2015 Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Teresa L. Sulmers, now Teresa S. Bouchard) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 18, 2015 Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jaliya S. Faulkner) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 18, 2015 Filing 290 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Gabriel A. Mendel) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 18, 2015 Filing 289 SEALED MOTION in Limine Regarding Use of Inflammatory Terms by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hangartner, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2015: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ). Modified on 3/19/2015 (bjc, ).
March 18, 2015 Filing 288 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J Bowness on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5107129. (Bowness, Matthew)
March 17, 2015 Filing 287 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Billy R. Wilks on 3/14/15 of #241 Order. (mrp, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER on limitations of trial time. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/17/2015. (bjc, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDERED that the magistrate judges report and recommendation (Doc. No. 219) is adopted; and the Motion (Doc. No. 161) is denied.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/17/2015. (bjc, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 284 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Meredith B Stewart on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5104012. (Stewart, Meredith)
March 17, 2015 Filing 283 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anjali J Nair on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5104010. (Nair, Anjali)
March 17, 2015 Filing 282 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #229 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Billy R. Wilks be denied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/17/2015. (bjc, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER denying #235 Motion for Sanctions; denying #242 Motion to Take Deposition ; denying as moot #243 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 03/17/2015. (ttp, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying as MOOT #279 Motion for Leave to File Reply Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/17/2015. (zjh1, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying #276 Motion to Continue. Should any party file for bankruptcy, it is ordered to notify this court immediately and include the court and case number for the proceedings. The party filing for bankruptcy is further ordered to notify opposing counsel immediately of the bankruptcy proceedings, so that opposing counsel does not inadvertently violate any stay issued by the bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/16/2015. (bjc, )
March 16, 2015 Filing 279 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Rule 37 Sanctions by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 16, 2015 Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #265 MOTION in Limine Regarding T-Visas, Immigration Status, etc. filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Cerniglia, Timothy)
March 16, 2015 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re #267 MOTION in Limine Regarding Post-Signal Activities filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Cerniglia, Timothy)
March 16, 2015 Filing 276 Emergency MOTION to Continue Trial (Ex Parte) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 13, 2015 Filing 275 BRIEF (Signal Defendants' Supplemental Choice-of-Law Brief) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
March 13, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC (Signal's Objections to Video Deposition Designation [ECF 238]) (Hangartner, Erin)
March 13, 2015 Filing 273 BRIEF filed (Supplemental Brief on Choice of Law Filed Pursuant to Court's Mar. 6, 2015 Order (Doc. 241)) by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
March 13, 2015 Filing 272 REPLY to Response to Motion re #242 MOTION to Redepose Plaintiffs on T-Visa Evidence filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 271 Proposed Pretrial Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Burnett Defendants' Witness List, #2 Dewan Defendants' Witness List, #3 Signal Defendants' Witness List, #4 Plaintiffs' Witness List, #5 Burnett Defendants' Exhibit List, #6 Dewan Defendants' Exhibit List, #7 Signal Defendants' Exhibit List, #8 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List)(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 270 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Choice of Law by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 3/13/2015 (tkd, ).
March 12, 2015 Filing 269 MOTION in Limine Regarding Counsel's Political Views, Resources, etc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Soni Dep. (Vol. II - excerpt), #3 Exhibit B - Bingle Trial Testimony, #4 Exhibit C - Schnoor Dep. (excerpt), #5 Exhibit D - Schnoor Trial Testimony, #6 Exhibit E - Marler e-mail, #7 Exhibit F - James Dep. (Vol. I - excerpt), #8 Exhibit G - Varkey Dep. (excerpt), #9 Exhibit H - Kaliyadan Dep. (excerpt), #10 Exhibit I - Baby Dep. (excerpt), #11 Exhibit J - James Dep. (Vol. II - excerpt), #12 Exhibit K - Soni Dep. (Vol. I - excerpt))(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 268 MOTION in Limine Regarding Signal's Post-Lawsuit Conduct by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Rhonda George Dep. (excerpt))(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 267 MOTION in Limine Regarding Post-Signal Activities by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 266 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Related to OSHA Applicability and Compliance by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hangartner, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2015: #3 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 12, 2015 Filing 265 MOTION in Limine Regarding T-Visas, Immigration Status, etc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 264 MOTION in Limine re Refund Payments Made to Non-Signal Workes by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Objections to and Counter-Designations for Video Deposition Designations Submitted by Signal Defendants [ECF No. 239]) (Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Deposition Designations (Landers, Daniella)
March 12, 2015 Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #229 MOTION to Dismiss of defts Billy Wilks, J & M Associates of Mississippi, Inc., and J & M Marine & Industrial, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/13/2015 (tkd, ).
March 12, 2015 Filing 260 MOTION in Limine by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen)
March 12, 2015 Filing 259 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring in Mississippi on March 8 and 9 of 2007 by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 258 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion in Limine Regarding the Use of Inflammatory Terms by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 257 MOTION in Limine to Bifurcate and Limit the Presentation of Otherwise Irrelevant Financial Information by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 256 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Use of David Verdict and Trial Testimony by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 255 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs From Reference to Alleged Oral Promises as Contracts by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 254 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Gender Based Equal Pay Act Lawsuit of Lisa Spears by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hangartner, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2015: #3 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 12, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eben P Colby on behalf of Philip Baby, Iju James, Sojan Paul Kaliyadan, Joy Kallachiyil Varkey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5096184. (Colby, Eben)
March 11, 2015 Filing 252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #235 MOTION for Sanctions (FRCP 37) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Baby Dep., #2 Exhibit B - Order (Davis v. Signal))(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/12/2015 (tkd, ).
