Toups v. Google Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hollie Toups
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc., Google Inc and www.myex.com
Case Number: 1:2014cv00127
Filed: March 6, 2014
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia A. Crone
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Toups's claims against Defendant Google, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. In accordance with Toups's Notice of Dismissal of Defendant www.myex.com With Prejudice, filed on 9/19/14, Toups's claims against www.myex.com are dismissed with prejudice. This is a Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/19/14. (mrp, )
September 19, 2014 34 NOTICE by Hollie Toups of Dismissal of www.myex.com With Prejudice (Morgan, John)
September 18, 2014 33 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
September 16, 2014 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia A. Crone: Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2014. Counsel informed the court of the facts and issues in this copyright infringement case. During the status conference, counsel for the parties reached an agreement to remove the objectionable photograph. Toups's counsel indicated that he would voluntarily dismiss the case after removal of the photograph. In light of these developments, entry of the parties' proposed scheduling order is unnecessary.Signed at Beaumont, Texas, this 16th day of September, 2014, by Judge Marcia A. Crone. (mrp, )
September 11, 2014 31 Opposed MOTION to Compel Mediation, and Certificate of Conference by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
September 11, 2014 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
September 9, 2014 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Conference filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order 1, # 2 Proposed Order 2)(Heartfield, J)
September 8, 2014 28 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Conference by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
September 5, 2014 27 NOTICE by Google Inc re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Heartfield, J)
August 13, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/16/2014 11:00 AM in Chambers (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
August 11, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/3/2014 02:30 PM in Chambers (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
August 5, 2014 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
August 1, 2014 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 15, 2014 24 Featured Case PARTIAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Yahoo! Inc. is dismissed with prejudice as a defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/15/14. (mrp, )
July 15, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss Original Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/15/14. (mrp, )
July 15, 2014 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Injunctive Relief against Google Inc, www.myex.com, filed by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(mrp, )
July 15, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. It is ordered that the Clerk of Court is directed to file Exhibit 1 of Toups's motion as "Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief." Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/15/14. (mrp, )
July 14, 2014 20 RESPONSE to Motion re 19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Conference , and Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Google's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
June 27, 2014 19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Conference by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1" - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
June 27, 2014 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Google's Motion to Dismiss filed by Hollie Toups. (Morgan, John)
June 24, 2014 17 NOTICE by Hollie Toups of Dismissal of Yahoo!, Inc., With Prejudice (Morgan, John)
June 24, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/23/14. (mrp, )
June 24, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Toup's responses are due on or before 6/27/14. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/23/14. (mrp, )
June 18, 2014 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss, and Certificate of Conference filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
June 9, 2014 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss, and Certificate of Conference by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, John)
May 9, 2014 12 MOTION to Dismiss Google's Motion to Dismiss by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rees, Maura)
May 9, 2014 11 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Holly)
May 8, 2014 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas W Kenyon on behalf of Yahoo! Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4649884. (Kenyon, Douglas)
April 29, 2014 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Maura Lea Rees on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4635615. (Rees, Maura)
April 29, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Hallie Toup's Complaint is extended to 5/9/14. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 4/28/14. (mrp, )
April 28, 2014 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Michael Willen on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4633786. (Willen, Brian)
April 3, 2014 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Holly)
March 27, 2014 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Hollie Toup's Complaint is extended to 5/9/14. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/27/14. (mrp, )
March 26, 2014 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , or Otherwise Respond, by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
March 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Application for Extension of Time to Answer submitted by Google Inc. Document not accepted per Standing Order MC-12. Filing counsel has been notified to file a Motion for Extension of Time. (mrp, )
March 25, 2014 3 ***STRICKEN PER MC-12*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Heartfield, J) Modified on 3/26/2014 (mrp, ).
March 7, 2014 2 SUMMONS Issued and emailed to attorney John S. Morgan for service in case as to Google Inc, Yahoo! Inc., www.myex.com. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(pkb, )
March 6, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
March 6, 2014 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hollie Toups. (bjc)
March 6, 2014 Case assigned to Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc)
March 6, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4553050.), filed by Hollie Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toups v. Google Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Holly Harvel Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.myex.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollie Toups
Represented By: John Stephen Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?