Walker et al v. Beaumont Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Gary Walker, Walker's Electric and Walkers Electric
Defendant: Beaumont Independent School District, Aaron Covington, Leroy Saleme, Vernon Butler, Jane Kingsley, Terry Ingram, Michael "Mike" Neil, Tom Neild, Venice Monroe, A.B. Bernard, Jimmy Simmons, Robert . Turner, Joe Domino, Lenny Cabarello, Jack Carroll, The Beaumont Examiner, Don Dodd, Jennifer Johnson, ., Beaumont Enterprise, Brooke Crum, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 479, Steven Lisle, Dwayne Hermann, Chris Kibby, David Gonzales, Wayne Reaud, Michael Getz, Cory Crenshaw, Malcolm Bales, Jerry Jordan and Jonathan Cassidy
Case Number: 1:2015cv00379
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia A. Crone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER ADOPTING the 348 Report and Recommendation on Re-Urged Motions for Attorneys Fees. Neil and Neild's 346 Re-Urged Motion for Attorney Fees, and the 345 BISD Re-Urged Motion for Attorney Fees are granted. The Court Orders that a ttorneys fees are awarded in the amount of $95,282.75 to the BISD Defendants and $46,224.53 to Neil and Neild. The fee awards are to be recovered from Plaintiffs, jointly and severally. Plaintiffs are Ordered to pay the fee amounts within twenty-one (21) days of this order, as recommended by the magistrate judge and requested by Defendants. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/19/2021. (kcv, )
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Judge Giblin's 296 Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety. The Walker Plaintiffs' Objections 298 are overruled. The court further orders that the Federal Defendants' motion to d ismiss 21 is granted. Furthermore, because this order dispenses with all of Plaintiffs' claims remaining against Bob Rawls, Deanna Stevens, and Timothy Brewer, these defendants are dismissed as parties to this case. All parties are advised t hat this order is merely a memorandum order on the Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss and does not constitute a final judgment for purposes of appeal. The court will enter final judgment in this case once the court considers the remaining outstanding motions. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/28/17. (mrp, )
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Parties Chris Kibby, Steven Lisle, David Gonzales and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 479 terminated. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/7/17. (mrp, )
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's Objections # 247 are overruled. The 127 IBEW'S MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Ju risdiction is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, Walker's claims of tortious interference, civil conspiracy, and defamation not based on malice are dismissed based on the preemption of these claims by the exclusive jurisdiction o f the NLRB. Walker's claims of defamation based on malice and all of Plaintiff's claims under RICO are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, under Rule 12(c). The IBEW is dismissed as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/6/16. (mrp, )
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER ADOPTING 223 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in its entirety. The court orders that the 201 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cory Crenshaw, 104 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Malcolm Bales and the 96 Motion to Dismiss filed b y Cory Crenshaw are granted for reasons set out in Judge Giblin's Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, all of Plaintiff's claims against Crenshaw and Bales are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/12/16. (mrp, )
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM ORDER overruling objections and adopting 195 Report and Recommendation by granting in part/denying as moot in part 168 Motion to Dismiss. Specifically, the Enterprise Defendants motion to dismiss under the TCPA is granted as to Walke rs claims of defamation, tortious interference, and civil conspiracy and denied as moot as to Plaintiffs claims under RICO. The Enterprise Defendants motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) is granted as to all of Plaintiffs claims. Accordingly, all of Plaintiffs claims against Hearst Newspapers II, LLC (sued as The Beaumont Enterprise) and Brooke Crum are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/24/16. (tkd, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/30/2015. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Beaumont Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaumont Independent School District
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Covington
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Saleme
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Butler
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Kingsley
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Ingram
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael "Mike" Neil
Represented By: Christopher Blewer Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Neild
Represented By: Christopher Blewer Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venice Monroe
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.B. Bernard
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Simmons
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert . Turner
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Domino
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny Cabarello
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Carroll
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Beaumont Examiner
Represented By: Robert L Florance, IV
Represented By: Marc A Fuller
Represented By: L DeWayne Layfield
Represented By: Thomas S Leatherbury
Represented By: Gilbert Irvine Low
Represented By: Harry M Reasoner
Represented By: Gary Neale Reger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Truncale
Represented By: Stacey Neumann Vu
Represented By: John C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Dodd
Represented By: Robert L Florance, IV
Represented By: Marc A Fuller
Represented By: L DeWayne Layfield
Represented By: Thomas S Leatherbury
Represented By: Gilbert Irvine Low
Represented By: Harry M Reasoner
Represented By: Gary Neale Reger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Truncale
Represented By: Stacey Neumann Vu
Represented By: John C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Johnson, .
Represented By: Robert L Florance, IV
Represented By: Marc A Fuller
Represented By: L DeWayne Layfield
Represented By: Thomas S Leatherbury
Represented By: Gilbert Irvine Low
Represented By: Harry M Reasoner
Represented By: Gary Neale Reger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Truncale
Represented By: Stacey Neumann Vu
Represented By: John C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaumont Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 479
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kibby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Reaud
Represented By: Robert L Florance, IV
Represented By: Marc A Fuller
Represented By: L DeWayne Layfield
Represented By: Thomas S Leatherbury
Represented By: Gilbert Irvine Low
Represented By: Harry M Reasoner
Represented By: Gary Neale Reger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Truncale
Represented By: Stacey Neumann Vu
Represented By: John C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Getz
Represented By: David Vann de Cordova, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Crenshaw
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Bales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Gary Walker
Represented By: Maria-Vittoria Galli Carminati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker's Electric
Represented By: Maria-Vittoria Galli Carminati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkers Electric
Represented By: Maria-Vittoria Galli Carminati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?