Goodhue Partners, LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Goodhue Partners, LLC
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00595
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to suspend initial deadlines. The case management conference is cancelled. The parties are directed to promptly inform the Court of the results of their settlement negotiations by 2/7/2020. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/8/20. (tkd, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Deadlines and Case Managment Conference in Favor of ADR by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Hogue, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hogue, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines) (bjc, ).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Rule l2(f) attorney conference by 12/16/2019. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 11:30 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/26/19. (tkd, )
November 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER E-204231 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT A***ORIGINAL PETITION AGAINST Western World Insurance Company, filed by Goodhue Partners, LLC.(aam, )
November 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Goodhue Partners, LLC. (aam, )
November 22, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western World Insurance Company from 172nd District Court, case number E-204231. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7540870), filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogue, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodhue Partners, LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodhue Partners, LLC
Represented By: Charles Arthur Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Glenn Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?