Vuong Huynh Corp. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Plaintiff: Vuong Huynh Corp
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2019cv00373
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Vuong Huynh Corp (Delpit, Carla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vuong Huynh Corp. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Sanov, Phillip)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must be held on or before October 10, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on November 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., in Suite 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/26/19. (ljw, )
September 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Moehlmann, Robbie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carla Ruth Delpit on behalf of Vuong Huynh Corp (Delpit, Carla)
August 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service (aam, )
August 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vuong Huynh Corp. (aam, )
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7406261.), filed by Vuong Huynh Corp. d/b/a Food Supermarket. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanov, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vuong Huynh Corp. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vuong Huynh Corp
Represented By: Phillip Norris Sanov
Represented By: Carla Ruth Delpit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Robbie Allen Moehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?