Aker v. Huenefeld et al
Plaintiff: Jo Aker
Defendant: Greg Marvin Huenefeld and Ridgetop Trucking LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00347
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. Date parties should be prepared to try case is 6/15/20. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 10/1/19. (mrp, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Jo Aker (Yoes, Stuart)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Yoes, Stuart)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Thad Heartfield. (fal, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Stuart Cooper Yoes on behalf of Jo Aker (Yoes, Stuart)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greg Marvin Huenefeld, Ridgetop Trucking LLC (Surratt, Stephanie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 First Amended Original ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Greg Marvin Huenefeld, Ridgetop Trucking LLC.(Surratt, Stephanie)
August 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER 38179 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT B***ORIGINAL PETITION against Greg Marvin Huenefeld, Ridgetop Trucking LLC, filed by Jo Aker.(aam, )
August 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jo Aker. (aam, )
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (aam, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jasper County District Court, case number 38179. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7385453), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Certified copy of the state court docket sheet #3 Exhibit B, Index and Copies of pleadings, answers, processes and orders #4 Exhibit C, List of parties and counsel #5 Exhibit D, Record of parties requesting trial by jury #6 Exhibit E, Statement regarding case status)(Surratt, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aker v. Huenefeld et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Aker
Represented By: Joseph Glenn Kahla
Represented By: Stuart Cooper Yoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Marvin Huenefeld
Represented By: Stephanie Donean Surratt
Represented By: Jo Ben Whittenburg
Represented By: William Fletcher Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgetop Trucking LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Donean Surratt
Represented By: Jo Ben Whittenburg
Represented By: William Fletcher Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?