Bonin v. Sabine River Authority of Texas
Plaintiff: Bonin, Dennis Haskin, Crystal Hoffpauir, Jeffery Campbell, Linda Barnes, Dexter Ashworth, Anne Sims, Patsy Tynes, Brenda Waller, Justin Hanson, Jacqueline Acreman, Lloyd Barnes, Shawna Kay, Lessie Wiggins, Danny Monson, James Reeves, Rodney Whitfield, Juanice Horlacher, Linda B Keeling, Marcus D Gautreaux, Mistie Carpenter, Wanda Rosemon, Joanna Barrilleaux, Kristy Barron, Donnia Barrow, Billy Cooper, Martha Monson, All Plaintiffs, Lois Hennigan, Caleb J Hebert, Jennifer Odom, David Says, David Brown, Nina Chaloupka, Robert Acreman, James Sayers, Deborah Guillory, Melissa Bickham, David Landrum, Stephanie Barnes, Lainey Bean, Joni Smith, Anita M Ryan, John Sims, Modestine Barnes, Cynthia M Myers, Barbara Callahan, Gabriella Synder, Carrie Holden, Diana Delgado, Barbara Leger, Cecil Herring, Michelle Weber, John Lucius, Cassy Marks, Taboris Joyce, Raymond Richard, Sylvia Stewart, William Bell, Jr, Peggy Albair, Janice Ashworth, Joseph Callahan, Lauren Lockwood, Ruby Foreman Arnold, Angelene Brown, Keitha McCaughey, Pablo Nunez, Georga White, Ronald Gillis, Carlton Zetar, Jr, Leroy O'Bannon, Jason Royer, Lacey McCrandall, Tiffany Cole, Mary Campbell, Eldon Welch, Jr., Dennis Thomas, Kimberly Kibodeaux, Nell Sparks, Henry Myers, Sherry Perkins, Rebecca Edwards, James . Perkins, Laura Toney, Delaina Hoosier, Cody Hyatt, Charles Buxton, Robert Bickham, Martha Dorsey, Polly Beaudeaux, Marquita Moore, Glynnie Hayes, Jimmie Stout, Scott Branch, Stacey Verrett, Tabor Ebner, Telisa Norwood, Gwen Tolbert, George W Burch, Mary Collins, Holly Frederick, Billy R Hanks, Raymond Cook, Mike Parrish, Brenda Stelly, Donna M Duke, Demetria Thurman, Michael Manuel, Joseph Bloodworth, Carolyn Pellerin, Ronald Norwood, Richard A Parker, Anita Reed, Waldean Garrett, Brenda Monson, Bessie Jordan, Steven Caswell, Karen Crenshaw, Kamesha Palmer, Bridgette Moore, Bryan Bussell, Opal Holaway, Tommy Thompson, Michael A Kelly, Lance Lowry, Norman Williams, Kenneth Ashworth, Kelly Smart, Quita Vandergriff, Barbara Royer, Lena Jacks, Richard Seago, Michael Johnson, Curtis R Jackson, Amanda Doyle, Ariefay Biscamp, Laura Woods, Ronald Mitchell, Karlneilous Coleman, William Vandergriff, Charles W Laughlin, Samuel Thompson, Eric Williams, Fred E Ashworth, Ralph Ocraman, Cheryl Thompson, Keturah Villarreal, James Burr, Deborah Nolan, Viki Lebrun, Elizabeth N Bradshaw, Carolyn Maddox, Angela Corbett, Lisa Burr, Mildred White, James Garrison, Jimmy Ray Burnitt, Gloria M Paris, Judy Reeves, Ronald Poole, Bonita Gosey, Harry Leger, Ronald Palmer, Virginia Odell, Anna Lisenby, Mona Manning, Jenell Snyder, Howard Duvall, Thomas Smith, Don McCollough, Anita Battles, George Beauchamp, Dorothy Bricker, Angela Ball, Tommy Morris, Sue Hollyfield, Roxann L Hines, Terel Hines, Roman Reyes, Sr, William Haney, Britany Jefferson, Kayla Brown, Cynthia McCoullough, Novela Hartfield, Terri Sue McLeod, George L. Sealy, Allen Tolbert, Paul Beaudeaux, Kenneth Verdine, Chad K Bailey, Lucy Hanks, Heather Hebert, Charisse Hamilton, Conadita Cormier, Amanda Folks, Tobin Holbrook, Lois Moore, Nathan Jarrell, Chester A Courmier, Alfred Sezer, Candie Broussard, Brian Childress, Diana Hoosler, James E Wilson, Nancy D Brown, Carol Boyd, Norma Manuel, David W Brice, Jr, Arlis Barrow, Maria Nunez, Montreall Easter, Nicky Ward, Linda Smith, Albert Collins, Thomas Wilkerson, Sr, Gracie Richard, Richard