March 11, 2015 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #242 MOTION to Redepose Plaintiffs on T-Visa Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order on Motion in Limine filed in David Case, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail and Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from David Trial Testimony, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Kadakkarappally Dep., #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Baby Dep.)(Landers, Daniella)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #249 Motion to Dismiss pltfs' claims against defts Kurella Rao and Indo-Ameri Soft LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/10/15. (tkd, )
March 10, 2015 Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Kurella Rao and Indo-Ameri Soft, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #248 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/10/2015. (zjh1, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #232 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/10/2015. (zjh1, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 9, 2015 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition to #224 Signal's Objections to #219 Report and Recommendation by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/10/2015 (tkd, ).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER directing plaintiffs to file responses to the following motions by 3/11/15 at 5:00 pm: #235 Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions, #242 Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs on T-Visa Evidence and #243 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/9/15. (tkd, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 245 RESPONSE to #233 Signal's Objection To Magistrate's Memorandum and Order on the Parties' Motions To Exclude Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/10/2015 (tkd, ).
March 9, 2015 Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Shane G Ramsey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5089524. (Ramsey, Shane)
March 6, 2015 Filing 243 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Signal's Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs on T-Visa Evidence by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 6, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION to Redepose Plaintiffs on T-Visa Evidence by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/9/2015 (tkd, ).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER re: Choice of Law. The Court concludes that Texas law should govern the breach of contract and fraud claims at trial. The parties have until 3/13/15 to submit any additional choice-of-law briefing. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/6/15. (tkd, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 240 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt by Billy R. Wilks on 3/3/15 of copies of emails and attachments sent to counsel regarding Final Pretrial and Exhibit Preparation and forwarded to pro se dft Billy R. Wilks via CMRRR. (tkd, )
March 5, 2015 Filing 239 FILED IN ERROR as a motion. This is a notice only. MOTION for Disclosure Deposition Designations by Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 3/6/2015 (tkd, ).
March 5, 2015 Filing 238 FILED IN ERROR as a motion. This is a notice only. MOTION for Disclosure (Plaintiffs' Video Deposition Designations) by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 3/6/2015 (tkd, ). Modified on 3/6/2015 (tkd, ).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER adopting #216 Report and Recommendation and granting #98 Motion of amended plaintiffs to dismiss without prejudice the claims against deft Michael Pol. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/4/15. (tkd, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan M Ward on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5082322. (Ward, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2016: #1 Sealed Attachment) (pkb, ).
March 2, 2015 Filing 235 MOTION for Sanctions (FRCP 37) by Signal International Texas, G.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin) (Additional attachment added on 3/4/2015: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying as moot #227 Motion for stay of order on motion to compel. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/28/15. (tkd, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 233 OBJECTION pursuant to Federal Rule 72(a) and LR72(b) to #222 Memorandum and Order on Motions to Exclude Testimony filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 2/27/2015 (tkd, ).
February 25, 2015 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
February 25, 2015 Filing 231 OBJECTIONS to #222 Memorandum and Order Regarding Daubert Motions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 2/26/2015 (tkd, ).
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER denying #172 Pltf's Motion for Reconsideration of Signal's Motion to Compel and Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order. Order also denying #188 Signal's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/24/15. (tkd, )
February 24, 2015 Filing 227 MOTION to Stay re #148 Order on Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
February 23, 2015 Filing 229 LETTER MOTION to Dismiss by Billy R. Wilks. (tkd, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 226 Choice of Law BRIEF filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sharma Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Atty Servs Agmt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Dewan Agmt w/Kaliyadan, #5 Exhibit 4 - Global Resources Agmt w/Dewan, #6 Exhibit 5 - Recruitment Agmt between Global and Signal, #7 Exhibit 6 - Signal Agmt w/Burnett, #8 Exhibit 7 - Power of Atty (Dewan) (08/03/06), #9 Exhibit 8 - Signal Agmt w/Dewan, #10 Exhibit 9 - Power of Atty (Dewan) (6/19/06), #11 Exhibit 10 - Burnett Dep. Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11 - Dewan Dep. Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12 - Kaliyadan Dep. Excerpts, #14 Exhibit 13 - Multilateral Business Agmt)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 2/23/2015 (tkd, ).
February 20, 2015 Filing 225 Choice of Law BRIEF by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 2/23/2015 (tkd, ).
February 18, 2015 Filing 224 OBJECTIONS to #219 Report and Recommendation filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 2/19/2015 (tkd, ).
February 17, 2015 Filing 223 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #219 Report and Recommendation by Billy R. Wilks on 2/11/15. (tkd, )
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM and ORDER on the Parties' Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony. Order granting in part #150 Motion to Exclude Ron J McAlear as Expert; denying #151 Motion to Exclude Virginia Miles as Expert; granting in part #152 Motion to Exclude Kevin Fox Gotham as Expert; granting in part #153 Motion to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of Signal's Immigration Law Expert; granting #154 Motion to Exclude Donald H Strobel as Expert; granting #155 Motion to Limit the Testimony of Enrique Gonzalez III as Expert; granting in part #156 Motion to Exclude Dr Louise Shelley as Expert; denying #157 Motion in Limine to Exclude/Limit Testimony of Amy Mowl; granting in part #158 Motion in Limine to Exclude/Limit Testimony of Florence Burke; granting #159 Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/12/15. (tkd, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #192 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2-11-2015. (zjh1, )
February 9, 2015 Filing 221 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #217 and #218 Orders by Billy R. Wilks on 2/5/15. (tkd, )
February 5, 2015 Filing 220 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #216 Report and Recommendation by Billy R. Wilks. (tkd, )
February 4, 2015 Filing 219 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/4/15. (tkd, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER re Presenting Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/30/15. (tkd, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER directing the parties to submit briefing on any issues related to choice of law or conflicts on law by 2/20/15. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/30/15. (tkd, )
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #207 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1-28-2015. (zjh1, )
January 27, 2015 Filing 216 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #98 MOTION of Amended Plaintiffs to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Claims Against Defendant Michael Pol be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/27/2015. (bjc, )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #214 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1-16-2015. (zjh1, )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #211 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1-16-2015. (zjh1, )
January 15, 2015 Filing 215 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #214 Second MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Supplemental Authority.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2134)(Landers, Daniella)
January 15, 2015 Filing 214 Second MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
January 15, 2015 Filing 213 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #211 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit David Doc. No.2045 (Gotham), #2 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2069 (McAlear), #3 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2077 (Partial SJ - TVPA), #4 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2090 (Partial SJ - TVPA; modifies Doc. No. 2077), #5 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2115 (Partial SJ - RICO), #6 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2131 (Mowl), #7 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2132 (Signorino and Payne [for Miles]), #8 Exhibit David Doc. No. 2136 (Gonzalez))(Landers, Daniella)
January 15, 2015 Filing 212 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #210 Order by Billy R. Wilks on 1/12/15. (tkd, )
January 15, 2015 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 1/15/2015 (tkd, ).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER setting time limits for each party to present its case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/7/2015. (bjc, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 209 EXHIBIT A to #208 Third Amended Complaint.. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 1/7/2015 (bjc, ).
