Brooks v. Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Kenneth Ray Brooks, Jr
Respondent: Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2019cv00607
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100019843 (bmf)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Kenneth Ray Brooks, Jr on 12/10/19 of #2 Order to Submit Printout of Deposits,. (mrp, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mailed Notice of Case Assignment sent to Kenneth Ray Brooks Jr. (mrp, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. It is ordered that Petitioner shall submit within 20 days the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis with printout from TDCJ showing deposits made to his prisoner account during the preceding 6-month period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/5/19. (mrp, )
December 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn.(mrp, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 28 USC 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth Ray Brooks, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mrp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Ray Brooks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?