Doucette v. Ditech Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Torey Doucette, Clyde Howells and Torey Doucette, Sr.
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00366
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ordered that Plaintiff's petition against Defendants is dismissed without prejudice. The taxable costs of court are charged against the party incurring the same. This is a Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/10/19. (mrp, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is moot because the issue of whether Plaintiff failed to state a claim in no longer "live." Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/10/19. (mrp, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying pltf Doucette's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/30/19. (tkd, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER striking plaintiff Clyde Howells from this action. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/30/19. (tkd, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Foreclosure by Plaintiffs Torey Doucette and Tritex Investment Group, LLC filed by Torey Doucette, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Chappell, Melody)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Defendant's Exhibit 7 by Ditech Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Sam) Modified on 8/30/2019 (tkd, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff Doucette Admitted Exhibits List. (jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jmv, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's Admitted Exhibits List (jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (jmv, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff Witness List. (jmv, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Show Cause Hearing re: Preliminary Injunction held on 8/28/2019. Parties presented evidence and testimony. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (jmv, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #3 and #4 Orders by Torey Doucette, Sr on 8/24/2019 (tkd, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Ditech Financial LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Melissa)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order until 11:55 pm on August 30, 2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale regarding preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/23/19. (tkd, )
August 23, 2019 ***Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn no longer assigned to case. (tkd, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Opting-Out of General Order 05-07. All pretrial matters for this cause will be handled by the undersigned judge. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/23/19. (tkd, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, )
August 21, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, ) Sent by US Mail to pro se plaintiffs
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NO. E-0204237 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT A***ORIGINAL PETITION against Ditech Financial LLC, filed by Torey Doucette, Sr, Clyde Howells.(aam, )
August 20, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC from 172nd Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number E-0204237. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7401572), filed by Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gutierrez, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucette v. Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torey Doucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torey Doucette, Sr.
Represented By: Melody Gale Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Melissa Sue Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Melissa Sue Gutierrez
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?