December 23, 2014 Filing 208 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 12/29/2014 (tkd, ).
December 23, 2014 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #185 Signal's Motion for leave to supplement answer to second amended complaint. The relief requested by pltfs in their response is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/12/14. (tkd, )
December 11, 2014 ***Cross-claims transferred from Texas Eastern have been opened in Eastern District of Louisiana as case 2:14-cv-02826, filed 12/11/2014. (tkd, )
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER SEVERING AND TRANSFERRING CROSS-CLAIMS. Order granting in part #167 and 169 Motions to Defer or Transfer Venue of Cross-claims. The Clerk is directed to sever Signal's cross-claims against cross-defendants Malvern C Burnett, Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants Pvt Ltd, Global Resources Inc, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center LLC, Indo-Ameri Soft LLC, J&M Associates Inc of Mississippi, J&M Marine & Industrial LLC, Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett APC, Michael Pol, Kurella Rao, and Billy R Wilks. These claims are to be transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Further ordered that #199 Signal's Motion for Reconsideration and #201 Burnett's Response are part of the severed action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/8/14. (tkd, )
December 4, 2014 Filing 204 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Sajimon Kutty by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
November 24, 2014 Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Leave to Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (see also #198 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
November 21, 2014 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 MOTION for Reconsideration re #148 Order on Motion to Compel and Objection to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
November 20, 2014 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION for Reconsideration of 10/20/2014 Oral Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Cerniglia, Timothy)
November 20, 2014 Filing 200 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
November 17, 2014 Filing 199 MOTION for Reconsideration of 10/20/2014 Oral Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Partial MSJ re Burnett, #3 Statement of Uncontested Facts, #4 Text of Proposed Order (MSJ), #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit 1, #33 Exhibit 2, #34 Exhibit 3, #35 Exhibit 4, #36 Exhibit 5, #37 Exhibit 6, #38 Exhibit 7, #39 Exhibit 8, #40 Exhibit 9, #41 Exhibit 10, #42 Exhibit 11, #43 Exhibit 12, #44 Exhibit 13, #45 Exhibit 14, #46 Exhibit 15, #47 Exhibit 16, #48 Exhibit 17, #49 Exhibit 18, #50 Exhibit 19, #51 Exhibit 20, #52 Exhibit 20A, #53 Exhibit 21, #54 Exhibit 22, #55 Exhibit 23, #56 Exhibit 24, #57 Exhibit 25, #58 Exhibit 26, #59 Exhibit 27, #60 Exhibit 28, #61 Exhibit 29, #62 Exhibit 30, #63 Exhibit 31)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 11/18/2014 (tkd, ).
November 13, 2014 Filing 198 AMENDED ANSWER to #64 Second Amended Complaint by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 11/14/2014 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2014 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION in Limine To Limit Testimony Of Enrique Gonzalez, III As Expert filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail (Aug. 24, 2006))(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2014 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #154 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Don H. Strobel As Expert filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2014 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re #156 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Dr. Louise Shelley As Expert filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2014 Filing 194 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Kevin Fox Gotham As Expert filed by All Plaintiffs (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tkd, ).
November 11, 2014 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 MOTION for Reconsideration re #148 Order on Motion to Compel and Objection to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
November 11, 2014 Filing 192 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response of Signal Defendants Opposing Plaintiffs' Objection [#172] to Magistrate's Memorandum and Order [#148] Granting in Part and Denying in Part Signal's Motion [#127] to Compel by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
November 11, 2014 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION in Limine /Limit Report and Testimony of Amy Mowl filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amy Mowl depo transcript, #2 Exhibit B)(Hangartner, Erin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Virginia Miles As Expert In Support Of Motion To Exclude Virginia Miles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payne Deposition Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibit 1 [Payne] Report, #3 Exhibit C - Signorino Deposition Excerpt)(Landers, Daniella)
November 10, 2014 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Ron J. McAlear As Expert In Support Of Motion To Exclude filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
November 10, 2014 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 MOTION for Reconsideration re #148 Order on Motion to Compel and Objection to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
November 7, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 324, exhibit. Exhibits are not filed as a stand alone document. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney will re-file.*** (bjc)
November 6, 2014 Filing 186 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' RICO Fraud Chart (Exhibit 1) #164 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim,,,, by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 11/7/2014 (bjc, ).
