Boone v. Gibbs et al
Plaintiff: Morris D Boone
Defendant: Lt. Diana McNeals, Major Unknown Neal and Debra Gibbs
Case Number: 1:2019cv00528
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff shall pay the initial partial filing fee of $9.39, and shall thereafter pay the remainder of the filing fee, $340.61, in monthly installments. The agency having custody of Morris D Boone shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 12/20/2019. (bjc, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of objection to Magistrate Judge referral filed by Morris D Boone. (jmv, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Morris D Boone. (jmv, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $9.39 within 30 days for Morris D Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/4/19. (ljw, )
October 25, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Morris D Boone. (ljw, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Morris D Boone. (ljw, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights) against All Defendants, filed by Morris D Boone.(ljw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Diana McNeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Unknown Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?