Morris, Brett McCaughey, Cedric McCain, Ronald Green, Shelby D Beassie, Jessica Rosemon, Juanita Gillis, Anna Clark, Crystal Hayes, Rene Hanks, Jr, Ashley Crase, Joseph Brown, Willie C Bradley, Jeanie Clark, William E Hansen, Jr, Robert Ballast, Danna Johnson, Ricky Ashworth, Doris Herring, Bill Martinez, Michelle Gilder, Max Self, Melissa King, Carey Peet, Tabitha Fedoroff, Kenneth Holaway, Bridget Coleman Edwards, Mack Keggler, Krystal Herline, Jimmy Stewart, Choyce Gandy, Donald Vanderbilt, Donna Tabor, Mary Stevison, Willow Simpson, Rodney Jolivette, Dennis Bussell, Daniel Snyder, Renee Bloodworth, Teresa Gilchriest, Leblanc Oscar, Sharon Shepherd, Joanna Shull, Jacqueline Lafleur, Frank Folks, Jr, Shirley Franklin Horton, Edward Smith, Stanley Floyd, William Chancery, Christina Perkins, Roger Hudson, Kenny Davis, Alice Calloway, Ramona Westbrook, Annette Smart, Belinda Hooks, Ronald Callahan, Angela Broussard, Alicia Woods, Michael Quinton, Don E Johnson, Brenda Richard, Donald Updike, Louis C Jolet, James Drummond, Judy Thompson, Sarah Thompson, ., Tracy Owen, Louis Gibson, Clarence Keith Curl, Jr, Guy Guillory, James Reed, Jr, Lovie D Garlington, William Stouffer, Paul Balch, Karl Jarrell, Lester Tubbs, Gabriel Spears, Patty Woodall, Eulice Benoit, Jr, Nanette Snyder, Joseph Courtright, Daniel Rhodes, Mary Balch, Dwayne Barrilleaux, Misty Jones, Danney Borel, Clarence . Williams, Eddie Corbett, Vera Gillis, James L Vincent, Larry Carroll, Geraldine Tilley, Mary Simpson, David Frenzel, David Foster, Alvin Meshell, Scottie Biscamp, Cathy Tyszko, Aquanetta Issac, Linda George, Lanny E Gibson, Alissa Cruse, Misty Cole, Kimberly Gillis, Debra Davis, Edward Parker, Nowlin Coleman, Catherine Roff, George R Dias, Scharlene Rodrick, Raymond Davis, James Dubose, Patricia Phillips, Daniel Ayres, Nelwyn Boykin, Gary Moore, Shaunn Rosemon, Richard Owen, Jr., Stephan Rodrick, Jonnie Ardoin, Melissa Lucius, Sandy Brown, Ted Hickman, Daniel Keogh, Katherine Thrailkille, Amber Williams, Robert McClain, Melinda Preddy, Sarah Scott, Danny Anderson, Oscar Peet, Holly Bussell, Barbara Barks, Roy Bussell, Sr, Reginald Nash, Justice Empson, Helen Neal, Roger Douget, Clarence Benoit, Melissa Odom, Baerbel M Boykin, Lorna Stevens, Shawn Bussell, Woodrow Woodall, Emma Veillon, Jerome D Norton, Sonny Smith, Thomas Neal, Shirley Childs, Kelly Bickham, Wesley Thompson, Sr, Ted Ray Clark, Jr, Samuel Romero, Laura Green, Rhea Verdine, Anthony Blount, Guy Snyder, Darrel Woodward, Minnie White, Harco National Ins. Co, Bobby Duncan, Linda Duvall, Eaden Ashworth, Carolyn Fenton, Leslie Coleman, Angel Delgado-Gonzalez, Angeliea Williams, Darren Brown, Wanda Lambright, Dana Wilbur, Druscilla Keogh, Arthur Samuel, Jennifer Hutson, David Riggs, Carol Griffin, Loretta Vanderbilt, William Farr, Sr, William Bowman, Thor McCaughey, Carol Buxton, Roy Clark, Ladonna Gibson, William Snyder, III, Rachel Branch, Judy Doyle, Wanda Gibson, Mary Lou Gandy, Herbert Guillory, Sr, Dollinda Floyd, Jose Hernandez, Shirley Collier, Brandi Zirlott, Waylon Gillis, Kristina Hickman, Kenneth Shivers, Linda Villegas, Twala S Dubose, Johnny F Henry, Lori Thompson, Arthur Paige, Jr., Frances Cloud, Steve Gibson, Chad Fenton, James L Smith, Raul Diaz, Jr, Gloria Brown, Donna Coker, Terry Samuel, Robin Bickham, Darrell W Woodard, Charlottee Carson, Jimmy McCain, Marla Landry, Evelyna Rhodes, Donald Manning, Chris Spikes, Trisha Cross, Linda