Allen v. Zink et al
Plaintiff: Alvin C Allen, Jr
Defendant: Brian Whiteside, Trevor Zink and Autoficio, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00045
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Brian Whiteside to 4/24/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( tkd, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brian Whiteside.( Griffith, Casey) (Main Document 3 replaced with a flattened image on 3/18/2020) (tkd, ). Modified on 3/18/2020 (tkd, ).
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONSES issued as to Autoficio, LLC, Brian Whiteside, Trevor Zink and returned to plaintiff for service (tkd, )
February 7, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
February 6, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TXE100020068 (tkd, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Autoficio, LLC, Brian Whiteside, Trevor Zink, filed by Alvin C Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits 1-11, #3 Exhibits 12-15, #4 Exhibits 16-18)(tkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Zink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Whiteside
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Zink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoficio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin C Allen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?