Dixon v. West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District
Plaintiff: Carol Dixon
Defendant: West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District (Rule 26 Initial Disclosures) (Bailey, Rebecca)
July 12, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 4, Initial Disclosure. This contains actual disclosure which is not accepted for filing by the court. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hodgins, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District (Rule 26 Initial Disclosures) (Hodgins, David)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 6/25/2019. Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/7/19. (tkd, )
June 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NO. D190159-C AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE AS EXHIBIT A***ORIGINAL PETITION against West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District, filed by Carol Dixon.(aam, )
June 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District. (aam, )
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District from 260th Orange County, case number D190159-C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7297136), filed by West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Orig Petition #3 Exhibit B, Citation #4 Exhibit C, Orig Ans by Deft West Orange-Cove #5 Exhibit D, State Court Docket Sheet#6 Exhibit E, List of Parties & Counsel)(Bailey, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Orange-Cove Consolidated Independent School District
Represented By: Rebecca S. Bailey
Represented By: David B Hodgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Dixon
Represented By: Laurence Wade Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?