Hinds v. National General Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Ethan Doyle Hinds
Defendant: National General Assurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00480
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. Ordered that this lawsuit is stayed until the appraisal is complete, with the exception of matters relating to the appraisal. Ordered that the parties shall notify the Court once appraisal is completed so that the stay can be lifted. Ordered that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for November 18, 2019 is hereby canceled. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/6/2019. (bjc, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #5 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Appraisal.. (Yoss, Harrison)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Appraisal by National General Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yoss, Harrison) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. Document is missing a certificate of conference.NOTICE by National General Assurance Company Defendant's Verified Plea in Abatement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yoss, Harrison) Modified on 11/5/2019 (tkd, ).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER setting Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before November 1, 2019. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 10:30 AM in Suite 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/11/2019. (bjc, )
October 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
October 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National General Assurance Company from 163rd Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX, case number B190356-C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7469632), filed by National General Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Original Petition #2 Exhibit B, Citation #3 Exhibit C, Deft's Original Answer #4 Exhibit D, List of parties and Counsel #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yoss, Harrison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinds v. National General Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Assurance Company
Represented By: Harrison Henry Yoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Doyle Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?