Martinez-Garcia v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Juana Martinez-Garcia
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Michael Teets, Joseph B Carney and Judson Estes
Case Number: 1:2018cv00582
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Scheduling Order)(Slobin, Cary)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/20/2018. (bjc, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by FCA US LLC. (Slobin, Cary)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 1/23/2019 at 10:15 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Previous setting for 1/24/19 is cancelled.(jc, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judson Estes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Slobin, Cary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Juana Martinez-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ritch, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #5 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
November 20, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by 12/12/2018 and file a joint written report by 12/21/2018. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/14/2018. (tkd, )
November 9, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
November 8, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC and Juana Martinez-Garcia. (aam, )
November 8, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC from 60th Judicial District of Jefferson County Texas, case number B-202575. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7019653), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Plaintiff's Original Petition #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, list of parties #11 Exhibit 11, Civil Cover Sheet #12 Exhibit 12, Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, List of Attorneys #15 Exhibit 15)(Calhoun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Garcia v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Katherine Handy Calhoun
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Represented By: Cary Alan Slobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Teets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Estes
Represented By: Cary Alan Slobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Martinez-Garcia
Represented By: Joseph E Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?