Flower, Edward Johnson, David Sparks, Vernetta Williams, Joseph Higginbotham, Willard White, Meredith Stark, Bob Covington, Charlotte Tubbs, Darilyn Chester, Mary Palmer, James Holden, Terry Brinson, Sherry Doyle, Danny Hajek, Patrick Brown, Mary Katerhine Dugas, Gladys Issac, Perry Strickland, Karen Cutler, Rhonda Thompson, Linda Martinez, Justin Glenn, Anna Williamson, George Nolan, Betty A Goddard, Bryant Burks, Sr, Patricia Olson, Bobby Cloud, Jimmie Williamson, Ricky Issac, Venetta Burch, Judy Hines, Aquarius Daniels, Tina Courville, Theresa Bloodworth, Marilyn Allen, Janice K Bingle, Angelia Eaves, Raquel Foster, Jason Verrett, Carl F Barlow, Jr, Benny Hobden, Jewel Davis, Emily M Thompson, Aaron Spell, Lloyd Harris, Clinton E Harrison, III, Richard Burr, Ann Smith, ., Mary Brown, Billy Jones, Mary Dubose, Michael J Brown, Arlanda Fields, Emily Martin, Chad Williams, Sophia Steitler, Carla Sonnenberg, Kayla Herring, Lena Lyons Rich, Dale Reed, Jerry Hamilton, Norma Huval Granger, Josh Witmer, Carolyn Perdue, Rita Kellum, Ross Stirling, Kenneth Willis, David Doyle, Donald Ray Wilkins, Randall Feagin, Judith Monceaux, Rodney Reed, Deborah J Sanford, Edda Mobley, Marshall Stephenson, Sylvia Rosemon, Shannon Ratcliff, Peggy Williams, Clara O'Bannon, Rochelle Ibarra, Mary Soileau, Gloria J Stafford, Troy Letulle, Michelle Rawls, Rodney P Clark, Sr, Michael Whatley, David Gillis, Karen Felder, Joseph E Wray, Rebekah Spell, Kolin Hinds, James Hooks, Phillip Fuller, Michael H Prewitt, Stephen Lisle, Jimmy Childs, Michael White, Marvin T Green, Karey Broussard, Perry Bonin, Keith Pickering, Matthew Tompkins, William K Cole, James E Brown, George Mason, Donna Shoemaker, Shelley Borel, Jason Carpenter, Denise Authement, Lecretia Fraser, Charlotte Stout, Fred Johnson, Berna Shelby, Robert Hudson, Pamela Smith, Clara Mae Jackson, John B Meyers, Lisa Lathan, Larry Brooks, Donamae Hanks, Patricia Sezer, William Tennyson, Mary McKean, Lisa Doucet, Jessie Harrist, Ronnie Reisner, Lena Riggs, Patricia Greene, Jodie Caraway, Hunter Thompson, Martha Ashworth, Stephen Smith, Erma Poole, Daniel Burks, Ambika Seastrunk, Michelle Johnson, Robert Strenkowski, Marsha Strickland, Richard Westbrook, Belinda Flowers, Micah Fedoroff, Robert Broer, Shelly Seago, Bonnie Mouton, Florence Carroll, Shelia O Guidry, Tamika Arnold, Dale Bland, Daniel Scott, Verless Stewart, Leon Roff, Annetta Cormier, Angela Brown, ., Sandra Ashworth, Melbourne Watson, Joann Hatfield, Darlene Bray, Edward Fairchild, Maxine Miller, Clifton Sims, Richard Albair, Donna Sanders, Debra Johnson, Charles Tilley, James T Vincent, Torrance R Cameron, Timothy Reddish, Jimmy Foster, Jr, Jadene VanWinkle, Deborah Holbrook, Donna Wells, Jimmy Stanley, Gerald McPherson, Denise Comeaux, Fulton Manuel, Lowell . Thompson, Alvin Leleux, Sr, Laurie Rogers, Carla Tompkins, Herbert Barlow, Jr, Charles E Smith, Patsy Hudson, Jerome Hanks, Ronny Dugas, Sr, Salvador Torres, Jr, Youlanda Smith, John Burch, Sonya McCain, Lillie Jolivette, David Powell, Bobbie Wilkerson, Peggy Cloud, Mark Crenshaw, Robert Wagner, Nina D Dyson, Joann Krustchinsky, William Crooks, Larry L Moore, Selina Jones, Andrea Brown, Brenda Gantt, Rachael Courtright, Travis Hebert, Karen A Smith, Shirley Haney, Kendra Buxton, Christopher Jones, Karam Ali, Danny Cutaia, Paul Hutson, Joshua Bland, Danny Brack, Joseph M Benoit, Debora Walker, Michael Watson, Vickie S Hyatt, Terry Bloodworth, Eric