Dougay v. Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jill Trahan Dougay
Defendant: DOLGENCORP OF TEXAS, INC. and Traci Abrams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00419
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Dolgencorp of Texas Inc (Lucero, Gina)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale.. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/30/2019. (bmf)
October 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2019. Attorneys Present - Pltf: Larry Hunter Deft: Stefan Ginnard. Court will enter scheduling order. (jmv, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/28/2019. (bjc, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective Order by Jill Trahan Dougay . (Hunter, Larry) Modified on 10/22/2019 (tkd, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order by Jill Trahan Dougay . (Hunter, Larry) Modified on 10/22/2019 (tkd, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hunter, Larry)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jill Trahan Dougay Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Initial Disclosures (Hunter, Larry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Traci Abrams, Dolgencorp of Texas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Lucero, Gina)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 10/29/2019 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/18/19. (mrp, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Jill Trahan Dougay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Order of Remand)(Hunter, Larry)
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Traci Abrams, Dolgencorp of Texas Inc. (aam, )
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Lucero, Gina)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, Texas, case number A190238-C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7432424), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucero, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougay v. Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLGENCORP OF TEXAS, INC.
Represented By: Gina Aileen Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Trahan Dougay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?