Perez et al v. Excel Contractors, LLC

Plaintiff: Alba Perez and Brenice Morciglio
Defendant: Excel Contractors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00439
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zoe W. Vermeulen on behalf of Excel Contractors, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7018557. (Vermeulen, Zoe)
November 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David M. Whitaker on behalf of Excel Contractors, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7018528. (Whitaker, David)
October 4, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alba Perez, Brenice Morciglio. Excel Contractors, LLC waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Moore, Melissa)
September 10, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brenice Morciglio, Alba Perez. (aam, )
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
September 10, 2018 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rochelle Lynn Owens on behalf of Brenice Morciglio, Alba Perez (Owens, Rochelle)
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Ann Moore on behalf of Brenice Morciglio, Alba Perez (Moore, Melissa)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Excel Contractors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6935203.), filed by Alba Perez, Brenice Morciglio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Excel Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Perez
Represented By: Rochelle Lynn Owens
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenice Morciglio
Represented By: Rochelle Lynn Owens
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Zoe W. Vermeulen
Represented By: David M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?