Kemp v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Kemp and Jesse Eugene Kemp
Defendant: Chad Cross, Baptist Hospitals of Southeast Texas, Smith& Nephew Consolidated, Inc., Beaumont Bone & Joint Institute,P.A., MD Ronald E. Talbert, JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC (in lieu of JB Orthopaedics), Michael Taylor, Smith & Nephew, Inc., Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc. (in lieu of Pure Play Orthopedics), Ronald E. Talbert and Smith & Nephew Consolidated, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00593
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. This case is administratively closed pending further order of this court. Order denying #4 Motion to Remand without prejudice as to the right of counsel to re-urge it before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or the transferee court.. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/28/2018. (bjc, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Brian)
November 19, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
November 17, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 filed by Jesse Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petroff, Kip)
November 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Beaumont Bone & Joint Institute,P.A., Chad Cross, JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC (in lieu of JB Orthopaedics), Jesse Eugene Kemp, Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc. (in lieu of Pure Play Orthopedics), Smith & Nephew Consolidated, Inc, Ronald E. Talbert, Michael Taylor. (aam, )
November 16, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Jesse Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petroff, Kip)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Johnson, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew, Inc. from 136 JDC Jefferson County, case number D-202027. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7029091), filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, a-c Original Petition filed in State Court #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Johnson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Cross
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Hospitals of Southeast Texas
Represented By: Curry Lynn Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith& Nephew Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaumont Bone & Joint Institute,P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Ronald E. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC (in lieu of JB Orthopaedics)
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Taylor
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc. (in lieu of Pure Play Orthopedics)
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Consolidated, Inc
Represented By: Kealy Christian Sehic
Represented By: Brian Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kemp
Represented By: Kip Allan Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Eugene Kemp
Represented By: Kip Allan Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?