Lampley v. USA
Petitioner: Willie Lampley
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00622
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USA of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and #2 Order to Answer. (mrp, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that the government shall have 60 days from the date of service of process to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence and show cause why relied prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 12/16/2019. (bjc, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Willie Lampley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mrp, )
December 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (mrp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampley v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Russell Elmer James, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Lampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?