November 6, 2014 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
November 6, 2014 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Support re #158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude/Limit Testimony of Florence Burke filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Response to Signal's Statement of Issues to be Decided by Court, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 INDEX to Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 - James Dep. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 2 - Baby Dep. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 3 - Varkey Dep. Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 4 - Kaliyadan Dep. Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 5 - Sanders e-mail (02/02/2007), #9 Exhibit 6 - S. Dewan Class Dep. Excerpts (2009), #10 Exhibit 7 - Pol Dep. Excerpts (2009), #11 Exhibit 8 - Multilateral Business Agreement, #12 Exhibit 9 - Power of Attorney, #13 Exhibit 10 - Signal letter to Dewan (06/19/2006), #14 Exhibit 11 - Skilled Worker Recruitment Agreement, #15 Exhibit 12 - Burnett 2006 Retention Letter, #16 Exhibit 13 - Burnett Jurisdiction Dep. Excerpts (2008), #17 Exhibit 14 - Burnett Class Dep. Excerpts (2009), #18 Exhibit 15 - Schnoor Class Dep. Excerpts (2009), #19 Exhibit 16 - Cunningham Class Dep. Excerpts (2010), #20 Exhibit 17 - Burnett Fee Agreement (July 2007), #21 Exhibit 18 - Burnett Fee Agreement (Sept. 2007), #22 Exhibit 19 - Global Resources e-mail (08/24/2006), #23 Exhibit 20 - Weekly Update (08/11/2006), #24 Exhibit 21 - Dewan/Burnett e-mails (12/16/2006), #25 Exhibit 22 - Burnett letter to US Dep't of Home Security, #26 Exhibit 23 - I-129 Petition, #27 Exhibit 24 - Orange Master List, #28 Exhibit 25 - John Sanders notes (11/17/2006), #29 Exhibit 26 - John Sanders notes (01/19/2007), #30 Exhibit 27 - John Sanders notes (11/20/2006), #31 Exhibit 28 - Compilation of e-mails)(Landers, Daniella)
November 3, 2014 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION in Limine /Limit Report and Testimony of Amy Mowl filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amy Mowl, #2 Exhibit A - Amy Mowl Report, #3 Exhibit B - Amy Mowl Deposition)(Landers, Daniella)
November 3, 2014 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude/Limit Testimony of Florence Burke filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Report, #3 Exhibit B - Deposition)(Landers, Daniella)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #179 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11-03-2014. (zjh1, )
November 1, 2014 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #159 MOTION in Limine or to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony, #156 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Dr. Louise Shelley As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandam Opposition to Daubert Motions in Excess of Page Limits by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #152 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Kevin Fox Gotham As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Relevant portions of deposition transcript of Richard Marler, #2 Exhibit 2 - Relevant portions of deposition transcript of Lisa Spears, #3 Exhibit 3 - Information considered by Kevin Fox Gotham, #4 Exhibit 4 - CV of Kevin Fox Gotham, #5 Exhibit 5 - Relevant portions of deposition transcript of Kevin Fox Gotham)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 177 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Don H. Strobel As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 MOTION in Limine To Limit Testimony Of Enrique Gonzalez, III As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Enrique Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit B - relevant portions of deposition trancript, #3 Exhibit C - Speaking Engagements)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of Signal's Immigration Law Experts filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Enrique Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit B - Speaking Engagement)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 11/3/2014 (tkd, ).
October 31, 2014 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Virginia Miles As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Clyde Payne, #2 Exhibit B - Portions of 1989 OSHA Field Manual)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 30, 2014 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Ron J. McAlear As Expert filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
October 30, 2014 Filing 172 MOTION for Reconsideration of #127 Motion to Compel and OBJECTION to #148 Memorandum and Order on Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Form I-914 Application)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/31/2014 (tkd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2014: #2 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
October 29, 2014 Filing 171 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #149 Amended Scheduling Order by Billy R. Wilks on 10/18/14. (tkd, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mary Beth Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4903242. (Martinez, Mary)
October 22, 2014 Filing 169 MOTION to Defer Signal's Crossclaim by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Docketed for statistical purposes only; second part of 2-part motion. See also #167 Motion to Transfer Venue) (tkd, )
October 22, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Travis J Mock on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4894928. (Mock, Travis)
October 22, 2014 Filing 167 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy) (Two-part motion; see also #169 Motion to Defer Crossclaim) Modified on 10/23/2014 (tkd, ).
October 22, 2014 Filing 166 ANSWER to #19 First Amended Complaint, #64 Second Amended Complaint by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 10/23/2014 (tkd, ).
October 21, 2014 Filing 165 EXHIBIT 20 to #162 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 10/22/2014 (tkd, ).
October 20, 2014 Filing 164 ANSWER to #64 Second Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Malvern C. Barnett, Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD, Global Resources, Inc., Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Indo-Ameri Soft, L.L.C., J&M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi, J&M Marine & Industrial, L.L.C., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C., Michael Pol, Kurella Rao, Billy R. Wilks by Signal International, Inc., Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, LLC.(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 10/21/2014 (tkd, ).