Perkins, Marvin Poole, Shelby Tyler, Joanne Bell, Robert Olson, Kristal Issac, Dustin Brittain, Robert Walmsley, Deborah Welch, Debbie Walmsley, Kayla Mobley, Gary Biscamp, Sandra Leleux, Rhenda Edwards, Ashley Stansbury, Michael Ardoin, Melissa Pitcher, Vergie Turner, Debra Booker, Patricia Stirling, Liana Deville, Lori Williams, Ronald Shoemaker, Norris Nichols, Debra A Pharris, Brenda Letulle, Wilbur E Hryhorchuk, Dortha McClain, Judy Tennyson, Jerry Turner, Orvel VanWinkle, Daniel Smart, Lorita Caswell, Angelia East, Floyce Deana Sherrill, Patricia Frazier, Jacqueline Poole, Jancy Spears, Bartt Barron, Freddie Edwards, Ronald E Gillis, Thomas Williams, ., William H Martinez, Margaret Tynes, Reginald Parker, Ace Chandler, Linda . Jones, Kellie Leger, Marlene P Chaisson, William Melvin Green, Samuel Sparks, Darlene Lou Woodward, Raymond Bussell, Larry Clark, William Fowler, Teressa Williams, Michael Odell, Jimmy Martinez, Ruth Green, Thomas Hardin, Kathy Griffin, Johnny Toney, Jr., Hal Michael Perdue, Jean Ward, Mary . Allen, Keith Foster, Evelyn Morris, Elton Barks, Judy Lewis, ., Charles Broussard, Jamie Landrum, Lavan Spence, Valerie Jones, Keith R Robinson, Marc Edmiston, Donna Burch, Frank Cloud, Dixie Johnson, Glenda McCrimon, Matthew Empson, Juanita Jones, Jerry L Vincent, II, Robert . Green, Loretta Sharp, Richard Sneed, Henry Stanley, Alonia Samuel, John Hanner, Virgil Chester, Ryan Stoker, Bettye Groves, Regina Brown, Michael Brown, Kevin Williamson, Kenneth Boykin, Kim Buxton, Minnie Keggler, Sheralon F Reed, Nita Stanley, Marilyn Ballast, Michelle Decoursey, Jackie Bowman, Dakota Dickman, Jimmie Whitfield, Odis Hoosier, Jerry Brittain, Linda Toups, Elaine Hanner, Dorothy D Hryhorchuk, Maxie McDonald, Michael S Fuselier, Jamie Davis, Cecil Granger, Jr, Carl Clark, Dennis McKnight, Rodrick Lafleur, Jennifer McKnight, Robert Brinson, Hamp Lewis, Jr, Wallace Veillon, Sandra Bland, Richard F Robbins, Napoleon Davis, Jane Palmer, India Rhodes, Tracy Reed, Donna Hardin, Julienne McLain, Annie Vosti, Christina Langley, Wendell P Ardoin, Kelly Pargas, Gary D Gray, Patrick Bickham, Becky Harris, Kenneth Burch, Rebecca Clark, Linda Alfred, Cristi Harris, Elouise Hurst, Dennis Buxton, Sharron L Smith, Sultan Jasani, Prentice Buxton, Diana Miller, Steven Vincent, Kenneth Herring, Mary Lorraine Green, Louis E Davis, Alton R Jones, Barry Bates, Tammy Granger, James Decoursey, David Rogers, Larry Sears, Ruby Gosey, Pamela Williams, Chris Stevison, Debbie Haskin, Alice McPherson, Tiffanie Powell, Jon D Johnson, Burrell Stouffer, Billy G Gilpatrick, Kenneth Cormier, Belinda Lemen, Patrick Letulle, Lois Shoemake, Lucille Salter, Mark S Meyers, Mike Preddy, James Edward Brown, Jimmy A Young, Donna Barber, Bufford L Berry, Carolyn Foster, Allan Pierce, Dwayne Behan, George Phillips, Harry Sells, George Sharp, Susan Suire, Juanita Peveto, Andrew Hayes, Sabrina Clark, William Odom, David Butts, Lisa Dulaney, Emery Collins, Danna M Therrien, Mollie Williams, Melanie Green Wray, Sandra Palmer Lee, Lloyd Richard, Crystal R Haymon, Carl Gantt, Tania Clark, Michael Woods, Jude Sheppard, Charlene Jones, Allen Monson, Lee Garrison, Charles Holbrook, Lacey Bussell, Penny Rohrer, Gregory Kellum, Abbigail Brooks, Johnnie D Levi, Mary Reed, Robert E Tyler, Jr., Charles Strickland, Molly Malone, Willie Gilder, Jay Rodrick, Reatha Barina, Lisa Richard, Billy Sanders, Gerald Neely, Charlotte Clark, Ronnie L Stevison, Julie Babington, Keithon Perkins, James Thompson, Steven Richard, Wattie Bickham and Thelma Nava
