Brooks v. Davis

Petitioner: Dywan Shenille Brooks
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Marcia A Crone
1 Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01034. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 22, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 3/22/2019, filed. (sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Dywan Shenille Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dywan Shenille Brooks, filed. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dywan Shenille Brooks, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dywan Shenille Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?