In Re: Associated Marine Services, Inc.
Petitioner: Associated Marine Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00487
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Associated Marine Services, Inc. re #7 Notice (Other) of Proof of Publication of Legal Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eaves, Michael)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR; SEE DOCUMENT #9 *** AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 Notice (Other) by Associated Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Eaves, Michael) Modified on 12/4/2019 (mrp, ).
November 1, 2019 Issued receipt #TXE100019588 in the amount of $1,000.00 to Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, LLP for deposit into the Court's Registry for security costs.. (aam, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of complaint and petition for exoneration from or limitation of liability (bjc, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 MONITION. (bjc, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving surety, directing the issuance of monition, and directing the issuance of notice to potential claimants. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/29/2019. (bjc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER of Undertaking in Support of #2 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation by Associated Marine Services, Inc. (Eaves, Michael) Modified on 10/29/2019 (tkd, ).
October 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
October 14, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipulation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice, and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims by Associated Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eaves, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation by Associated Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eaves, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against Associated Marine Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7476896.), filed by Associated Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Value #2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Pending Freight #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eaves, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Associated Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Associated Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Eaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?