Palmer v. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Palmer
Defendant: Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00341
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon.(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTIONS FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before September 30, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on October 22, 2019, at 11 a.m., in Suite 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/12/19. (ljw, )
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc.(Hernandez, Anthony)
August 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Universidad del Sagrado Corazon to 9/26/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Universidad del Sagrado Corazon.( Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Michael Acevedo-Carlson on behalf of Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc to 9/13/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Idalia Llorens Collections Agency Inc.( Jaffer, Shawn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bjc, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) ***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS NOT FLATTENED.***
August 6, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc, Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samantha Palmer. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7380210.), filed by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universidad del Sagrado Corazon
Represented By: Kevin Michael Acevedo-Carlson
Represented By: Anthony W Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Palmer
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?