October 20, 2014 ***FILED in wrong case. Document # 160, motion for partial summary judgment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #162 Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signal has not filed a cross-claim against defendants Malvern C. Burnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, L.L.C. or the Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10-21-2014. (zjh1)
October 17, 2014 Filing 163 Additional Attachment (Exhibit 25) to Main Document: #162 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A-J, #4 Exhibit K-X, #5 Exhibit Y-AA, #6 Exhibit 1-10, #7 Exhibit 11-13, #8 Exhibit 14-16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18-19, #11 Exhibit 20A Part 1, #12 Exhibit 20A Part 2, #13 Exhibit 21-24, #14 Affidavit, #15 Statement of Uncontested Facts)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 160 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issue, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 10/20/2014 (bjc, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 159 MOTION in Limine or to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen)
October 17, 2014 Filing 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude/Limit Testimony of Florence Burke by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Expert Report Joseph in Globo, #2 Exhibit A - Expert Report Samuel in globol, #3 Exhibit A Expert Report David in Globol, #4 Exhibit B - deposition testimony, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 157 MOTION in Limine /Limit Report and Testimony of Amy Mowl by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Expert Report Joseph in Globo, #2 Exhibit A Expet Report Samuel in Globol, #3 Exhibit A Expert Report David in Globol, #4 Exhibit B - deposition testimony, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Dr. Louise Shelley As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Louise Shelley - Deposition (09-23-2014), #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Louise Shelley Expert Report (Joseph case), #3 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 155 MOTION in Limine To Limit Testimony Of Enrique Gonzalez, III As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Enrique Gonzalez, III - Expert Report (Joseph case), #2 Exhibit B - Enrique Gonzalez, III - Deposition (09-30-2014), #3 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 154 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Don H. Strobel As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Don H. Strobel - Export Report (Joseph case), #2 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of Signal's Immigration Law Experts by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ). Modified on 11/3/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Kevin Fox Gotham As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kevin Fox Gotham - Expert Report (Joseph case), #2 Exhibit B - Kevin Fox Gotham Deposition (10-06-2014), #3 Text of Proposed Order (Gotham))(Landers, Daniella)
October 17, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Virginia Miles As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Virginia Miles Expert Report (Joseph case), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Miles))(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Ron J. McAlear As Expert by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - McAlear Expert Report (filed in Texas), #2 Exhibit B - McAlear Deposition (10-10-2014), #3 Exhibit C - McAlear Expert Report (filed in David case), #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Ron J. McAlear As Expert)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/20/2014 (tkd, ).
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/2/2015 at 9:00 AM. Jury Selection/Trial reset for 4/6/2015 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/16/14. (tkd, )
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #127 Motion to Compel. Further ordered that #137 Request for protective order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/15/14. (tkd, )
October 9, 2014 Filing 147 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #127 MOTION to Compel and [ECF No. 137] Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
October 9, 2014 Filing 146 MOTION to Withdraw #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference on #103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and #141 Emergency Agreed Motion to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines. Telephonic Conference set for 10/9/2014 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. This order grants #143 Motion to Conduct a Telephone Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/9/14. (tkd, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #146 Motion to Withdraw #103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10-9-2014. (zjh1, )
October 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2014 re #141 Emergency Agreed MOTION to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines filed by All Plaintiffs. Court hears arguments. Court denies motion. (Court Reporter DCR - Jill Veazey.) (jmv, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #141 Motion for Extension of Time for reasons stated during telephonic conference held on 10-9-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10-9-2014. (zjh1, )
October 8, 2014 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 Emergency Agreed MOTION to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/9/2014 (tkd, ).
October 8, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION to Conduct a Telephone Status Conference re #141 Emergency Agreed MOTION to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines, #142 Response in Opposition to Motion by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen) Modified on 10/9/2014 (tkd, ).
October 8, 2014 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 Emergency Agreed MOTION to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines filed by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Shapiro, Stephen) Modified on 10/9/2014 (tkd, ).
October 8, 2014 Filing 141 Emergency Agreed MOTION to Extend Motion Filing and Deposition of Experts Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 10/9/2014 (tkd, ).
September 29, 2014 Filing 140 REPLY in Further Support of #127 MOTION to Compel filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 9/30/2014 (tkd, ).
September 22, 2014 Filing 139 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #137 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Landers, Daniella)
September 22, 2014 Filing 138 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #137 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Landers, Daniella)
September 22, 2014 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 Motion to Compel and REQUEST for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signal's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production, #2 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/23/2014 (tkd, ).
September 15, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Masur Davis on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4835102. (Davis, Lauren)
September 15, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell P Hasenkampf on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4834400. (Hasenkampf, Mitchell)
September 12, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James L Cornblatt on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4833035. (Cornblatt, James)
September 12, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert L Keller, II on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4832928. (Keller, Robert)
September 12, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Patrick Maney on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4832458. (Maney, Kevin)
September 12, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Heather M Niemeyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4832432. (Niemeyer, Heather)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER adopting #124 Report and Recommendation and denying #32 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/11/14. (tkd, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER adopting #100 Report and Recommendation and denying #31 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2). Burnett's alternative request for an interlocutory appeal to the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals is also denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/11/14. (tkd, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER adopting #99 Report and Recommendation and denying #70 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/11/14. (tkd, )
September 5, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) - Plaintiffs' Responses, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2) - Plaintiffs' Responses, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Facebook Pages, #4 Exhibit 3 - Depo Excerpts, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
August 11, 2014 Filing 126 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #124 Report and Recommendation by Billy R. Wilks ON 8/8/14. (tkd, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 125 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #122 Second Amended Scheduling Order by Billy R. Wilks on 8/2/14. (tkd, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE recommending the Burnett Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)" should be denied re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/31/14. (dlc, )
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #69 Motion to Reassert #31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/4/14. (zjh1)
July 31, 2014 Filing 123 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #118 Consent Motion for extension of time to complete discovery and extend other case related deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/29/14. (tkd, )
July 29, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE of Expert Witness Disclosure by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 7/30/2014 (tkd, ).
July 23, 2014 Filing 120 REPLY in Further Support of Signal's Objections to #99 Report and Recommendation by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 7/24/2014 (tkd, ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Shapiro, Stephen)
July 21, 2014 Filing 118 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extend other case related deadlines by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
July 17, 2014 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition to #106 Signal's Objections to #99 Report and Recommendation that Signal's Motion to Dismiss be Denied filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 7/18/2014 (tkd, ).
July 15, 2014 Filing 116 ADVISORY concerning page limitations for appeals of magistrate judge decisions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/15/14. (tkd, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying #39 Motion to transfer venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/14/14. (tkd, )
July 14, 2014 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition to #104 Objections To Magistrate's Recommendation to Deny Burnett's Jurisdictional Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 7/15/2014 (tkd, ).
