Cantrell et al v. Gaddie et al
Plaintiff: Karen Cantrell and Justin Sticker
Defendant: Timothy Gaddie and General Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00288
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Karen Cantrell, Justin Sticker of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Plezia, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - scheduling order)(Wilkins, Greg)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/27/2019 at 10:45 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. The previous setting for 9/3/19 is cancelled.(jc, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/8/19. (mrp, )
July 8, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. (jc, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael J. Truncale recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/2/19. (mrp, )
July 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
July 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karen Cantrell, Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc., Justin Sticker. (aam, )
July 1, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc. (Wilkins, Greg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 First amended original ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc..(Wilkins, Greg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc.. (Wilkins, Greg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc. from 58th District Court, case number A-203889. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7331213), filed by Timothy Gaddie, General Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, civil cover sheet #2 Exhibit B, certified copy of the state court docket sheet #3 Exhibit C, copy of all pleadings that assert causes of action and all answers to such pleadings #4 Exhibit D, list of parties #5 Exhibit E, list of attys #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wilkins, Greg) Modified on 7/1/2019 (aam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell et al v. Gaddie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Gaddie
Represented By: Greg Christopher Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua Blake Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Greg Christopher Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua Blake Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Cantrell
Represented By: Richard Joseph Plezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Sticker
Represented By: Richard Joseph Plezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?