CAT5 Resources LLC v. CB Towers, LLC et al

Plaintiff: CAT5 RESOURCES LLC and CAT5 Resources, LLC
Defendant: CB TOWERS, LLC and WAYNE ALLEN FISH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 Response in Opposition to 7 Motion to dismiss . CB Towers, LLC's reply to the Motion to Dismiss must be filed on or before 4/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 04/15/2019.(bmf)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #11 Response in Opposition to #7 Motion to dismiss by CB Towers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, In the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by CAT5 Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cindy Perez)(Odell, Christopher)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Odell, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss must be filed no later than 4/8/19. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/13/19. (mrp, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, In the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue by CAT5 Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Odell, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, In the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue by CB Towers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Mary)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A responsive pleading to the Original Petition must be filed no later than 3/11/19. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/5/19. (mrp, )
March 5, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. (jc, )
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 11:45 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. (jc, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CB Towers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Mary)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/20/19. (mrp, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Cazes Greene on behalf of CB Towers, LLC (Greene, Mary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wayne Allen Fish re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent to Removal (Martin, Lionel)
February 20, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
February 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAT5 Resources, LLC, CB Towers, LLC. (aam, )
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CB TOWERS, LLC from 60th Judicial District, case number B-0203061. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7145871), filed by CB TOWERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Orig Petition #4 Exhibit B, Citation CB Towers LLC #5 Exhibit C, Citation Wayne Allen Fish #6 Exhibit D, Orig Ans Filed by Deft Wayne #7 Exhibit E, Certified copy state court docket sheet #8 Exhibit F, Deft's Notice to State Court of Removal)(Parker, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAT5 Resources LLC v. CB Towers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAT5 RESOURCES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAT5 Resources, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mohr Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB TOWERS, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Maureen Parker
Represented By: Mary Cazes Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE ALLEN FISH
Represented By: Lionel C Martin
Represented By: Melissa Garcia Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?