Defendant: Sabine River Authority of Texas, Sabine River Authority of Louisiana, Cleco Power LLC, Toledo Bend Project Joint Operation, Entergy Louisiana, LLC and Entergy Texas, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Evelyn Williamson, Billie Jo Campbell, Oscar Buxton, Holli Buxton, Kimberly Washington, Roy Guillory, Natalie Smith, Lisa Hryhorchuk, Dennis Guillory, Bennie Cotter, Joyce Addison, Jean Grimes, Deidrick Sampson, Bennie Grimes, William Ball, Wade Nelms, Kevin Conerly, Joseph Chapman, Sandy Nelms, Ernest Bevelhymer, Glenda Taft, Misty Holden, Verley Gayle Spell, Larry Addison, Lyndsey Buxton and Ricky Alexander
Case Number: 1:2017cv00134
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
2 Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Appeal Remark re: Counsel can access the record on appeal by following the instructions in the link. If an appearance wasn't made in the appellant court, counsel doesn't have access through the link. http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf re #88 Notice of Appeal : (tkd, )
May 17, 2019 USCA 5th Circuit NOTICE - original record on appeal has been accepted. (tkd, )
May 8, 2019 NOTICE of certification of eROA provided to 5th Circuit Court of Appeals (tkd, ) Modified on 5/13/2019 (tkd, ).
May 7, 2019 Filing 90 USCA Clerk ORDER granting appellants' motion to reinstate the appeal as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs (tkd, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 89 USCA CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs (tkd, )
April 9, 2019 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re #88 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. USCA Case Number 19-40299 (tkd, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re #87 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-7210455. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Werner, John) Modified on 4/4/2019 (tkd, ).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER adopting #84 Report and Recommendation and Declining to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction. Defts' #62 Motion to Dismiss Pltf's Fifth Amended Petition is granted. Defts Entergy Louisiana LLC, Cleco Power LLC and Entergy Texas Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Ordered that the remaining state constitutional takings claims against Sabine River Authority of Texas and Sabine River Authority of Louisiana are remanded back to the 163rd Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX. Ordered that #63 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 3/18/19. (tkd, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 86 OBJECTION to #84 Report and Recommendations by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
March 15, 2019 Filing 85 FILED IN ERROR as a motion. This is an Objection to R&R. MOTION to Dismiss (Doc 84) Plaintiffs' Objections to the Report and Recommendation Granting the Entergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc 84) by Perry Bonin. (Werner, John) Modified on 3/18/2019 (tkd, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 03/01/2019. (jcf, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 83 RESPONSE to #80 More Definite Statement and SUPPLEMENT to #63 Second Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 10/4/2018 (tkd, ).