July 14, 2014 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Of Record For Sachin Dewan and Dewan Consultants PVT. LTD. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Ka-Kui Shiu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/14/14. (zjh1)
July 11, 2014 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Gary K. Shiu) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Gary K. Shiu As An Attorney Of Record For The Plaintiffs)(Landers, Daniella)
July 11, 2014 Filing 111 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record For The Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion To Withdraw)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 7/11/2014 (bjc, ).
July 11, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lance R Rydberg on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4740861. (Rydberg, Lance)
July 11, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the motoin to withdraw as attorney submitted by All Plaintiffs. No certificate of conference. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (bjc)
July 7, 2014 Filing 109 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #105 Amended Scheduling Order by Billy R. Wilks on 6/30/14. (dlc)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER designating plaintiffs for first trial setting. The parties have agreed the following Plaintiffs are designated to proceed to trial for the courts first trial setting: John Charuvila George, Iju James, Paul Sojan Kaliyadan, Sajimon Kutty and Joy Kallachiyill Varkey.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/7/2014. (bjc)
July 2, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Hearing held on 6/26/2014 before Judge Zack Hawthorn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2014. (tj, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 106 OBJECTION to #99 Report and Recommendations by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER resetting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference remains set for 4/9/15. Jury selection and trial remain set for 4/13/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/26/14. (tkd, )
June 26, 2014 Filing 104 OBJECTION to #100 Report and Recommendation by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. (Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 7/11/2014 (bjc, ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Conference, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen)
June 26, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: 8:37am - 9:41 am Telephone Conference held on 6/26/2014. Appearances: John Fleming, Daniella Landers, Pla cnsl; Hal Ungar, Alan Weinberger, Timothy Cerniglia and Stephen Shapiro, Dft cnsl. (Courtroom Deputy & DCR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, )
June 25, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore documents # 101-102, Motions to Withdraw as Counsel. Motion wil be refiled to comply with local rules re: motion and combined memorandum, certificate of conference, corrected heading.*** (tkd, )
June 25, 2014 Filing 102 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Shapiro, Stephen) Modified on 6/26/2014 (tkd, ).
June 25, 2014 Filing 101 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen) Modified on 6/26/2014 (tkd, ).
June 24, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2014 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #69 Motion to Reassert #31 Motion to Dismiss. It is recommended that #31 Motion to Dismiss should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/18/14. (tkd, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #70 Motion to Dismiss should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/12/14. (tkd, )
June 13, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION of Amended Plaintiffs to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Claims Against Defendant Michael Pol, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 6/16/2014 (tkd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2014: #1 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying #76 Motion pursuant to Federal Rule 72 and LR 72(b) for review of magistrate's decision. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/11/2014. (bjc)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #95 Motion for Discovery. The oral order granting this motion will operate as a signature of the proposed orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6-11-2014. (Hawthorn, Zack)
June 9, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Submission of Expert Disclosure (Landers, Daniella)
June 9, 2014 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Consent Orders Regarding Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order re Protocols for Production of ESI, #2 Consent Supplemental Protective Order, #3 Consent Clawback Order, #4 Consent Order re Use of Discovery from Related Cases)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 6/10/2014 (bjc, ).
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/6/13. (zjh1)
June 3, 2014 Filing 94 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD.(Shapiro, Stephen)
June 3, 2014 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #64 Amended Complaint by Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Stephen)
May 28, 2014 Filing 92 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sachin Dewan, Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD.( Shapiro, Stephen) Modified on 5/29/2014 (tkd, ).
May 27, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Automatic Stay of Claims Against Defendants Kurella Rao and Indo-Ameri Soft, LLC (Landers, Daniella)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/1/14. (zjh1)
April 30, 2014 Filing 90 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Designations by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
April 28, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 10/17/2013 before Judge Zack Hawthorn. Court Reporter: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2014. (tj, )
April 22, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Roux on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4624081. (Roux, Brian)
April 9, 2014 Filing 87 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sachin Dewan and Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD served on 2/17/2014, answers due 4/18/2014. (tkd, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/9/14. (zjh1)
April 7, 2014 Filing 86 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.First MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' First Requests For Production of Documents To Defendants Malveryn C. Burnett, Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C., and Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 4/7/2014 (tkd, ).
April 7, 2014 Filing 85 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.First MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' First Requests For Production of Documents To Defendants Signal International, L.L.C., Signal International, Inc., Signal International Texas L.P., and Signal International Texas, G.P. by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) Modified on 4/7/2014 (tkd, ).
April 7, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore documents # 85-86, Requests for Production by plaintiffs. This court does not accept discover requests for filing. (tkd, )
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/4/14. (zjh1)
April 3, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan M. Herman and Middleberg Riddle Group by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan)
March 25, 2014 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION to Reassert #31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #32 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2014: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 25, 2014 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response To Burnett's Reasserted Motion To Dismiss [ECF-69] by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2014: #1 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dominic J Gianna terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3-19-14. (Hawthorn, Zack)
March 17, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Dominic J. Gianna) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
March 17, 2014 Filing 80 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
March 11, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ka-Kui Shiu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shiu, Gary)
March 7, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
March 3, 2014 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
February 21, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order denying motion to transfer by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin) Modified on 2/24/2014 (tkd, ).
February 18, 2014 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss (Partially) Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/11/14. (tkd, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION to Reassert #31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #32 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 2/11/2014 (tkd, ).
January 30, 2014 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Indo-Ameri Soft, L.L.C. served on 1/4/2014, answer due 1/27/2014. (tkd, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kurella Rao served on 1/4/2014, answer due 1/27/2014. (tkd, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss (Partially) Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hangartner, Erin)
January 23, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION to Reassert #31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #32 Motion to Dismiss by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 1/24/2014 (tkd, ). Modified on 1/24/2014 (tkd, ).
