Lewellyn Charles Cox IV v. Warden
Petitioner: Lewellyn Charles Cox, IV
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00431
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-01707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 9/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 CV111) (esa). [Transferred from California Central on 9/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Lewellyn Charles Cox, IV. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewellyn Charles Cox IV v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lewellyn Charles Cox, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?