October 2, 2018 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENT to #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and RESPONSE to #80 Plaintiffs' More Definite Statement filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank) Modified on 10/2/2018 (tkd, ).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER directing the Clerk to rename #80 Sixth Amended Complaint to Pltfs' Response to Court's Order for More Definite Statement. Defts have 14 days to file a supplement to their #62 and #63 Motions to Dismiss. All other responses and reply deadlines are governed by the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/19/18. (tkd, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 80 RESPONSE to #79 Order for More Definite Statement, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Werner, John) Re-named as instructed in #81 Order. Modified on 9/20/2018 (tkd, ).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER for More Definite Statement. Pltfs are directed to file a more definite statement within 14 days to supplement the operative complaint. Pltfs must clarify their negligence claim consistent with the analysis in this order, and they must specify the source of law underlying each of their claims against the Entergy defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/28/18. (tkd, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #76 Motion to Conform Parties and Pleadings. The pltfs from member case 1:18-cv-153-TH are added to, and included under, the Fifth Amended Complaint in lead case 1:17-cv-134-TH (Doc. 59). It is further ordered that #62 and #63 Defts' Motions to Dismiss will also be applicable to the pltfs in the member case. The pending Motions to Dismiss in the member case, and all related motions, are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/27/18. (tkd, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Conform Parties and Pleadings filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
August 24, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Conform Parties and Pleadings by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
July 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Scheduling Conference held in chambers on 7/31/2018. (ttp, )
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying as moot #71 Motion to Consolidate Related Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/25/18. (tkd, )
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER terminating all previous settings and deadlines. A Case Management/ Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2018 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/23/18. (tkd, )
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDERED that Civil Action No. 1:18-CV-00153, styled Larry Addison, et al. v. Sabine River Authority of Texas, Entergy Texas, Inc., Entergy Louisiana, LLC and Cleco Power, LLC, is hereby consolidated for all purposes into Civil Action 1:17cv134. Civil Acton No. 1:17cv134 shall be designated as the lead action and civil action no. 1:18cv153 shall be designated as the member. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/20/2018. (bjc, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Filing of Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Action in Addison (1:18-cv-153) by Sabine River Authority of Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 7/19/2018 (tkd, ).
July 3, 2018 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition in Addison, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order of Transfer in Addison, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
June 1, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Defts' Reply in Support of #63 Second Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John) Modified on 6/4/2018 (tkd, ).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/29/18. (zjh1, )
May 25, 2018 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order from Baca, #2 Exhibit 2 - Baca Hearing Transcript)(Goehringer, Charles)
May 10, 2018 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/2/18. (zjh1, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plainitffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
April 27, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Werner, John)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/10/18. (zjh1, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John)
March 28, 2018 Filing 63 Second Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FERC Order of 11/24/03, #2 Exhibit B - FERC Statement of 12/19/13, #3 Exhibit C - FERC Letter of 08/31/16, #4 Exhibit D - Waller Order Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction of 10/27/17, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 6/4/2018 (tkd, ).
March 28, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying as moot #26 , #27 and #39 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 3/19/18. (tkd, )
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #43 Partially Unopposed Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice. Pltfs Charles Strickland, Richard Albair, Peggy Albair, and Linda Villegas are dismissed from this suit without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 3/19/18. (tkd, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 59 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Werner, John) Modified on 3/15/2018 (tkd, ).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting #54 Report and Recommendation and granting in part/denying in part #38 Amended Motion to Dismiss. Pltfs' negligence and Texas Water Code claims against the Entergy defendants are dismissed. Pltfs have seven (7) days to amend their complaint. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 3/7/18. (tkd, )
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting #55 Report and Recommendation and denying #18 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 3/7/18. (tkd, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 56 OBJECTION to #54 Report and Recommendations Granting in Part Entergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
February 8, 2018 Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #18 MOTION to Remand be denied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 02/08/2018. (ttp, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #38 Amended MOTION to Dismiss should be granted in part and denied in part and the Plaintiffs negligence and Texas Water Code claims against the Entergy Defendants should be dismissed. Further, the court should grant the Plaintiffs seven (7) days to amend their complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/8/2018. (ttp, )
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 GENERAL ORDER 18-2: Because Judge Marcia Crone has entered a recusal order, this case is reassigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. Judge Ron Clark no longer assigned to the case. (tkd, )
December 18, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Reply to Document 50) filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Doc No. 50. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/15/2017. (zjh1, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Document 50 by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
December 8, 2017 Filing 50 SURREPLY to Reply to Response to #38 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, #39 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Perry Bonin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 12/11/2017 (tkd, ).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs Surreply to any motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is now due December 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/20/2017. (zjh1, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's SurReply to Motions Under Fed.R.Civ.P.12, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
November 16, 2017 Filing 48 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY in Support re #39 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction in Waller Case)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/17/2017 (tkd, ).