January 17, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service on Foreign Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/17/14. (zjh1)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: #24 Motion to Dismiss; #31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; #32 Motion to Dismiss; #40 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice the claims against deft Michael Pol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/16/14. (tkd, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address by Erin Casey Hangartner (Hangartner, Erin)
December 19, 2013 Filing 65 SUMMONS Issued as to Sachin Dewan and Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD and sent by FedEX to plas' atty for service(aam, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs, Paulose Chirackal Airookaran Joseph, Subburaj Rengasamy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Landers, Daniella)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/18/13. (tkd, )
October 25, 2013 Filing 62 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #61 Scheduling Order by Billy R. Wilks on 10/21/13 (tkd, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2015 at 9:00 AM and Jury Selection/ Trial set for 4/13/2015 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/17/13. (tkd, )
October 17, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: 10:20 am - 10:38 am Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2013. Appearances: Daniella Landers & John Fleming, Pla counsel; Patricia Bollman & Erin Hangartner, Def counsel. (Courtroom Deputy & DCR Op: Piper.) (ttp, )
October 11, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by All Plaintiffs (Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures) (Landers, Daniella)
October 10, 2013 Filing 59 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines, #2 Exhibit B: Signal Defendants' Supplemental Contentions of Fact)(Landers, Daniella)
October 1, 2013 Filing 58 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
September 27, 2013 Filing 57 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
September 27, 2013 Filing 56 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
September 23, 2013 Filing 55 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
September 23, 2013 Filing 54 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Landers, Daniella)
September 23, 2013 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION Transfer Venue filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Cerniglia, Timothy)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time for Service on Defendants. Deadline extended to 1/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/23/13. (zjh1)
September 20, 2013 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
September 19, 2013 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cerniglia, Timothy)
September 19, 2013 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Malvern C. Barnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Cerniglia, Timothy)
September 19, 2013 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Service on Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/20/2013 (tkd, ).
September 18, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #48, Motion for Extension of Time for Service on Defendants. Motion is missing the required certificate of conference and must be refiled. (tkd, )
September 18, 2013 Filing 48 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION For Extension Of Time For Service On Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/19/2013 (tkd, ).
September 12, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
September 12, 2013 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6) filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
September 12, 2013 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule filed by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Hangartner, Erin)
September 12, 2013 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
September 5, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/6/2013 (tkd, ).
September 5, 2013 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella)
September 5, 2013 Filing 41 FILED IN ERROR per attorney. Please ignore.RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/5/2013 (tkd, ).
September 5, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #41, Response to Motion to Transfer Action. Per attorney, there was an error in the document. Attorney will refile. (tkd, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION of Plaintiffs First Named in the Amended Complaint to Dismiss Without Prejudice Their Claims Against Defendant Michael Pol by Vasavan Babu, Varghese Kannampuzha Devassy, Iju James, Gijo John, Omanakuttan Govindan Kakkanthara, Suresh Kokkoth, Pankajakshan Madhavan, Sebastian George Pananijkal, Biju Potrayil, Ravi Rowthu, Abraham Varghese, Joy Kallachiyil Varkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 9/5/2013 (tkd, ).
September 3, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION Transfer Venue by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy)
August 30, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan Dean Weinberger on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4291539. (Weinberger, Alan)
August 30, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patricia Bollman on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4291488. (Bollman, Patricia)
August 30, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dominic J Gianna on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4291466. (Gianna, Dominic)
August 30, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elham R Rabbani on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4291435. (Rabbani, Elham)
August 27, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hal D Ungar on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4285873. (Ungar, Hal)
August 26, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Billy R. Wilks, J&M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi, J&M Marine & Industrial, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Pltf's Atty, #2 Letter from Billy Wilks)(tkd, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - La. Complaint, #2 Proposed Text - Rule 12(b)(6) Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy)
August 26, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Defendant Affidavit, #2 Proposed Text - Rule 12(b)(2) Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy)
August 26, 2013 Filing 30 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Dismiss by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 8/26/2013 (tkd, ).
August 26, 2013 Filing 29 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.. Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cerniglia, Timothy) Modified on 8/26/2013 (tkd, ).
August 26, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore documents # 29 and 30, Motions to Dismiss. The wrong PDF documents were attached. Attorney will refile. (tkd, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Erin Casey Hangartner on behalf of Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4277134. (Hangartner, Erin)
August 20, 2013 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Billy R. Wilks waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. J&M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. J&M Marine & Industrial, L.L.C. waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
August 19, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6) by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan)
August 19, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION to Transfer Action Pursuant to First Filed Rule by Signal International Texas, G.P., Signal International Texas, L.P., Signal International, Inc., Signal International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 9/5/13 with a joint report due 10/10/13. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2013 at 10:15 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/6/13. (tkd, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 21 ADVISORY to the Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/6/13. (tkd, )
August 1, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jaliya S Faulkner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4248408. (Faulkner, Jaliya)
August 1, 2013 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs, Pankajakshan Madhavan, Ravi Rowthu, Gijo John, Suresh Kokkoth, Sebastian George Pananijkal, Varghese Kannampuzha Devassy, Joy Kallachiyil Varkey, Biju Potrayil, Abraham Varghese, Vasavan Babu, Iju James, Omanakuttan Govindan Kakkanthara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 8/2/2013 (tkd, ).
July 31, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #18, First Amended Complaint. Attorney will refile to add the new plaintiffs to the docket sheet.(tkd, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 18 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landers, Daniella) Modified on 8/1/2013 (tkd, ).