November 7, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2016.08.31 FERC Ltr re Review of Incident Report, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Travis Williams)(Goehringer, Charles)
November 6, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
October 23, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Werner, John)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10-16-2017. (zjh1, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
September 29, 2017 Filing 43 Partially Unopposed MOTION for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Peggy Albair, Richard Albair, Charles Strickland, Linda Villegas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 10/2/2017 (tkd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2017: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9-27-2017. (Hawthorn, Zack)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/26/17. (tkd, )
September 26, 2017 Filing 41 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses, Replies and Surreplies to Motions under FRCP 12 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, John) Modified on 9/27/2017 (tkd, ).
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Marcia A. Crone recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ron Clark for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/6/2017. (bjc, )
August 25, 2017 Filing 39 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FERC FInal Report of 2003.11.24, #2 Exhibit B - Final Environmental Impact Statement of 2013.12.19, #3 Exhibit C - FERC Ltr of 2016.08.31, #4 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
August 24, 2017 Filing 38 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Appendix, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
August 11, 2017 Filing 37 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Werner, John)
July 28, 2017 Filing 36 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand of Plaintiffs filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Goehringer, Charles)
July 27, 2017 Filing 35 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand of Plaintiffs, filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Domino, Frank)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Toledo Bend Project Joint Operation with Prejudice on the basis that it is a non-jural entity. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/12/17. (mrp, ) Modified on 7/17/2017 (mrp, ).
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/10/17. (mrp, )
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia A. Crone: Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2017. Counsel convened to inform the court of the facts and issues in this case involving flooding to property near the Sabine River owned by Plaintiff Perry Bonin and numerous other individuals. The court and parties agreed to a scheduling order which will govern all future proceedings. Signed at Beaumont, Texas, this 10th day of July, 2017, by Judge Marcia A. Crone. (mrp, )
July 6, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H to Reply to Response to Motion to Remand)(Werner, John)
July 5, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Toledo Bend Project Joint Operation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motions to dismiss is due on or before 7/14/17, and Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' responses in opposition is due on or before 7/6/17. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/22/17.(mrp, )
June 21, 2017 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, #26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(c), #27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Perry Bonin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
June 16, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FERC 11/24/2003 Report, #2 Exhibit B -Final Impact Statement for Hydropower License 12/19/2013, #3 Exhibit C - FERC 08/31/2016, #4 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
June 15, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(c) by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Appendix Authorities, #9 A, #10 B, #11 C, #12 D, #13 E, #14 F, #15 G, #16 H, #17 I, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
May 30, 2017 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Domino, Frank)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/23/17. (mrp, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/23/17. (mrp, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
May 19, 2017 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to the Extent Necessary Regarding Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Domino, Frank)
May 19, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiffs filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FERC 11/24/2003 Report, #2 Exhibit B - Final Impact Statement for Hydropower License 12/19/2013, #3 Exhibit C - FERC 08/31/2016 Letter, #4 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
May 19, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
May 5, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Werner, John)
May 5, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 17, Motion to Remand. Exhibit attachments are incorrect. Counsel will refile. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (dlc, )
May 5, 2017 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR, exhibit attachments are incorrect. Counsel will refile, PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Werner, John) Modified on 5/5/2017 (dlc, ).
May 1, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE by Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Jurisdictional Statement (Wolff, John)
April 25, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference rescheduled for 7/7/2017 02:00 PM in Chambers (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
April 21, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference rescheduled for 6/2/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
April 13, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/12/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. (psl, )
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by 5/2/2017 and file a joint written report by 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 4/12/17. (tkd, )
April 7, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc. (Supplement to Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exh A part 1, #2 Exh A part 2, #3 Exh A part 3, #4 Exh A part 4, #5 Exh B)(Domino, Frank)
April 7, 2017 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Domino, Frank)
April 7, 2017 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR; SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #13 *** NOTICE by Cleco Power LLC, Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc. (Supplement to Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exh A part 1, #2 Exh A Part 2, #3 Exh A part 3, #4 Exh A part 4, #5 Exh B)(Domino, Frank) Modified on 4/10/2017 (mrp, ).