July 16, 2013 Defendants' Unopposed First Applications for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint are GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Signal International, Inc, Signal International Texas G.P., Signal International Texas L.P. and Signal International LLC to 8/19/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( tkd, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Signal International Texas, L.P..( Herman, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Signal International Texas, G.P..( Herman, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Signal International, Inc..( Herman, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Signal International, LLC.( Herman, Jonathan)
July 12, 2013 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Biju Makrukkattu Joseph. Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C. waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Biju Makrukkattu Joseph. Malvern C. Barnett waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Biju Makrukkattu Joseph. Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC. waiver sent on 6/25/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (pkb, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kara D Duffle on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4182854. (Duffle, Kara)
June 17, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Teresa L Sulmers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4182825. (Sulmers, Teresa)
June 17, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel Adam Mendel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4182522. (Mendel, Gabriel)
June 3, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kurt Lentz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4163747. (Lentz, Kurt)
May 30, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John H Fleming on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4159980. (Fleming, John)
May 28, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Keith Barnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4155821. (Barnett, Keith)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/22/13. (tkd, )
May 22, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants and emailed to plas' atty for service. (aam, )
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 6/11/13. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/21/13. (tkd, ) Modified on 5/21/2013 (tkd, ).
May 21, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4146745.), filed by Biju Makrukkattu Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons(es), ***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS(ES) ARE NOT FILED AS ATTACHMENTS. THEY NEED TO BE EMAILED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR ISSUANCE. PLEASE IGNOR.*** #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es), #12 Summons(es), #13 Summons(es), #14 Summons(es), #15 Summons(es), #16 Summons(es), #17 Summons(es), #18 Summons(es), #19 Summons(es), #20 Summons(es))(Landers, Daniella)
May 21, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Ron Clark. (aam, )
May 21, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #2, Order Governing Proceedings. This order was entered prematurely by the Court. (tkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph et al v. Signal International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewan Consultants PVT.LTD
Represented By: Stephen H Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal International, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Represented By: Alan Dean Weinberger
Represented By: Brian Christopher Roux
Represented By: Erin Casey Hangartner
Represented By: Hal D Ungar
Represented By: James L Cornblatt
Represented By: Dominic J Gianna
Represented By: Elham R Rabbani
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Maney
Represented By: Lance R Rydberg
Represented By: Lauren Masur Davis
Represented By: Mitchell P Hasenkampf
Represented By: Patricia Bollman
Represented By: Robert L Keller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal International, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Represented By: James L Cornblatt
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Maney
Represented By: Lance R Rydberg
Represented By: Lauren Masur Davis
Represented By: Mitchell P Hasenkampf
Represented By: Patricia Bollman
Represented By: Robert L Keller, II
Represented By: Alan Dean Weinberger
Represented By: Brian Christopher Roux
Represented By: Dominic J Gianna
Represented By: Elham R Rabbani
Represented By: Erin Casey Hangartner
Represented By: Hal D Ungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal International Texas, G.P.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Represented By: Alan Dean Weinberger
Represented By: Brian Christopher Roux
Represented By: Dominic J Gianna
Represented By: Elham R Rabbani
Represented By: Lauren Masur Davis
Represented By: Mitchell P Hasenkampf
Represented By: Patricia Bollman
Represented By: Robert L Keller, II
Represented By: Erin Casey Hangartner
Represented By: Hal D Ungar
Represented By: James L Cornblatt
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Maney
Represented By: Lance R Rydberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal International Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Represented By: Alan Dean Weinberger
Represented By: Brian Christopher Roux
Represented By: Dominic J Gianna
Represented By: Elham R Rabbani
Represented By: Erin Casey Hangartner
Represented By: Hal D Ungar
Represented By: James L Cornblatt
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Maney
Represented By: Lance R Rydberg
Represented By: Lauren Masur Davis
Represented By: Mitchell P Hasenkampf
Represented By: Patricia Bollman
Represented By: Robert L Keller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvern C. Barnett
Represented By: Timothy W Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, LLC.
Represented By: Timothy W Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.
Represented By: Timothy W Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indo-Ameri Soft, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurella Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy R. Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&M Marine & Industrial, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sachin Dewan
Represented By: Stephen H Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtech Consultants
Represented By: Stephen H Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biju Makrukkattu Joseph
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Joseph Attayil
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Kainikkeril Yohannan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishnan Venugopal
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Pappachan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shogy Vezhaparambil Ousephkutty
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viswamithran Raghavan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sajimon Kutty
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kunjuchan Varghese
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Charuvila George
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Baby
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babu Lal Mali
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vavachan Mathai Koottalil
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surje Prasad Tamang
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanridas Sankara Panicker
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eswara R. Kanithi
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kutty Vadakkeko Mathew
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Joseph
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagannadha Rao Saragadam
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prabhakaran Balakrishna Pillai
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kannankutty Ponnan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Devassy Arackal
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiran Mohan Baki
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sojan Paul Kaliyadan
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakhbir Singh
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishnan Kannayan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramachandran Murugaiyan
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Joseph Rodrigues
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kunhikrishn Kaniyamkulam Veetil
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Boban Peruvelil
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sreedharan Babu
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bijay Kumar Biswas
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suresh Kumar Pillai Kavalamkuzhi
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: John H Fleming
Represented By: Kara D Ford
Represented By: Keith Barnett
Represented By: Kurt Lentz
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Teresa L Sulmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Anjali J Nair
Represented By: Bryan M Ward
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Mary Beth Martinez
Represented By: Matthew J Bowness
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Travis J Mock
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pankajakshan Madhavan
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Rowthu
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gijo John
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suresh Kokkoth
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian George Pananijkal
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Kannampuzha Devassy
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Kallachiyil Varkey
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biju Potrayil
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Varghese
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasavan Babu
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iju James
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omanakuttan Govindan Kakkanthara
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Jaliya S Faulkner
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulose Chirackal Airookaran Joseph
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subburaj Rengasamy
Represented By: Gary Ka-Kui Shiu
Represented By: Heather M Niemeyer
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: Daniella Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?