April 7, 2017 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc. (Domino, Frank)
April 7, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Anthony Domino on behalf of Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Texas, Inc. (Domino, Frank)
April 7, 2017 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cleco Power LLC (Domino, Frank)
April 7, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Anthony Domino on behalf of Cleco Power LLC (Domino, Frank)
April 5, 2017 Filing 14 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NO B160137-C AND IS INCLUED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS DOCUMENT NO. 6, EXHIBIT 1***FOURTH AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants, FILED BY ALL PLAINTIFFS.(aam, )
April 5, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Perry Bonin. (aam, )
April 5, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #5 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 3rd Amended Petition, 4th Amended Petition -Notice of Compliance (Part 7 of 7))(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 4/10/2017 (bjc, ).
April 5, 2017 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sabine River Authority of Texas' Brief in support of its plea of the jurisdiction (Part 6 of 7))(Goehringer, Charles)
April 5, 2017 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Sabine River Authority of Texas' Brief in Support of its plea to the jurisdiction (Part 5 of 7))(Goehringer, Charles)
April 5, 2017 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Order granting motion to remand (Part 4 of 7))(Goehringer, Charles)
April 5, 2017 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Cover Sheet, Civil Docket Sheet, Original Petition, 1st Amended Petition (Part 1 of 7), #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - 2nd Amended Complaint (Part 2 of 7), #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 -Notice of Compliance (Part 3 of 7))(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 4/10/2017 (bjc, ).
April 5, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sabine River Authority of Texas from 163rd Judicial District Court of Orange County, Texas, case number B160137C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6234222), filed by Sabine River Authority of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to & Supp Notice of Removal of Cleco & Entergy, #3 Exhibit 3 - FERC Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of David Montagne)(Goehringer, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonin v. Sabine River Authority of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabine River Authority of Texas
Represented By: Lawrence Louis Germer
Represented By: Charles W Goehringer, Jr
Represented By: William S Helfand
Represented By: Kelli Burris Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabine River Authority of Louisiana
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleco Power LLC
Represented By: Frank Anthony Domino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Bend Project Joint Operation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Scheurich
Represented By: Frank Anthony Domino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Scheurich
Represented By: Frank Anthony Domino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hoffpauir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Tynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Acreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lessie Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanice Horlacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B Keeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D Gautreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mistie Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Rosemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Barrilleaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnia Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Glen W Morgan
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Adam Barclay Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Hennigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb J Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Says
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Chaloupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Acreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lainey Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modestine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Synder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lucius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassy Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taboris Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Albair
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Foreman Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelene Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keitha McCaughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georga White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Zetar, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy O'Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey McCrandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Welch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nell Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James . Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaina Hoosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Buxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Beaudeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynnie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Verrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabor Ebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telisa Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy R Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Stelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manuel
Represented By: Glen W Morgan
Represented By: John Gerard Werner
Represented By: Adam Barclay Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Pellerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldean Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamesha Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opal Holaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quita Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Seago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariefay Biscamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlneilous Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred E Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Ocraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keturah Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viki Lebrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth N Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ray Burnitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria M Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Gosey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Lisenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenell Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Hollyfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxann L Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terel Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Reyes, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britany Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia McCoullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novela Hartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Sue McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L. Sealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Beaudeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Verdine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad K Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisse Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conadita Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Folks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobin Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester A Courmier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Sezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candie Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Hoosler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Brice, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlis Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montreall Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicky Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilkerson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett McCaughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby D Beassie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rosemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Hanks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Crase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie C Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Hansen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ballast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danna Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Peet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Fedoroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Holaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Coleman Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Keggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Herline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choyce Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Vanderbilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stevison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willow Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Jolivette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Gilchriest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leblanc Oscar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Lafleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Folks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Franklin Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chancery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Quinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Updike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis C Jolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Thompson, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Keith Curl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Reed, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovie D Garlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stouffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Balch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulice Benoit, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Courtright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Balch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Barrilleaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danney Borel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence . Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Frenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Meshell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottie Biscamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Tyszko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquanetta Issac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanny E Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Cruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nowlin Coleman
Search News [